EP2742097 - COMPOSITIONS OF POLYHYDRIC ALCOHOLS AND POLYAMIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.2018 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RADICI PLASTICS GmbH Glockengiesserwall 2 20095 Hamburg / DE | [2017/43] |
Former [2014/25] | For all designated states Invista Technologies S.à.r.l. Zweigniederlassung St. Gallen Kreuzackerstrasse 9 9000 St. Gallen / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATHUR, Sumit 7237 Meredith Court Ooltewah, TN 37363 / US | 02 /
ELKOVITCH, Mark 1326 Brow Estates Drive Signal Mountain, TN 37377 / US | 03 /
GOPAL, Vikram 7585 Roxbury Drive Ypsilanti, MI 48197 / US | 04 /
BHATIA, Rajeev, S. 6586 Orange Plank Drive Hixson, TN 37343 / US | [2014/25] | Representative(s) | Palladino, Saverio Massimo Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Viale Achille Papa, 30 20149 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2014/25] | Cockerton, Bruce Roger Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 12756892.1 | 30.08.2012 | WO2012US52974 | Priority number, date | US201161529418P | 31.08.2011 Original published format: US 201161529418 P | [2014/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013033287 | Date: | 07.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2742097 | Date: | 18.06.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C08L77/00, C08K5/053, C08K5/06 | [2014/25] | CPC: |
C08K5/053 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C08L77/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08K3/40 (KR);
C08K5/06 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C08K5/34928 (CN);
C08K7/02 (KR);
C08K9/06 (KR);
C08L51/00 (KR);
C08L77/02 (CN,KR,US);
C08L77/06 (CN);
C08K2201/003 (CN);
C08K2201/005 (EP,KR,US);
C08L2201/02 (CN);
C08L2201/08 (CN);
C08L2205/03 (CN);
C08L2205/035 (CN)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/053, C08L77/00 (EP,US);
C08K5/053, C08L77/02 (CN);
C08K5/053, C08L77/06 (CN);
C08K5/06, C08L77/00 (US,EP);
C08K5/06, C08L77/02 (CN);
C08K5/06, C08L77/06 (CN);
C08K5/34928, C08L77/02 (CN);
C08K5/34928, C08L77/06 (CN); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/25] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN AUS POLYHYDRISCHEN ALKOHOLEN UND POLYAMIDEN | [2014/25] | English: | COMPOSITIONS OF POLYHYDRIC ALCOHOLS AND POLYAMIDES | [2014/25] | French: | COMPOSITIONS D'ALCOOLS POLYHYDRIQUES ET DE POLYAMIDES | [2014/25] | Entry into regional phase | 10.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/25] | 13.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/31] | 28.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.12.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2017 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US4786673 (MORIVAL GENEVIEVE [FR], et al) [X] 1-4,7,9,16-18,24-26,28-30,32,38 * column 1, line 10 - line 13 * * column 1, line 22 * * column 1, line 51 - column 2, line 2 * * column 2, line 21 - line 68 * * column 3, line 13 - line 45 * * examples V, IX-XI, XV-XVII, XXI-XXIII, XXVI, XXVII * * claims 1-3,5,8,11-14 * [Y] 1-15,20-23,27-32,54-70 [I] 6,10,19,22,31; | [XI]WO2008066850 (DU PONT [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,9,13,24-26 * page 1, line 5 - line 7 * * page 2, line 2 - line 25 * * page 4, line 5 - line 31 * * page 5, line 26 - page 6, line 25 * * page 7, line 9 - line 32 * * page 8, line 10 - line 24 * * example - * * claims 1-3,5-7,10,11 * [I] 7,13,14,20-23; | [Y]US6239219 (BREANT PATRICE [FR], et al) [Y] 28-32,54-70 * column 1, line 12 - line 18 * * column 2, line 19 - column 4 * * column 5, line 5 - line 43 * * example - * * claims 1-5 *; | [YD]US2010029819 (PALMER ROBERT J [FR], et al) [YD] 1-15,20-23,27 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0088] - paragraph [0095] * * paragraph [0099] - paragraph [0100] * * example - * * claims 1-3,7,8,10-14 *; | [A]WO2009083913 (SABIC INNOVATIVE PLASTICS IP [NL], et al) [A] 1-70 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0038] * * example - * * claims 1,11,13-18,21-23,25-27 * | by applicant | EP1041109 | US2010029819 | US4346194 | US6579581 | US7671127 | US6207737 | US6846855 | US7419721 | US7732047 |