EP2690627 - DISK PLAYBACK DEVICE, DISK PLAYBACK METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.01.2020 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 7 OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2015/13] | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 7 OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | ||
Former [2015/12] | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | ||
Former [2014/05] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIRAMATSU, Yoshinori c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center IP Development Group 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
TAKEUCHI, Tatsuya c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center IP Development Group 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
TASAKI, Koichi c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center IP Development Group 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2014/05] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/05] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12760437.9 | 29.02.2012 | WO2012JP01366 | Priority number, date | JP20110063058 | 22.03.2011 Original published format: JP 2011063058 | [2014/05] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012127788 | Date: | 27.09.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2690627 | Date: | 29.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.09.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G11B27/10, G11B20/10, H04N5/76, H04N5/85, H04N5/93, G11B27/034, G11B27/11 | [2014/48] | CPC: |
H04N21/42646 (EP,US);
H04N9/80 (US);
G11B19/02 (EP,US);
G11B19/047 (EP,US);
G11B20/10 (EP,US);
G11B27/105 (EP,US);
G11B27/11 (EP,US);
H04N21/4325 (EP,US);
H04N21/8455 (EP,US);
H04N9/8205 (EP,US);
G11B2020/10972 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2541 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/05] | G11B27/10, G11B20/10, H04N5/76, H04N5/85, H04N5/93 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/05] | Title | German: | SCHEIBENABSPIELVORRICHTUNG, SCHEIBENABSPIELVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM DAFÜR | [2014/05] | English: | DISK PLAYBACK DEVICE, DISK PLAYBACK METHOD, AND PROGRAM | [2014/05] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE LECTURE DE DISQUE, PROCÉDÉ DE LECTURE DE DISQUE ET PROGRAMME ASSOCIÉ | [2014/05] | Entry into regional phase | 04.04.2013 | Translation filed | 04.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | 04.04.2013 | Search fee paid | 15.05.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.2013 | Examination requested [2014/05] | 19.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.01.2020 | 01.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/08] | 11.10.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/08] | 14.01.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.03.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006158969 (HAMADA TOSHIYA [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0338] - [0446] *; | [A]WO2009057298 (PANASONIC CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2009259356 (FUJITSU TEN LTD) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [I]US2010008653 (IWASAKI TAKAO [JP], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0005] , [0006] , [0012] - [0015] - [0024] , [0025] , [0029] , [0032] , [0047] , [0051] - [0095]; figures 1-3,6-11 *; | [A]JP2010033628 (PANASONIC CORP) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]WO2010047123 (PANASONIC CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]WO2010064433 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [I]US2010189416 (KAWAKAMI YOSHIO [JP]) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0007] , [0009] , [0010] , [0098] , [0114] - [0118] - [0123] - [0134] - [0137] - [0168] *; | [P]EP2339843 (PANASONIC CORP [JP]) [P] * paragraphs [0050] - [0056]; figures 3A,3B,4A,4B,5A,5B,8 *; | [P]US2011211808 (RYU TOMOAKI [JP]) [P] * paragraphs [0037] , [0038] , [0052] - [0069] * | International search | [A]JP2009259356 (FUJITSU TEN LTD); | [A]JP2010020862 (FUJITSU TEN LTD); | [A]JP2010033628 (PANASONIC CORP) | by applicant | WO2009057298 | JP2010033628 |