EP2695722 - COMPOSITE MOLDED BODY AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo, 103-8666 / JP | [2014/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHIBASHI Soichi c/o Tokyo Head Office Toray Industries Inc. 1-1 Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8666 / JP | 02 /
KOSHI Masayuki c/o Nagoya Plant Toray Industries Inc. 9-1 Oe-cho Minato-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 455-8502 / JP | [2014/07] | Representative(s) | Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | [2017/27] |
Former [2014/07] | Hoefer & Partner Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12767314.3 | 23.02.2012 | [2017/27] | WO2012JP54345 | Priority number, date | JP20110083597 | 05.04.2011 Original published format: JP 2011083597 | [2014/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012137554 | Date: | 11.10.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2695722 | Date: | 12.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2695722 | Date: | 05.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.10.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B29C65/02, B29C65/48, B29C70/34 | [2017/09] | CPC: |
B29C65/02 (EP,KR,US);
B29C70/04 (KR);
B29C65/4815 (EP,US);
B29C66/1122 (EP,US);
B29C66/301 (EP,US);
B29C66/54 (EP,US);
B29C66/7212 (EP,US);
B29C66/7214 (EP,US);
B29C66/72143 (EP,US);
B29C66/723 (EP,US);
B29C66/7311 (EP,US);
B29C66/73774 (EP,US);
B29C66/73776 (EP,US);
B29C66/73921 (EP,US);
B29C70/0035 (EP,KR,US);
B29C70/345 (EP,US);
B32B27/28 (US);
B32B27/34 (US);
B29C65/04 (EP,US);
B29C65/06 (EP,US);
B29C65/08 (EP,US);
B29C65/10 (EP,US);
B29C65/106 (EP,US);
B29C65/14 (EP,US);
B29C65/16 (EP,US);
B29C65/20 (EP,US);
B29C65/22 (EP,US);
B29C65/3416 (EP,US);
B29C65/3436 (EP,US);
B29C65/3492 (EP,US);
B29C65/3616 (EP,US);
B29C65/3636 (EP,US);
B29C65/3684 (EP,US);
B29C65/38 (EP,US);
B29C65/5057 (EP,US);
B29C66/71 (EP,US);
B29C66/712 (EP,US);
B29C66/72141 (EP,US);
B29C66/73941 (EP,US);
B29C66/8322 (EP,US);
B29L2031/7172 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31728 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31909 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B29C66/7212, B29K2307/04 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2077/00 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2081/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/07] | B29C65/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBUNDSTOFFFORMKÖRPER UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2014/07] | English: | COMPOSITE MOLDED BODY AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | [2014/07] | French: | CORPS MOULÉ COMPOSITE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE CE CORPS | [2014/07] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2013 | Translation filed | 04.10.2013 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2013 | Search fee paid | 04.10.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/07] | 13.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.05.2015 | Opposition(s) | 06.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.02.2012 | AL | 05.07.2017 | AT | 05.07.2017 | CY | 05.07.2017 | CZ | 05.07.2017 | DK | 05.07.2017 | EE | 05.07.2017 | FI | 05.07.2017 | HR | 05.07.2017 | LT | 05.07.2017 | LV | 05.07.2017 | MC | 05.07.2017 | MK | 05.07.2017 | PL | 05.07.2017 | PT | 05.07.2017 | RO | 05.07.2017 | RS | 05.07.2017 | SE | 05.07.2017 | SI | 05.07.2017 | SK | 05.07.2017 | SM | 05.07.2017 | TR | 05.07.2017 | BG | 05.10.2017 | NO | 05.10.2017 | GR | 06.10.2017 | IS | 05.11.2017 | IE | 23.02.2018 | LU | 23.02.2018 | MT | 23.02.2018 | BE | 28.02.2018 | CH | 28.02.2018 | LI | 28.02.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 23.02.2012 | |
AT | 05.07.2017 | ||
CY | 05.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
MK | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PT | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
TR | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
IE | 23.02.2018 | ||
LU | 23.02.2018 | ||
MT | 23.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 23.02.2012 | |
AT | 05.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PT | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
TR | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
IE | 23.02.2018 | ||
LU | 23.02.2018 | ||
MT | 23.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
TR | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
IE | 23.02.2018 | ||
LU | 23.02.2018 | ||
MT | 23.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
IE | 23.02.2018 | ||
LU | 23.02.2018 | ||
MT | 23.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
IE | 23.02.2018 | ||
LU | 23.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
IE | 23.02.2018 | ||
LU | 23.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
LU | 23.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/44] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 05.07.2017 | |
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 05.07.2017 | |
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 05.07.2017 | |
NO | 05.10.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO9000970 (SWARTZ HENRY D [US]) [I] 1-11 * abstract * * figure 6/8 ** pages 7-14 *; | [XI]EP1892079 (DEUTSCH ZENTR LUFT & RAUMFAHRT [DE]) [X] 1,2,4 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * * paragraphs [0043] - [0079] * [I] 3,5-10; | [I]JP2008230224 (TORAY DU PONT KK) [I] 1-11 * abstract * * figures 6,7 * | International search | [A]JPS58222815 (SHIN KOBE ELECTRIC MACHINERY); | [X]JPS60239224 (YANMAR DIESEL ENGINE CO); | [A]JPH03248832 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD); | [X]JPH09164595 (KOYO SEIKO CO); | [Y]JP3906319B (TORAY INDUSTRIES, INC.); | [A]JP2007313778 (TEIJIN TECHNO PRODUCTS LTD) | Examination | EP1762368 | by applicant | JP3906319B | JP4543696B |