EP2681668 - TECHNIQUES FOR EVENT NOTIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.03.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.04.2019 [2019/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Waters Technologies Corporation a US Corporation 34 Maple Street Milford, MA 01757 / US | [2014/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COHN, Steven, M. 83 Oxford Drive Franklin, MA 02038 / US | 02 /
CORBIN, Virginia, L. 333 Village Street Medway, MA 02035 / US | 03 /
CARNEIRO, John 6 Richard Street Milford, MA 01757 / US | 04 /
WINTERGALEN, Andreas Turkisweg 51 50259 Pulheim / DE | [2014/02] | Representative(s) | Harding, Andrew Philip Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/02] | Harding, Andrew Philip Forresters Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12754322.1 | 24.02.2012 | WO2012US26450 | Priority number, date | US201161449135P | 04.03.2011 Original published format: US 201161449135 P | [2014/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012121901 | Date: | 13.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2681668 | Date: | 08.01.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.09.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.09.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/173 | [2014/02] | CPC: |
G06F11/3072 (EP,US);
H04L12/00 (US);
G05B23/0272 (EP,US);
G06F11/3476 (EP,US);
G06Q10/10 (EP,US);
G06F11/0781 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/02] | Title | German: | EREIGNISBENACHRICHTIGUNGSVERFAHREN | [2014/02] | English: | TECHNIQUES FOR EVENT NOTIFICATION | [2014/02] | French: | TECHNIQUES DE NOTIFICATION D'ÉVÉNEMENT | [2014/02] | Entry into regional phase | 25.07.2013 | National basic fee paid | 25.07.2013 | Search fee paid | 25.07.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.07.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.07.2013 | Examination requested [2014/02] | 11.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/15] | 06.03.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.04.2019 | 11.04.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.02.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4816208 (WOODS DAVID D [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * column 1 - column 4 *; | [X]US2005197786 (KATARIA ANJALI R [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0036] ** paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0051] *; | [X]US2005283553 (DROBA GREGORY S [US]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0088] - paragraph [0097] *; | [X]US2005289096 (TROSSEN DIRK [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0023] *; | [X]US2010156654 (BULLEMER PETER [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0013] * | International search | [A]US2005076113 (KLOTZ STEVE [US], et al); | [X]US2006259163 (HSIUNG CHANG-MENG B [US], et al) |