EP2695096 - A METHOD, SYSTEM AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE FOR AT LEAST ONE OF EFFICIENT GRAPHIC PROCESSING AND SALIENT BASED LEARNING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.06.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 07.07.2021 [2021/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Creative Technology Ltd. 31 International Business Park Creative Resource Singapore 609921 / SG | [2014/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QIAN, Qiang BLK 122 Jurong East Street 13 04-23 Singapore 600122 / SG | 02 /
CHOONG, Hon Wai BLK 387 Bukit Batok West Avenue 5 15-376 Singapore 650387 / SG | 03 /
YANG, Yi No. 15 Building Wan Quan Zhuang Road Haidian District Beijing 100089 / CN | 04 /
CHAN, Yi Jie BLK 447 Jurong West Street 42 07-286 Singapore 640447 / SG | 05 /
LIU, Xiaoting BLK 537 Bukit Batok Street 52 10-595 Singapore 650537 / SG | [2014/07] | Representative(s) | Talbot-Ponsonby, Daniel Frederick Marks & Clerk LLP 2nd Floor, Wytham Court 11 West Way Oxford OX2 0JB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/07] | Blake, Stephen James Marks & Clerk LLP Fletcher House (2nd Floor) Heatley Road The Oxford Science Park Oxford OX4 4GE / GB | Application number, filing date | 12767560.1 | 29.03.2012 | WO2012SG00108 | Priority number, date | SG20110002536 | 08.04.2011 Original published format: SG 201102536 | [2014/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012138299 | Date: | 11.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2695096 | Date: | 12.02.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 11.10.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00, G06T3/00, G06T7/00, // G06F17/30, G06T3/40 | [2015/38] | CPC: |
G06T3/4038 (EP,US);
G06T11/00 (US);
G06F16/54 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/07] | G06F19/00, G06T3/00, G06T7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/07] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, SYSTEM UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG FÜR EFFIZIENTE GRAPHIKVERARBEITUNG UND/ODER AUFFÄLLIGKEITSBASIERTES LERNEN | [2014/07] | English: | A METHOD, SYSTEM AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE FOR AT LEAST ONE OF EFFICIENT GRAPHIC PROCESSING AND SALIENT BASED LEARNING | [2014/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, SYSTÈME ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE POUR AU MOINS UNE OPÉRATION PARMI TRAITEMENT GRAPHIQUE EFFICACE ET APPRENTISSAGE BASÉ SUR DES SAILLANTS | [2014/07] | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.2013 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.2013 | Search fee paid | 21.10.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/07] | 24.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.04.2021 | 18.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/27] | 28.02.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/27] | 26.04.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.09.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2021 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2005056390 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0088] * * paragraph [0102] * * paragraph [0112] - paragraph [0119] ** figures 9,22 *; | [X]US2005134719 (BECK SUSAN J [US]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0068] * * paragraph [0073] * * figures 1,3,7,11 *; | [X]US2006280364 (MA YUE [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0023] * * figures 2-4 *; | [X] - SUH BONGWON ET AL, "Automatic thumbnail cropping and its effectiveness", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 16TH ANNUAL ACM SYMPOSIUM ON USER INTERFACE SOFTWARE AND TECHNOLOGY : VANCOUVER, CANADA, NOVEMBER 2 - 5, 2003; [ACM SYMPOSIUM ON USER INTERFACE SOFTWARE AND TECHNOLOGY], ACM PRESS, NEW YORK, NY, (20030101), vol. 5, no. 2, doi:10.1145/964696.964707, ISBN 978-1-58113-636-4, pages 95 - 104, XP002367824 [X] 1-15 * abstract * * page 95 - page 96 * * page 98 * * page 102 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/964696.964707 | International search | [X]US2004165789 (II YASUHIRO [JP]); | [X]US2006064716 (SULL SANGHOON [KR], et al); | [X]US2010226564 (MARCHESOTTI LUCA [FR], et al); | [XP]US2011158558 (ZHAO FENG [CN], et al); | [YL] - "3D Carousels", OXYLUSFLASH.COM, (20120426), URL: www.oxylusflash.com, XP008171637 | by applicant | JP2005056390 | US2005134719 | US2006280364 |