EP2753807 - FLOW BODY, MASKING MODULE FOR THE INLET OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE, AND INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.2016 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft Berliner Ring 2 38440 Wolfsburg / DE | [2014/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DRÜCKHAMMER, Jens Wichernstrasse 47b 38108 Braunschweig / DE | 02 /
KAPITZA, Lars Scharenbusch 48 38104 Braunschweig / DE | 03 /
REISCH, Uwe Vor dem Busch 82 38442 Wolfsburg / DE | [2014/29] | Application number, filing date | 12765987.8 | 03.09.2012 | [2015/48] | WO2012EP03671 | Priority number, date | DE201110112862 | 07.09.2011 Original published format: DE102011112862 | [2014/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013034265 | Date: | 14.03.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2753807 | Date: | 16.07.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2753807 | Date: | 25.11.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F02B31/06, F02M35/10 | [2014/29] | CPC: |
F02B31/06 (EP);
F02M35/10262 (EP);
Y02T10/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STRÖMUNGSKÖRPER, MASKIERUNGSMODUL FÜR DEN EINLASS EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE UND BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE | [2014/29] | English: | FLOW BODY, MASKING MODULE FOR THE INLET OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE, AND INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2014/29] | French: | CORPS D'ÉCOULEMENT, MODULE DE MASQUAGE POUR UNE ADMISSION D'UN MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE ET MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE | [2014/29] | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.2014 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/29] | 16.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 03.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.10.2015 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 06.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.04.2015 | Opposition(s) | 26.08.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.09.2012 | AL | 25.11.2015 | BG | 25.11.2015 | CY | 25.11.2015 | CZ | 25.11.2015 | DK | 25.11.2015 | EE | 25.11.2015 | ES | 25.11.2015 | FI | 25.11.2015 | HR | 25.11.2015 | IT | 25.11.2015 | LT | 25.11.2015 | LV | 25.11.2015 | MC | 25.11.2015 | MK | 25.11.2015 | MT | 25.11.2015 | NL | 25.11.2015 | PL | 25.11.2015 | RO | 25.11.2015 | RS | 25.11.2015 | SE | 25.11.2015 | SI | 25.11.2015 | SK | 25.11.2015 | SM | 25.11.2015 | TR | 25.11.2015 | NO | 25.02.2016 | GR | 26.02.2016 | IS | 25.03.2016 | PT | 25.03.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 03.09.2012 | |
BG | 25.11.2015 | ||
CY | 25.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
IT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
MC | 25.11.2015 | ||
MK | 25.11.2015 | ||
MT | 25.11.2015 | ||
NL | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SI | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
SM | 25.11.2015 | ||
TR | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/38] | HU | 03.09.2012 | |
BG | 25.11.2015 | ||
CY | 25.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
IT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
MC | 25.11.2015 | ||
MK | 25.11.2015 | ||
MT | 25.11.2015 | ||
NL | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SI | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
SM | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 03.09.2012 | |
CY | 25.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
IT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
MC | 25.11.2015 | ||
MK | 25.11.2015 | ||
MT | 25.11.2015 | ||
NL | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SI | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
SM | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 03.09.2012 | |
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
IT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
MC | 25.11.2015 | ||
MK | 25.11.2015 | ||
NL | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SI | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
SM | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/31] | CZ | 25.11.2015 | |
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
IT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
MC | 25.11.2015 | ||
NL | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SI | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
SM | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | CZ | 25.11.2015 | |
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
IT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
NL | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SI | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
SM | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | CZ | 25.11.2015 | |
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
IT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
NL | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
SM | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | CZ | 25.11.2015 | |
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
IT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
NL | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
SM | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 25.11.2015 | |
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
IT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
NL | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 25.11.2015 | |
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
NL | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | ES | 25.11.2015 | |
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
NL | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | ES | 25.11.2015 | |
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
NL | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 25.11.2015 | |
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
NL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 25.11.2015 | |
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
NL | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 25.11.2015 | |
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 25.11.2015 | |
LT | 25.11.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2913060 (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]) [X] 1-8 * page 4, line 11 - page 5, line 27; figures 2-5 *; | [X]EP0940575 (OPEL ADAM AG [DE]) [X] 1-7 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0013]; figures 1-5 *; | [X]FR2924171 (RENAULT SAS [FR]) [X] 1-7 * page 4, line 15 - page 5, line 26; figure 1 *; | [X]DE102009043076 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [X] 1-7 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0029]; figures 6,7 *; | [X]FR2877044 (RENAULT SAS [FR]) [X] 1-7 * page 3, line 5 - page 4, line 14; figures 1-3 * | by applicant | WO9517589 | DE19809052 | EP1556422 |