EP2760310 - CARE-SUBSTANCE APPLICATOR FOR APPLYING A CARE SUBSTANCE TO A STRAND OF HAIR, AND CARE-SUBSTANCE CARTRIDGE THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 28.09.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2019 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WIK Far East Ltd Unit B, 23 F Manulife Tower 169, Electric Road North Point Hong Kong / CN | [2014/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOCK, Marwin Zur Wöllenbök 20 45239 Essen / DE | [2014/32] | Representative(s) | Haverkamp, Jens Gartenstrasse 61 58636 Iserlohn / DE | [2018/44] |
Former [2015/43] | Haverkamp, Jens Patentanwalt Stefanstraße 2 Kirchhoffgebäude 58638 Iserlohn / DE | ||
Former [2014/32] | Haverkamp, Jens Patentanwalt Stefanstraße 2 Kirchhoffgebäude 58638 Iserlohn / DE | Application number, filing date | 12762276.9 | 20.09.2012 | [2015/43] | WO2012EP68488 | Priority number, date | DE20112051481U | 29.09.2011 Original published format: DE 202011051481 U | [2014/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013045331 | Date: | 04.04.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2760310 | Date: | 06.08.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.04.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2760310 | Date: | 21.10.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/43] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2760310 | Date: | 31.10.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A45D1/04, A45D19/00, A45D19/16, A45D34/04, A45D2/00, A45D1/00 | [2014/32] | CPC: |
A45D1/04 (EP);
A45D19/0066 (EP);
A45D19/012 (EP);
A45D19/16 (EP);
A45D2/001 (EP);
A45D34/045 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/32] | Title | German: | PFLEGESTOFFAPPLIKATOR ZUM APPLIZIEREN EINES PFLEGESTOFFES AN EINE HAARSTRÄHNE SOWIE PFLEGESTOFFKARTUSCHE DAFÜR | [2014/32] | English: | CARE-SUBSTANCE APPLICATOR FOR APPLYING A CARE SUBSTANCE TO A STRAND OF HAIR, AND CARE-SUBSTANCE CARTRIDGE THEREFOR | [2014/32] | French: | APPLICATEUR DE SOIN DESTINÉ À APPLIQUER UN SOIN SUR UNE MÈCHE DE CHEVEUX ET CARTOUCHE DE SOIN POUR LEDIT APPLICATEUR | [2014/32] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/32] | 02.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 31.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
20.07.2016
29.08.2016
ADMISSIBLE Bandpay & Greuter 30, rue Notre-Dame des Victoires 75002 Paris / FR Opponent's representative Bandpay & Greuter 11 rue Christophe Colomb 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/34] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.07.2016
Bandpay & Greuter 30, rue Notre-Dame des Victoires 75002 Paris / FR Opponent's representative Bandpay & Greuter 30, rue Notre-Dame des Victoires 75002 Paris / FR | 05.09.2016 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 11.01.2017 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 15.02.2018 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 15.02.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.04.2018 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 24.04.2018 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 28.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 14.09.2018 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.09.2012 | AL | 21.10.2015 | BG | 21.10.2015 | CY | 21.10.2015 | CZ | 21.10.2015 | DK | 21.10.2015 | EE | 21.10.2015 | ES | 21.10.2015 | FI | 21.10.2015 | HR | 21.10.2015 | IT | 21.10.2015 | LT | 21.10.2015 | LV | 21.10.2015 | MC | 21.10.2015 | MK | 21.10.2015 | MT | 21.10.2015 | NL | 21.10.2015 | PL | 21.10.2015 | RO | 21.10.2015 | RS | 21.10.2015 | SE | 21.10.2015 | SI | 21.10.2015 | SK | 21.10.2015 | SM | 21.10.2015 | TR | 21.10.2015 | NO | 21.01.2016 | GR | 22.01.2016 | IS | 21.02.2016 | PT | 22.02.2016 | GB | 20.09.2016 | IE | 20.09.2016 | LU | 20.09.2016 | BE | 30.09.2016 | CH | 30.09.2016 | LI | 30.09.2016 | AT | 20.09.2017 | [2019/10] |
Former [2018/46] | HU | 20.09.2012 | |
AL | 21.10.2015 | ||
BG | 21.10.2015 | ||
CY | 21.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
MK | 21.10.2015 | ||
MT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
TR | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
GB | 20.09.2016 | ||
IE | 20.09.2016 | ||
LU | 20.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/45] | HU | 20.09.2012 | |
BG | 21.10.2015 | ||
CY | 21.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
MK | 21.10.2015 | ||
MT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
TR | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
GB | 20.09.2016 | ||
IE | 20.09.2016 | ||
LU | 20.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/38] | HU | 20.09.2012 | |
BG | 21.10.2015 | ||
CY | 21.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
MK | 21.10.2015 | ||
MT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
GB | 20.09.2016 | ||
IE | 20.09.2016 | ||
LU | 20.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 20.09.2012 | |
CY | 21.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
MK | 21.10.2015 | ||
MT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
GB | 20.09.2016 | ||
IE | 20.09.2016 | ||
LU | 20.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 20.09.2012 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
MK | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
GB | 20.09.2016 | ||
IE | 20.09.2016 | ||
LU | 20.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/41] | CZ | 21.10.2015 | |
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
GB | 20.09.2016 | ||
IE | 20.09.2016 | ||
LU | 20.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/31] | CZ | 21.10.2015 | |
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/12] | CZ | 21.10.2015 | |
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | CZ | 21.10.2015 | |
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | CZ | 21.10.2015 | |
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | CZ | 21.10.2015 | |
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 21.10.2015 | |
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 21.10.2015 | |
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
LT | 21.10.2015 | Cited in | International search | [I]WO9949797 (WARTNER B V [NL], et al) [I] 1-6,8-13 * figure - *; | [X]US6447191 (VASAS MARTIN M [US]) [X] 1-6,8-13 * columns 1-10; figure - *; | [A]WO2004041021 (CONAIR [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2953376 (OREAL [FR]) [A] 1-14* the whole document * | Opposition | US945647 | WO2009148106 | JP2008253424 | JP2008054877 | WO2009078046 | WO2004041021 | EP1515629 | EP1515629 |