EP2689292 - RESIST PATTERN FORMING METHOD, RESIST PATTERN, CROSSLINKABLE NEGATIVE CHEMICAL AMPLIFICATION RESIST COMPOSITION FOR ORGANIC SOLVENT DEVELOPMENT, RESIST FILM AND RESIST-COATED MASK BLANKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2015 [2015/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-0031 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2014/05] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-0031 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSUCHIHASHI, Toru c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 4000, Kawashiri Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka / JP | 02 /
YATSUO, Tadateru c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 4000, Kawashiri Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka / JP | 03 /
TAKAHASHI, Koutarou c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 4000, Kawashiri Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka / JP | 04 /
TSUCHIMURA, Tomotaka c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 4000, Kawashiri Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka / JP | [2014/05] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/05] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12764533.1 | 17.02.2012 | WO2012JP54478 | Priority number, date | JP20110068467 | 25.03.2011 Original published format: JP 2011068467 | [2014/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012132676 | Date: | 04.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2689292 | Date: | 29.01.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.10.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/038, C08F12/14, G03F7/32, H01L21/027 | [2014/05] | CPC: |
C08F212/24 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/0382 (EP,KR,US);
C08F12/24 (US);
C08F212/12 (KR);
C08F212/22 (EP,US);
C08F212/26 (EP,US);
C08F212/30 (EP,US);
C08F212/32 (KR);
C08F8/14 (EP,KR,US);
C08J3/24 (EP,KR,US);
G03F1/50 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/004 (US);
G03F7/0047 (KR);
G03F7/20 (KR,US);
G03F7/325 (EP,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F212/24, C08F212/22 (EP,US);
C08F212/24, C08F212/22, C08F212/32 (EP,US);
C08F212/24, C08F212/32 (EP,US);
C08F8/14, C08F212/24 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/05] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR FORMUNG EINER LACKSTRUKTUR, LACKSTRUKTUR, VERNETZBARE CHEMISCH VERSTÄRKTE NEGATIVE LACKZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR ENTWICKLUNG EINES ORGANISCHEN LÖSUNGSMITTELS, LACKFILM UND LACKBESCHICHTETE MASKENROHLINGE | [2014/05] | English: | RESIST PATTERN FORMING METHOD, RESIST PATTERN, CROSSLINKABLE NEGATIVE CHEMICAL AMPLIFICATION RESIST COMPOSITION FOR ORGANIC SOLVENT DEVELOPMENT, RESIST FILM AND RESIST-COATED MASK BLANKS | [2014/05] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION D'UN MOTIF DE RÉSERVE, COMPOSITION DE RÉSERVE À AMPLIFICATION CHIMIQUE NÉGATIVE RÉTICULABLE POUR PERMETTRE LE DÉVELOPPEMENT DE SOLVANT ORGANIQUE, FILM DE RÉSERVE ET ÉBAUCHES DE MASQUE RECOUVERTES DE RÉSERVE | [2014/05] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.2013 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.2013 | Search fee paid | 18.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.09.2013 | Examination requested [2014/05] | 12.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/46] | 22.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1791025 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0004] , [0031] - [0046] - [0065]; claims 1,6,8 *; | [A]US2010081085 (ANDO NOBUO [JP], et al) [A] 1-12* paragraphs [0016] , [0020] , [0142]; example 1; claims 1-3 *; | [E]WO2012098822 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP], et al) [E] 1,3,5,8-12 * pages 16,17,33 * * polymer (A1) to (A10); composition N1 to N19; pages 34-40,50; example 1E to 19E; claims 1-4,8,11,14,15 * * page 57, lines 2-3 * * page 1, paragraph 1 * | International search | [A]WO2010087516 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP], et al); | [AP]JP2011065105 (FUJIFILM CORP); | [AP]JP2011191740 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO) |