EP2729898 - AN ELECTRONIC DATA SHARING DEVICE AND METHOD OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings | 03.07.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Blendology Limited Blaid House 6 Broad Street Great Cambourne, Cambridgeshire CB23 6HJ / GB | [2014/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEMPSTER, Philip Edward Blendology Limited Blaid House 6 Broad Street Great Cambourne Cambridgeshire CB23 6HJ / GB | 02 /
MUNDAY, Balbir Singh Blendology Limited Blaid House 6 Broad Street Great Cambourne Cambridgeshire CB23 6HJ / GB | 03 /
OSTROWSKI, Dominic Jan Blendology Limited Blaid House 6 Broad Street Great Cambourne Cambridgeshire CB23 6HJ / GB | [2014/20] | Representative(s) | Torrance, Bruce James Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/20] | Wright, Simon Mark, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 12761548.2 | 09.07.2012 | WO2012EP63384 | Priority number, date | US201161506108P | 10.07.2011 Original published format: US 201161506108 P | [2014/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013007682 | Date: | 17.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2729898 | Date: | 14.05.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/60 | [2014/20] | CPC: |
G06F21/6245 (EP,US);
G06F21/606 (US);
H04L9/0825 (EP,US);
H04L9/088 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/20] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG FÜR GEMEINSAME DATENNUTZUNG UND VERWENDUNGSVERFAHREN | [2014/20] | English: | AN ELECTRONIC DATA SHARING DEVICE AND METHOD OF USE | [2014/20] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE DE PARTAGE DE DONNÉES ET PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION | [2014/20] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2014 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/20] | 09.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.06.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 21.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.05.2020 | 14.05.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 01.07.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/32] | 01.07.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 02.09.2020 | 02.09.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.11.2018 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 21.08.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 21.08.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.09.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2006095369 (HOFI EYAL [IL]) [A] 1-25 * paragraph [0150] - paragraph [0152] *; | [A]US2006212706 (JIANG WEI [US], et al) [A] 1,14 * paragraph [0024] ** paragraph [0027] *; | [I]US2008082557 (OHARA KIYOTAKA [JP], et al) [I] 1-25 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0042]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0068] * * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0081] * * paragraph [0107] * | Examination | - M'RAIHI VERISIGN M BELLARE UCSD F HOORNAERT VASCO D NACCACHE GEMPLUS O RANEN ALADDIN D, "HOTP: An HMAC-Based One-Time Password Algorithm; rfc4226.txt", HOTP: AN HMAC-BASED ONE-TIME PASSWORD ALGORITHM; RFC4226.TXT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF; STANDARD, INTERNET SOCIETY (ISOC) 4, RUE DES FALAISES CH- 1205 GENEVA, SWITZERLAND, (20051201), XP015054903 |