EP2760374 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR LOADING A STENT INTO A MEDICAL DELIVERY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.08.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.09.2017 [2017/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JenaValve Technology, Inc. 7545 Irvine Center Drive, Suite 100 Irvine, CA 92618 / US | [2016/16] |
Former [2014/36] | For all designated states JenaValve Technology GmbH Guerickestrasse 25 80805 München / DE | ||
Former [2014/32] | For all designated states Jenavalve Technology INC. Wilmington Downtown 1000 N. West Street, Suite 1200 Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STRAUBINGER, Helmut Am Vogelacker 10a 85609 Aschheim / DE | 02 /
JUNG, Johannes Im Oberdorf 13a 75181 Pforzheim-Huchenfeld / DE | 03 /
MAYER, Arnulf Ackerstrasse 13 8180 Bülach / CH | [2014/32] | Representative(s) | Trinks, Ole Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/32] | Trinks, Ole Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Depotstrasse 5 1/2 86199 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 12759092.5 | 10.09.2012 | WO2012EP67617 | Priority number, date | EP20110183541 | 30.09.2011 Original published format: EP 11183541 | [2014/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013045262 | Date: | 04.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2760374 | Date: | 06.08.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.04.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/24 | [2014/32] | CPC: |
A61F2/9525 (EP,US);
A61F2/95 (US);
A61F2/2418 (US);
A61F2/2436 (EP,US);
A61F2/9522 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/32] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM LADEN EINES STENTS IN EIN MEDIZINISCHES ABGABESYSTEM | [2014/32] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR LOADING A STENT INTO A MEDICAL DELIVERY SYSTEM | [2014/32] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE CHARGEMENT D'UNE ENDOPROTHÈSE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE POSE MÉDICALE | [2014/32] | Entry into regional phase | 19.02.2014 | National basic fee paid | 19.02.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/32] | 22.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/36] | 28.04.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2016 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2007239271 (NGUYEN THAN [US]) [X] 1,2,7-22 * the whole document * [I] 3-6; | [X]US2008221703 (QUE LIKE [US], et al) [X] 1,8,11,12,19,20 * paragraphs [0041] - [0042]; figures 3a-3e *; | [A]US2008071361 (TUVAL YOSI [IL], et al) [A] 1-22 * paragraphs [0628] - [0635]; figures 12-13 *; | [XP]WO2012106491 (ST JUDE MEDICAL [US], et al) [XP] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [XP]WO2012036742 (ST JUDE MEDICAL CARDIOLOGY DIV [US], et al) [XP] 1-22 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO2004019825 | WO2006076890 | US5911752 |