EP2754275 - DEVICES FOR SENDING AND RECEIVING QUANTIZATION QUALITY FEEDBACK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.08.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.09.2018 [2018/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2014/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GEIRHOFER, Stefan 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 02 /
GAAL, Peter 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | [2014/29] | Representative(s) | Wegner, Hans Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2014/29] | Application number, filing date | 12758977.8 | 07.09.2012 | WO2012US54119 | Priority number, date | US201161532219P | 08.09.2011 Original published format: US 201161532219 P | US201213605413 | 06.09.2012 Original published format: US201213605413 | [2014/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013036741 | Date: | 14.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2754275 | Date: | 16.07.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04L25/03, H04B7/04, H04L1/00, H04L1/06, H04L25/02 | [2014/29] | CPC: |
H04L1/0026 (EP,US);
H04L25/02 (KR);
H04B7/0417 (US);
H04B7/0478 (EP,US);
H04B7/065 (EP,US);
H04B7/0654 (EP,US);
H04L1/20 (EP,US);
H04L25/03955 (EP,US);
H04B7/024 (EP,US);
H04B7/0639 (EP,US);
H04L1/0003 (EP,US);
H04L1/0009 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/29] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN ZUM SENDEN UND EMPFANGEN VON QUANTISIERUNGS-QUALITÄTSFEEDBACKS | [2014/29] | English: | DEVICES FOR SENDING AND RECEIVING QUANTIZATION QUALITY FEEDBACK | [2014/29] | French: | DISPOSITIFS DESTINÉS À ENVOYER ET À RECEVOIR UN RETOUR DE QUALITÉ DE LA QUANTIFICATION | [2014/29] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2014 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/29] | 22.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/37] | 04.05.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/37] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.08.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2017 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2009219865 (SALZER THOMAS [FR], et al) [Y] 11,14,16,18,29,32,34,36,42,49 * abstract * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0145] * * paragraph [0164] * * paragraph [0178] * * paragraph [0190] *; | [I]US2010091892 (GOROKHOV ALEXEI Y [US]) [I] 8,10,15,17,26,28,33,35 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0156] * * paragraph [0161] *; | [X]EP2187533 (ALCATEL LUCENT [FR]) [X] 1,8,12,13,19,26,30,31,37,40,43,44,47,50 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0040] *; | [XI]EP2282431 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [X] 1,8,19,26,37,40,44,47 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0033] * [I] 2-4,9,20-22,27,38,39,41,45,46,48; | [XI]EP2357767 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]) [X] 1,8,19,26,37,40,44,47 * abstract * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0052] * [I] 5-7,23-25; | [XY] - XIN XIA ET AL, "Joint User Pairing and Precoding in MU-MIMO Broadcast Channel with Limited Feedback", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS LETTERS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20101101), vol. 14, no. 11, ISSN 1089-7798, pages 1032 - 1034, XP011319714 [X] 1,8,19,26,37,40,44,47 * abstract * * sections II, III.A, III.B, IV * [Y] 11,14,16,18,29,32,34,36,42,49 | [I] - KAIBIN HUANG ET AL, "Event-Driven Optimal Feedback Control for Multiantenna Beamforming", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SIGNAL PROCESSING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20100601), vol. 58, no. 6, ISSN 1053-587X, pages 3298 - 3312, XP011305552 [I] 1-4,8,9,19-22,26,27,37-41,44-48 * abstract * * sections I.A, I.B, II, III * | [A] - ISLAM M N ET AL, "Transceiver design using linear precoding in a multiuser multiple-input multiple-output system with limited feedback", IET COMMUNICATIONS,, (20110104), vol. 5, no. 1, doi:10.1049/IET-COM:20100015, ISSN 1751-8636, pages 27 - 38, XP006037362 [A] 2-4,9,20-22,27,38,39,41,45,46,48 * abstract * * sections 1, 3.1, 4.1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/IET-COM:20100015 | [A] - ZTE, "Consideration on Enhancement of MU-MIMO Feedback Schemes", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-100527 MU ENHANCEMENT, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20100112), vol. RAN WG1, no. Valencia, Spain; 20100118, XP050418156 [A] 5-7,23-25 * sections 1, 4.2, 4.3, 5 * | [A] - WEIBIN LI ET AL, "Codebook Based Beamforming in MIMO Broadcast Channels with Finite Rate Feedback", 2009 1ST INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INFORMATION SCIENCE AND ENGINEERING (ICISE 2009) - 26-28 DEC. 2009 - NANJING, CHINA, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20091226), ISBN 978-1-4244-4909-5, pages 2582 - 2585, XP031663158 [A] 10,15,17,28,33,35 * abstract * * sections I, II.B, III.A * | [A] - HWANG I ET AL, "Downlink transmission rate-control strategies for closed-loop multiple-input multiple-output systems", IET COMMUNICATIONS,, (20090406), vol. 3, no. 4, doi:10.1049/IET-COM:20080456, ISSN 1751-8636, pages 620 - 629, XP006032874 [A] 11,14,16,18,29,32,34,36,42,49 * figure 3 * * sections 1, 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/IET-COM:20080456 | [A] - WEI XU ET AL, "Limited Feedback Multiuser Scheduling of Spatially Correlated Broadcast Channels", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20091001), vol. 58, no. 8, doi:10.1109/TVT.2009.2020725, ISSN 0018-9545, pages 4406 - 4418, XP011268207 [A] 12,13,30,31,43,50 * abstract * * sections I, III, IV.B, IV.C * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TVT.2009.2020725 | by applicant | US5285945 | US5468253 | US6325810 | US7083075 | US7380696 | US7780685 | US20030374026 | US20030441632 | US20060541123 | US20070711979 | US20080031817 | US20100894351 | US20100894311 | US20100894318 | US20100894330 | US20100894361 | US20100894367 | US20100894388 | US20100894376 |