EP2685878 - BRUSHHEAD FOR ELECTRIC SKIN BRUSH APPLIANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.02.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'OREAL 14 rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [2023/15] |
Former [2014/38] | For all designated states L'Oreal, S.A. 14 rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2014/04] | For all designated states Pacific Bioscience Laboratories, Inc. 17275 NE 6th Court Redmond, WA 98052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BREWER, Gerald, K. 23056 Northeast 61st Street Redmond, WA 98053 / US | 02 /
AKRIDGE, Robert, E. 9252 7th Avenue Northwest Seattle, WA 98117 / US | 03 /
PILCHER, Kenneth, A. 6029 Sycamore Avenue Northwest Seattle, WA 98107 / US | 04 /
REISHUS, Richard, A. 18804 136th Avenue Southeast Renton, WA 98058 / US | [2014/04] | Representative(s) | Faulkner, Thomas John Cleveland 10 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BR / GB | [2014/04] | Application number, filing date | 12758370.6 | 07.03.2012 | [2024/29] | WO2012US28083 | Priority number, date | US201113047611 | 14.03.2011 Original published format: US201113047611 | [2014/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012125370 | Date: | 20.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2685878 | Date: | 22.01.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2685878 | Date: | 17.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.09.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A47K7/04, A46B9/06, A46B13/00 | [2015/19] | CPC: |
A46B13/008 (EP,US);
A45D44/22 (KR);
A45D42/00 (KR);
A46B5/00 (KR);
A46B9/06 (EP,US);
A46B2200/102 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/04] | A47K7/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BÜRSTENKOPF FÜR EINE ELEKTRISCHE HAUTBÜRSTENANWENDUNG | [2014/04] | English: | BRUSHHEAD FOR ELECTRIC SKIN BRUSH APPLIANCE | [2014/04] | French: | TÊTE DE BROSSE POUR APPAREIL DE BROSSAGE DE PEAU ÉLECTRIQUE | [2014/04] | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2013 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.2013 | Search fee paid | 13.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2013 | Examination requested [2014/04] | 02.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.10.2023 | 05.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 14.02.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 29.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.02.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US6032313 (TSANG KOON KEUNG [HK]); | [XA]WO2006002183 (PACIFIC BIOSCIENCE LAB INC [US]); | [A]WO2007029201 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) | International search | [Y]US6751823 (BIRO LADISLAU [US], et al); | [Y]US2007101522 (ALFANO MARY [US]); | [Y]US7687944 (BENNING WOLTER [US], et al) | Examination | US6170108 | WO2006002109 | DE102007007610 | JP2009148461 | by applicant | WO2006002183 | US7786628 |