EP2748275 - METHODS OF FLUID LOSS CONTROL, DIVERSION, AND SEALING USING DEFORMABLE PARTICULATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.2017 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. 10200 Bellaire Boulevard Houston, TX 77072 / US | [2016/39] |
Former [2014/27] | For all designated states Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. 10200 Bellaire Boulevard Houston, TX 77072 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIANG, Feng 17927 Sugarloaf Bay Drive Cypress, TX 77429 / US | 02 /
TODD, Bradley L. 1810 Windsor Drive Duncan, OK 73533 / US | 03 /
WELTON, Thomas D. 67 South Hawthorne Hollow Circle Conroe, TX 77384 / US | 04 /
SAINI, Rajesh K. 10719 Twilight Creek Lane Cypress, TX 77433 / US | [2014/27] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2016/39] |
Former [2014/27] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12766785.5 | 13.09.2012 | [2016/39] | WO2012US55100 | Priority number, date | US201113252349 | 04.10.2011 Original published format: US201113252349 | [2014/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013052252 | Date: | 11.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2748275 | Date: | 02.07.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.04.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2748275 | Date: | 28.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C09K8/035, C09K8/508 | [2014/27] | CPC: |
C09K8/035 (EP,US);
C09K8/508 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR KONTROLLE VON FLÜSSIGKEITSVERLUST, ABLEITUNG UND ABDICHTUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG VON VERFORMBAREN PARTIKELN | [2014/27] | English: | METHODS OF FLUID LOSS CONTROL, DIVERSION, AND SEALING USING DEFORMABLE PARTICULATES | [2014/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE RÉDUCTION DE PERTE DE FLUIDE, DE DÉVIATION ET D'ÉTANCHÉIFICATION UTILISANT DES MATIÈRES PARTICULAIRES DÉFORMABLES | [2014/27] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/27] | 08.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.08.2015 | Opposition(s) | 29.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.09.2012 | AL | 28.09.2016 | AT | 28.09.2016 | BE | 28.09.2016 | CY | 28.09.2016 | CZ | 28.09.2016 | DK | 28.09.2016 | EE | 28.09.2016 | ES | 28.09.2016 | FI | 28.09.2016 | HR | 28.09.2016 | IT | 28.09.2016 | LT | 28.09.2016 | LV | 28.09.2016 | MC | 28.09.2016 | MK | 28.09.2016 | NL | 28.09.2016 | PL | 28.09.2016 | RO | 28.09.2016 | RS | 28.09.2016 | SE | 28.09.2016 | SI | 28.09.2016 | SK | 28.09.2016 | SM | 28.09.2016 | TR | 28.09.2016 | BG | 28.12.2016 | NO | 28.12.2016 | GR | 29.12.2016 | IS | 28.01.2017 | PT | 30.01.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 13.09.2012 | |
AL | 28.09.2016 | ||
AT | 28.09.2016 | ||
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CY | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
MK | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 13.09.2012 | |
AL | 28.09.2016 | ||
AT | 28.09.2016 | ||
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CY | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 13.09.2012 | |
AL | 28.09.2016 | ||
AT | 28.09.2016 | ||
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 28.09.2016 | |
AT | 28.09.2016 | ||
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 28.09.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2004261996 (MUNOZ TRINIDAD [US], et al) [X] 1,4,5,7,8,10 * paragraphs [0013] - [0022] - [0027] , [0028] * * the whole document * [I] 2,3,6,9; | [X]US2007078063 (MUNOZ TRINIDAD JR [US]) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0020] - [0023] - [0030] - [0033]; claims 1-14 * * the whole document *; | [XI]WO2007113481 (HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERV INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-8,10 * paragraphs [0028] - [0031] - [0036] , [0038] , [0000] , [0040] , [0050]; claim 2 * * the whole document * [I] 3,9; | [XI]WO2009095677 (HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERV INC [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,8,10 * paragraphs [0004] , [0036] - [0039] - [0048] , [0055]; figures 1,11; claim 20 * * the whole document *[I] 6,9; | [X]US2010273685 (SAINI RAJESH K [US], et al) [X] 1,4-8,10 * paragraphs [0013] , [0 25] - [0028] - [0030] , [0031]; claims 1,4,7,8 * * the whole document * |