EP2734860 - COMPOSITE ASSEMBLY FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.04.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.01.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft Berliner Ring 2 38440 Wolfsburg / DE | [2014/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRAUSSE, Claudia Im Sommerfeld 10 38120 Braunschweig / DE | 02 /
MAX, Stephan Geschwister Scholl Str. 16 38518 Gifhorn / DE | 03 /
ZALESKI, Olgierd Poppenbüttler Land Str. 22d 22391 Hamburg / DE | 04 /
BOCKSTEDTE, Andreas Osterjork 27 21635 Jork / DE | [2019/23] |
Former [2014/22] | 01 /
PRAUSSE, Claudia Im Sommerfeld 10 38120 Braunschweig / DE | ||
02 /
MAX, Stephan Geschwister Scholl Str. 16 38518 Gifhorn / DE | |||
03 /
ZALESKI, Olgierd Poppenbüttler Landstr. 22d 22391 Hamburg / DE | |||
04 /
BOCKSTEDTE, Andreas Osterjork 27 21635 Jork / DE | Application number, filing date | 12756648.7 | 13.07.2012 | [2019/23] | WO2012EP02959 | Priority number, date | DE201110108403 | 23.07.2011 Original published format: DE102011108403 | [2014/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013013783 | Date: | 31.01.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2734860 | Date: | 28.05.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2734860 | Date: | 05.06.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/521, B60R19/48, G10K11/00 | [2014/22] | CPC: |
B60R19/483 (EP,CN,US);
G01S7/521 (EP,CN,US);
G10K11/18 (US);
G10K11/002 (US);
G10K11/004 (EP,CN,US);
G01S2015/938 (EP,CN,US);
G10K11/16 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MONTAGEVERBUND EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGS | [2014/22] | English: | COMPOSITE ASSEMBLY FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2014/22] | French: | CONNEXION DE MONTAGE D'UN VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2014/22] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2014 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/22] | 20.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.03.2017 | Opposition(s) | 06.03.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.07.2012 | AL | 05.06.2019 | CY | 05.06.2019 | CZ | 05.06.2019 | DK | 05.06.2019 | EE | 05.06.2019 | ES | 05.06.2019 | FI | 05.06.2019 | HR | 05.06.2019 | IT | 05.06.2019 | LT | 05.06.2019 | LV | 05.06.2019 | MC | 05.06.2019 | MK | 05.06.2019 | MT | 05.06.2019 | NL | 05.06.2019 | PL | 05.06.2019 | RO | 05.06.2019 | RS | 05.06.2019 | SE | 05.06.2019 | SI | 05.06.2019 | SK | 05.06.2019 | SM | 05.06.2019 | TR | 05.06.2019 | AT | 13.07.2019 | IE | 13.07.2019 | LU | 13.07.2019 | BE | 31.07.2019 | CH | 31.07.2019 | LI | 31.07.2019 | FR | 05.08.2019 | BG | 05.09.2019 | GB | 05.09.2019 | NO | 05.09.2019 | GR | 06.09.2019 | IS | 05.10.2019 | PT | 07.10.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 13.07.2012 | |
AL | 05.06.2019 | ||
CY | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
MT | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
AT | 13.07.2019 | ||
IE | 13.07.2019 | ||
LU | 13.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 05.08.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
GB | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 13.07.2012 | |
AL | 05.06.2019 | ||
CY | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
AT | 13.07.2019 | ||
IE | 13.07.2019 | ||
LU | 13.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 05.08.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
GB | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
CY | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
AT | 13.07.2019 | ||
IE | 13.07.2019 | ||
LU | 13.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 05.08.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
GB | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
AT | 13.07.2019 | ||
IE | 13.07.2019 | ||
LU | 13.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 05.08.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
GB | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/48] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IE | 13.07.2019 | ||
LU | 13.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 05.08.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
GB | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IE | 13.07.2019 | ||
LU | 13.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 05.08.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LU | 13.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 05.06.2019 | |
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 05.06.2019 | |
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE906425 (ATLAS WERKE AG) [A] 2-5 * page 2 *; | [Y]DE1276515 (MARCONI SOUNDING DEVICE CO) [Y] 1,8 * column 1, line 14 - line 26 * * column 3, line 43 - line 63; figure 1 *; | [A]DE4114180 (MICROSONIC GES FUER MIKROELEKT [DE]) [A] 6,7* column 3 - column 4 *; | [YD]DE102006034997 (DENSO CORP [JP], et al) [YD] 1,8 * abstract * | Examination | DE102006034997 | US2007115102 | US2007144261 | DE102008017067 |