EP2671762 - STARTING POSSIBILITY DETERMINATION APPARATUS, AND STARTING POSSIBILITY DETERMINATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.08.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.09.2015 [2015/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | For all designated states Furukawa Automotive Systems Inc. 1000 Amago Koura-cho Inukami-gun, Shiga 522-0242 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/50] | For all designated states Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | ||
For all designated states Furukawa Automotive Systems Inc. 1000 Amago Koura-cho Inukami-gun, Shiga 522-0242 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MITSUYAMA Taiji c/o Furukawa Electric Co. Ltd. 2-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | 02 /
SATO Etsuzo 1000 Amago Kora-cho Inukami-gun Shiga 522-0242 / JP | [2013/50] | Representative(s) | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/50] | Jordan, Volker Otto Wilhelm, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12754355.1 | 07.03.2012 | WO2012JP55760 | Priority number, date | JP20110049343 | 07.03.2011 Original published format: JP 2011049343 | [2013/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012121272 | Date: | 13.09.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2671762 | Date: | 11.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B60R16/04 | [2013/50] | CPC: |
B60R16/03 (EP,US);
F02D35/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/50] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINER STARTMÖGLICHKEIT UND VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINER STARTMÖGLICHKEIT | [2013/50] | English: | STARTING POSSIBILITY DETERMINATION APPARATUS, AND STARTING POSSIBILITY DETERMINATION METHOD | [2013/50] | French: | APPAREIL DE DÉTERMINATION DE POSSIBILITÉ DE DÉMARRAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION DE POSSIBILITÉ DE DÉMARRAGE | [2013/50] | Entry into regional phase | 06.09.2013 | Translation filed | 06.09.2013 | National basic fee paid | 06.09.2013 | Search fee paid | 06.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.09.2013 | Examination requested [2013/50] | 07.08.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2007269051 (AUTO NETWORK GIJUTSU KENKYUSHO, et al); | [A]JP2008307973 (SHIN KOBE ELECTRIC MACHINERY); | [A]JP2009241633 (SHIN KOBE ELECTRIC MACHINERY); | [A]JP2009244179 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2009047093 |