EP2741903 - CONTROLLING MOISTURE IN BIORESORBABLE POLYMERS FOR MELT PROCESSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/25] | CONTROLLING MOISTURE IN AND PLASTICIZATION OF BIORESORBABLE POLYMER FOR MELT PROCESSING | ||
[2017/12] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.07.2018 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.03.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Abbott Cardiovascular Systems Inc. 3200 Lakeside Drive Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | [2014/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEICHEN, Bethany 3145 Octavia, Apartment 4 San Francisco, California 94123 / US | 02 /
PACETTI, Stephen, D. 4578 Madoc Way San Jose, California 95130 / US | 03 /
GADA, Manish 355 Burnett Avenue Santa Clara, California 95051 / US | 04 /
GLAUSER, Thierry 408 Quartz Street Redwood City, California 94062 / US | 05 /
KLEINER, Lothar, W. 221 Main St. POBox 87 Los Altos, California 94023-0087 / US | 06 /
WANG, Yunbing 1565 Klamath Drive Sunnyvale, California 94087 / US | 07 /
OBERHAUSER, James, P. 20561 Lomita Avenue Saratoga, California 95070 / US | 08 /
DING, Ni 4103 Cortona Court San Jose, California 95135 / US | [2017/38] |
Former [2014/36] | 01 /
STEICHEN, Bethany 3145 Octavia Apartment 4 San Francisco, California 94123 / US | ||
02 /
PACETTI, Stephen, D. 4578 Madoc Way San Jose, California 95130 / US | |||
03 /
GADA, Manish 355 Burnett Avenue Santa Clara, California 95051 / US | |||
04 /
GLAUSER, Thierry 408 Quartz Street Redwood City, California 94062 / US | |||
05 /
KLEINER, Lothar, W. 221 Main St. POBox ?87 Los Altos, California 94023-0087 / US | |||
06 /
WANG, Yunbing 1565 Klamath Drive Sunnyvale, California 94087 / US | |||
07 /
OBERHAUSER, James, P. 20561Lomita Avenue Saratoga, California 95070 / US | |||
08 /
DING, Ni 4103 Cortona Court San Jose, California 95135 / US | |||
Former [2014/25] | 01 /
STEICHEN, Bethany 3145 Octavia Apartment 4 San Francisco, California 94123 / US | ||
02 /
PACETTI, Stephen, D. 4578 Madoc Way San Jose, California 95130 / US | |||
03 /
GADA, Manish 355 Burnett Avenue Santa Clara, California 95051 / US | |||
04 /
GLAUSER, Thierry 408 Quartz Street Redwood City, California 94062 / US | |||
05 /
KLEINER, Lothar, W. 295 Los Altos Court Los Altos, California 94022 / US | |||
06 /
WANG, Yunbing 1565 Klamath Drive Sunnyvale, California 94087 / US | |||
07 /
OBERHAUSER, James, P. 20561Lomita Avenue Saratoga, California 95070 / US | |||
08 /
DING, Ni 4103 Cortona Court San Jose, California 95135 / US | Representative(s) | ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen Rambla Catalunya, 123 08008 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2017/38] | ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen Plaza Catalunya, 1 08002 Barcelona / ES | ||
Former [2014/25] | ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen Plaza Catalunya, 1 08002 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 12762696.8 | 06.08.2012 | [2017/38] | WO2012US49775 | Priority number, date | US201113207656 | 11.08.2011 Original published format: US201113207656 | [2014/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013022851 | Date: | 14.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2741903 | Date: | 18.06.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2741903 | Date: | 20.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B29C47/10, B29B13/06, B29C47/92, B29C47/76 | [2014/25] | CPC: |
B29B13/06 (EP,CN,US);
B29C48/143 (US);
B29B13/065 (US);
B29C48/0022 (EP,US);
B29C48/05 (EP,CN,US);
B29C48/08 (EP,CN,US);
B29C48/09 (EP,CN,US);
B29C48/267 (EP,US);
B29C48/276 (EP,US);
B29C48/277 (EP,US);
B29C48/287 (EP,CN,US);
B29C48/288 (EP,US);
B29C48/76 (EP,CN,US);
B29C48/92 (EP,CN,US);
B29C2948/922 (EP,CN,US);
B29C2948/92228 (EP,CN,US);
B29C2948/92333 (EP,US);
B29C2948/92342 (EP,CN,US);
B29C2948/92695 (EP,CN,US);
B29C2948/92704 (EP,CN,US);
B29C2948/92723 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REGELUNG DER FEUCHTIGKEIT IN BIORESORBIERBAREN POLYMEREN FÜR SCHMELZVERFAHREN | [2017/12] | English: | CONTROLLING MOISTURE IN BIORESORBABLE POLYMERS FOR MELT PROCESSING | [2017/12] | French: | RÉGLAGE DE L'HUMIDITÉ DANS LES POLYMÈRES BIORÉSORBABLES POUR UN TRAITEMENT À L'ÉTAT FONDU | [2017/13] |
Former [2014/25] | STEUERUNG DER FEUCHTIGKEIT IN UND WEICHMACHUNG VON EINEM BIORESORBIERBAREN POLYMER FÜR SCHMELZVERFAHREN | ||
Former [2014/25] | CONTROLLING MOISTURE IN AND PLASTICIZATION OF BIORESORBABLE POLYMER FOR MELT PROCESSING | ||
Former [2014/25] | RÉGLAGE DE L'HUMIDITÉ DANS UN POLYMÈRE BIORÉSORBABLE ET DE LA PLASTIFICATION DE CELUI-CI POUR UN TRAITEMENT À L'ÉTAT FONDU | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/25] | 29.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.10.2016 | Opposition(s) | 21.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.08.2012 | AL | 20.09.2017 | AT | 20.09.2017 | CY | 20.09.2017 | CZ | 20.09.2017 | DK | 20.09.2017 | EE | 20.09.2017 | ES | 20.09.2017 | FI | 20.09.2017 | HR | 20.09.2017 | IT | 20.09.2017 | LT | 20.09.2017 | LV | 20.09.2017 | MC | 20.09.2017 | MK | 20.09.2017 | NL | 20.09.2017 | PL | 20.09.2017 | PT | 20.09.2017 | RO | 20.09.2017 | RS | 20.09.2017 | SE | 20.09.2017 | SI | 20.09.2017 | SK | 20.09.2017 | SM | 20.09.2017 | TR | 20.09.2017 | BG | 20.12.2017 | NO | 20.12.2017 | GR | 21.12.2017 | IS | 20.01.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 06.08.2012 | |
AT | 20.09.2017 | ||
CY | 20.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
MC | 20.09.2017 | ||
MK | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PT | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
TR | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 06.08.2012 | |
AT | 20.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
MC | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PT | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
TR | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
MC | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
TR | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
MC | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 20.09.2017 | |
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/15] | FI | 20.09.2017 | |
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | FI | 20.09.2017 | |
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | FI | 20.09.2017 | |
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 20.09.2017 | |
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 20.09.2017 | |
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 20.09.2017 | |
NO | 20.12.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2000006142 (NIPPON SHIKAN KOGYO KK) [A] 1-3,5-7,9 * abstract ** paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0029] *; | [X]EP1473316 (DAICEL CHEM [JP]) [X] 1-3,5,6,9 * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0093] * * paragraph [0096] * * table 2 *; | [XI]WO2010095656 (KUREHA CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,6,9 * abstract * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0022] * * table 1 * [I] 2,7; | [XI]US2011174434 (HSIAO FU-SHIH [TW]) [X] 1,3,6,9 * abstract * * paragraph [0016] * * claims 2,9 * * figures 1-4 * [I] 7 | Examination | JP2004209878 | JP2007145361 | by applicant | US2007283552 | - VODA, S. ET AL., POLYMER, (2004), vol. 45, pages 7839 - 7843 | - LIAO, X. ET AL., POLYMER INT, (2010), vol. 59, pages 1709 - 1718 | - L. H. VAN VLACK, Elements of Materials Science and Engineering, ADDISON-WESLEY, (1989), pages 270 - 271 |