EP2760575 - REACTOR WITH A DISTRIBUTION TRAY FOR DISTRIBUTING A POLYPHASIC MIXTURE WITH INCLINED PERIPHERAL CONDUITS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/32] | DISTRIBUTION TRAY FOR DISTRIBUTING A POLYPHASIC MIXTURE WITH INCLINED PERIPHERAL CONDUITS | ||
[2017/13] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.05.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IFP Energies nouvelles 1 & 4 avenue de Bois-Préau 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | [2017/44] |
Former [2017/29] | For all designated states IFP Énergies nouvelles 1 & 4, avenue de Bois-Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2014/32] | For all designated states IFP Energies nouvelles Direction Propriété Industrielle 1 & 4 Avenue de Bois-Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAZER-BACHI, Frederic 21 Chemin des Laies F-69540 Irigny / FR | 02 /
AUGIER, Frederic 0029 Avenue du 8 Mai 1945 F-69360 Saint Symphorien d'Ozon / FR | 03 /
HAROUN, Yacine 13 rue Coteaux du Lyonnais Lotissement les Jardins de Mai F-69200 Grigny / FR | 04 /
BOYER, Christophe 626 rue de la Brosse F-69390 Charly / FR | [2014/32] | Application number, filing date | 12762331.2 | 10.09.2012 | [2017/29] | WO2012FR00355 | Priority number, date | FR20110002982 | 30.09.2011 Original published format: FR 1102982 | [2014/32] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013045770 | Date: | 04.04.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2760575 | Date: | 06.08.2014 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.04.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2760575 | Date: | 19.07.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B01J8/02, C10G49/00 | [2014/32] | CPC: |
B01J8/0492 (EP,US);
B01J19/0053 (US);
B01J8/008 (EP,US);
B01J8/0278 (EP,US);
C10G49/002 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00761 (US);
C10G2300/202 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REAKTOR MIT EINEM VERTEILUNGSSCHALE ZUR VERTEILUNG EINER MEHRPHASIGEN MISCHUNG MIT GENEIGTEN PERIPHEREN LEITUNGEN | [2017/13] | English: | REACTOR WITH A DISTRIBUTION TRAY FOR DISTRIBUTING A POLYPHASIC MIXTURE WITH INCLINED PERIPHERAL CONDUITS | [2017/13] | French: | RÉACTEUR AVEC UN PLATEAU DISTRIBUTEUR POUR LA DISTRIBUTION D'UN MÉLANGE POLYPHASIQUE AVEC CHEMINÉES INCLINÉES EN PÉRIPHÉRIE | [2017/13] |
Former [2014/32] | VERTEILUNGSSCHALE ZUR VERTEILUNG EINER MEHRPHASIGEN MISCHUNG MIT GENEIGTEN PERIPHEREN LEITUNGEN | ||
Former [2014/32] | DISTRIBUTION TRAY FOR DISTRIBUTING A POLYPHASIC MIXTURE WITH INCLINED PERIPHERAL CONDUITS | ||
Former [2014/32] | PLATEAU DISTRIBUTEUR POUR LA DISTRIBUTION D'UN MÉLANGE POLYPHASIQUE AVEC CHEMINÉES INCLINÉES EN PÉRIPHÉRIE | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2014 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/32] | 28.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.03.2017 | Opposition(s) | 20.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.09.2012 | AL | 19.07.2017 | AT | 19.07.2017 | CY | 19.07.2017 | CZ | 19.07.2017 | DK | 19.07.2017 | EE | 19.07.2017 | ES | 19.07.2017 | FI | 19.07.2017 | HR | 19.07.2017 | IT | 19.07.2017 | LT | 19.07.2017 | LV | 19.07.2017 | MC | 19.07.2017 | MK | 19.07.2017 | MT | 19.07.2017 | PL | 19.07.2017 | PT | 19.07.2017 | RO | 19.07.2017 | RS | 19.07.2017 | SE | 19.07.2017 | SI | 19.07.2017 | SK | 19.07.2017 | SM | 19.07.2017 | TR | 19.07.2017 | IE | 10.09.2017 | LU | 10.09.2017 | CH | 30.09.2017 | LI | 30.09.2017 | BG | 19.10.2017 | NO | 19.10.2017 | GR | 20.10.2017 | IS | 19.11.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 10.09.2012 | |
AT | 19.07.2017 | ||
CY | 19.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
MK | 19.07.2017 | ||
MT | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PT | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
TR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IE | 10.09.2017 | ||
LU | 10.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 10.09.2012 | |
AT | 19.07.2017 | ||
CY | 19.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
MK | 19.07.2017 | ||
MT | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
TR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IE | 10.09.2017 | ||
LU | 10.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 10.09.2012 | |
AT | 19.07.2017 | ||
CY | 19.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
MK | 19.07.2017 | ||
MT | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
IE | 10.09.2017 | ||
LU | 10.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 10.09.2012 | |
AT | 19.07.2017 | ||
CY | 19.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
MT | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
IE | 10.09.2017 | ||
LU | 10.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 10.09.2012 | |
AT | 19.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
MT | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
IE | 10.09.2017 | ||
LU | 10.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
MT | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
IE | 10.09.2017 | ||
LU | 10.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
IE | 10.09.2017 | ||
LU | 10.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
IE | 10.09.2017 | ||
LU | 10.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/26] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 19.07.2017 | |
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 19.07.2017 | |
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 19.07.2017 | |
NO | 19.10.2017 | Cited in | International search | [AD]FR2853260 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR]) [AD] 1-7 * abstract *; | [A]EP2075056 (PETROLEO BRASILEIRO SA [BR]) [A] 1-7 * abstract *; | [A]US2011081282 (PARIMI KRISHNIAH [US], et al) [A] 1-7* abstract * | by applicant | FR2745202 | FR2807676 | FR2853260 | US2007241467 |