EP2693459 - POLISHING COMPOSITION AND POLISHING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.09.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.10.2015 [2015/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujimi Incorporated 1-1 Chiryo 2-chome Nishibiwajima-cho Kiyosu-shi, Aichi 452-8502 / JP | [2014/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAMADA, Shuichi c/o FUJIMI INCORPORATED 1-1 Chiryo 2-chome Nishibiwajima-cho Kiyosu-shi Aichi 452-8502 / JP | 02 /
HIRANO, Tatsuhiko c/o FUJIMI INCORPORATED 1-1 Chiryo 2-chome Nishibiwajima-cho Kiyosu-shi Aichi 452-8502 / JP | 03 /
IZAWA, Yoshihiro c/o FUJIMI INCORPORATED 1-1 Chiryo 2-chome Nishibiwajima-cho Kiyosu-shi Aichi 452-8502 / JP | 04 /
ONISHI, Shogo c/o FUJIMI INCORPORATED 1-1 Chiryo 2-chome Nishibiwajima-cho Kiyosu-shi Aichi 452-8502 / JP | [2014/06] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/06] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12763096.0 | 28.03.2012 | WO2012JP58195 | Priority number, date | JP20110076475 | 30.03.2011 Original published format: JP 2011076475 | JP20110122438 | 31.05.2011 Original published format: JP 2011122438 | [2014/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012133561 | Date: | 04.10.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2693459 | Date: | 05.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.10.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/321, C09K3/14, C09G1/02 | [2015/17] | CPC: |
C09G1/02 (EP,US);
H01L21/304 (KR);
C23F3/06 (US);
C09K3/14 (KR);
C09K3/1409 (EP,US);
H01L21/3212 (EP,US);
C09K3/1463 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/06] | H01L21/304, B24B37/00, C09K3/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/06] | Title | German: | POLIERZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND POLIERVERFAHREN | [2014/06] | English: | POLISHING COMPOSITION AND POLISHING METHOD | [2014/06] | French: | COMPOSITE DE POLISSAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE POLISSAGE | [2014/06] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2013 | Translation filed | 25.10.2013 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2013 | Search fee paid | 25.10.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/06] | 18.09.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004092106 (MARTYAK NICHOLAS [US], et al) [X] 1-5,14-16 * paragraphs [0044] - [0054] - [0056] , [0059] , [0060] *; | [X]JP2008085145 (FUJIFILM CORP) [X] 1-5,14-16 * paragraphs [0006] , [0009] , [0011] - [0019] - [0028] , [0031] - [0060]; table 1 * * paragraphs [0062] , [0078] - [0085]; tables 3,4 *; | [X]US2009239380 (TOMIGA TAKAMITSU [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,14-16 * paragraphs [0017] - [0023] - [0045] - [0052] - [0072] , [0073] , [0081] , [0083] , [0093] , [0100] , [0101] , [0105] - [0109] *; | [X]JP2010010575 (FUJIFILM CORP) [X] 1-5,14-16 * paragraphs [0014] - [0018] - [0029] , [0034] , [0046] - [0049] - [0056] , [0058]; example 1 *; | [X]KR20100091292 (TECHNO SEMICHEM CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-5,14-16* paragraphs [0011] , [0017] - [0020] - [0023] - [0027] * | International search | [X]JP2008085145 (FUJIFILM CORP) | by applicant | JPS62102543 | JPH0883780 | JP2000501771 | JP2006506809 |