EP2761377 - INKJET PRINTING USING LARGE PARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.10.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [2014/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOMBS, Thomas, Nathaniel 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | 02 /
RIMAI, Donald, Saul 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [2014/32] | Representative(s) | Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/32] | Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12766777.2 | 13.09.2012 | WO2012US54978 | Priority number, date | US201113245931 | 27.09.2011 Original published format: US201113245931 | US201113245971 | 27.09.2011 Original published format: US201113245971 | US201113245947 | 27.09.2011 Original published format: US201113245947 | US201113245977 | 27.09.2011 Original published format: US201113245977 | US201113245964 | 27.09.2011 Original published format: US201113245964 | US201113245957 | 27.09.2011 Original published format: US201113245957 | [2014/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013048740 | Date: | 04.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2761377 | Date: | 06.08.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.04.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/32, G03G15/22 | [2014/32] | CPC: |
G03G15/32 (EP);
G03G15/224 (EP);
G03G15/6585 (EP);
G03G2215/00776 (EP);
G03G2215/00805 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/32] | Title | German: | TINTENSTRAHLDRUCK MIT GROSSEN TEILCHEN | [2014/32] | English: | INKJET PRINTING USING LARGE PARTICLES | [2014/32] | French: | IMPRESSION À JET D'ENCRE UTILISANT DE GROSSES PARTICULES | [2014/32] | Entry into regional phase | 10.02.2014 | National basic fee paid | 10.02.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.02.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/32] | 07.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/47] | 16.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/47] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.12.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1177909 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH11263004 (NEC CORP) [A] 1-15 * abstract * | Examination | EP1178370 | by applicant | US4943816 | US6702425 | US7232214 | US5847721 | US6457807 | US6491362 | US6505921 | US6554410 | US6575566 | US6588888 | US6793328 | US6827429 | US6851796 | US4068241 | US4636808 | US6079821 | US7350902 | US6608641 | US2006133870 | US4312268 | US5563694 |