EP2685920 - DEVICE FOR RETROVERSION CORRECTION FOR SHOULDER ARTHROPLASTY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/04] | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR RETROVERSION CORRECTION FOR SHOULDER ARTHROPLASTY | ||
[2017/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2018 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DePuy Synthes Products, LLC 325 Paramount Drive Raynham, MA 02767-0350 / US | [2014/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE WILDE, Lieven Noendries 29 9000 Gent / BE | 02 /
LAPPIN, Kyle 335 Hidden Creek Road Lake Zurich, IL 60047 / US | [2014/04] | Representative(s) | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Arena Point Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [2017/21] |
Former [2014/04] | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 12760666.3 | 14.03.2012 | [2017/21] | WO2012US29021 | Priority number, date | US201113051041 | 18.03.2011 Original published format: US201113051041 | [2014/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012129019 | Date: | 27.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2685920 | Date: | 22.01.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.09.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2685920 | Date: | 24.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.09.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/56, A61F2/40, A61B17/17, A61F2/30 | [2014/24] | CPC: |
A61F2/4081 (EP,CN,US);
A61B17/1778 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2002/3023 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2002/30736 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2002/30769 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2002/30881 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2002/30892 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/04] | A61B17/56 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR RÜCKKORREKTUR EINER SCHULTERARTHROPLASTIE | [2017/01] | English: | DEVICE FOR RETROVERSION CORRECTION FOR SHOULDER ARTHROPLASTY | [2017/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CORRECTION DE LA RÉTROVERSION D'UNE ARTHROPLASTIE DE L'ÉPAULE | [2017/01] |
Former [2014/04] | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR RÜCKKORREKTUR EINER SCHULTERARTHROPLASTIE | ||
Former [2014/04] | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR RETROVERSION CORRECTION FOR SHOULDER ARTHROPLASTY | ||
Former [2014/04] | DISPOSITIF ET MÉTHODE DE CORRECTION DE LA RÉTROVERSION D'UNE ARTHROPLASTIE DE L'ÉPAULE | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2013 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.2013 | Search fee paid | 13.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2013 | Examination requested [2014/04] | 04.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP16167719.0 / EP3078339 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.12.2016 | Opposition(s) | 27.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.03.2012 | AL | 24.05.2017 | AT | 24.05.2017 | CY | 24.05.2017 | CZ | 24.05.2017 | DK | 24.05.2017 | EE | 24.05.2017 | FI | 24.05.2017 | HR | 24.05.2017 | LT | 24.05.2017 | LV | 24.05.2017 | MC | 24.05.2017 | MK | 24.05.2017 | PL | 24.05.2017 | PT | 24.05.2017 | RO | 24.05.2017 | RS | 24.05.2017 | SE | 24.05.2017 | SI | 24.05.2017 | SK | 24.05.2017 | SM | 24.05.2017 | TR | 24.05.2017 | BG | 24.08.2017 | NO | 24.08.2017 | GR | 25.08.2017 | IS | 24.09.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 14.03.2012 | |
AT | 24.05.2017 | ||
CY | 24.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
MC | 24.05.2017 | ||
MK | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
PT | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SI | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
SM | 24.05.2017 | ||
TR | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 14.03.2012 | |
AT | 24.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
MC | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
PT | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SI | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
SM | 24.05.2017 | ||
TR | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
MC | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SI | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
SM | 24.05.2017 | ||
TR | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
MC | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SI | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
SM | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SI | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
SM | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
SM | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4964865 (BURKHEAD WAYNE Z [US], et al) [Y] 1-8 * figures 3,7 *; | [A]FR2704747 (MEDINOV SA [FR]) [A] 6* figures 1,7 *; | [Y]US5800551 (WILLIAMSON DANIEL E [US], et al) [Y] 1-8 * figures 1-3,4C *; | [A]US6364910 (SHULTZ JASON M [US], et al) [A] 4 * figures 2-4,13 *; | [Y]US2007038302 (SHULTZ JASON M [US], et al) [Y] 1-8 * figures 3,4,7A,7B *; | [XI]US2011035013 (WINSLOW NATHAN A [US], et al) [X] 1 * figures 11,12,19A,19B * * paragraphs [0041] , [0050] * [I] 2-8 | International search | [Y]US5030219 (MATSEN III FREDERICK A [US], et al); | [Y]US5324295 (SHAPIRO MICHAEL R [US]); | [Y]US5800551 (WILLIAMSON DANIEL E [US], et al); | [Y]US6699289 (IANNOTTI JOSEPH P [US], et al); | [Y]US2005278030 (TORNIER ALAIN [FR], et al); | [A]US2006111787 (BAILIE DAVID S [US], et al); | [A]US2006195194 (GUNTHER STEPHEN B [US]) |