EP2693988 - INSTRUMENT ASSEMBLY FOR IMPLANTING A REVISION HIP PROSTHESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/07] | INSTRUMENT ASSEMBLY FOR IMPLANTING A REVISION HIP PROSTHESIS AND ORTHOPAEDIC SURGICAL PROCEDURE FOR USING THE SAME | ||
[2016/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.2017 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DePuy Synthes Products, LLC 325 Paramount Drive Raynham, MA 02767-0350 / US | [2014/08] |
Former [2014/07] | For all designated states DePuy Products, Inc. 700 Orthopaedic Drive Warsaw, IN 46581 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARR, Jonathan, E. 700 Orthopaedic Drive Warsaw, Indiana 46581 / US | 02 /
HOOD, Megan, A. 700 Orthopaedic Drive Warsaw, Indiana 46581 / US | 03 /
SATTERTHWAITE, Rodney, E. 700 Orthopaedic Drive Warsaw, Indiana 46581 / US | 04 /
MCCLEARY, Larry, G. 700 Orthopaedic Drive Warsaw, Indiana 46581 / US | 05 /
FURBEE, Rebecca, M. 700 Orthopaedic Drive Warsaw, Indiana 46581 / US | 06 /
MUHAMMAD, William 700 Orthopaedic Drive Warsaw, Indiana 46581 / US | 07 /
FORTIN, Michael, J. 700Orthopaedic Drive Warsaw, Indiana 46581 / US | 08 /
LASHURE, Daniel, E. 700 Orthopaedic Drive Warsaw, Indiana 46581 / US | 09 /
GHEEVARUGHESE, Vineetha, S. 700 Orthopaedic Drive Warsaw, Indiana 46581 / US | [2014/07] | Representative(s) | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Arena Point Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/07] | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 12768276.3 | 05.04.2012 | [2016/44] | WO2012US32260 | Priority number, date | US201161472500P | 06.04.2011 Original published format: US 201161472500 P | [2014/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012138824 | Date: | 11.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2693988 | Date: | 12.02.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2693988 | Date: | 02.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 04.04.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/32, A61F2/46, A61B17/16, A61B17/88, A61F2/30, A61F2/36, A61B17/00, A61B90/00 | [2016/16] | CPC: |
A61F2/30734 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2/4684 (EP,CN,US);
A61B17/1637 (EP,CN,US);
A61B17/164 (EP,CN,US);
A61B17/1659 (EP,CN,US);
A61B17/1668 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2/36 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2/3662 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2/4607 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2/4637 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2/4657 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00464 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2090/062 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30235 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2002/30332 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2002/30507 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2002/30515 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2002/3054 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2002/30616 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2002/30617 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2002/30738 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2002/3625 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2002/3652 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2002/3674 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2002/4622 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2002/4627 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2002/4629 (EP,CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/37] | A61F2/32, A61F2/46, A61B17/16, A61B17/88, A61F2/30, A61F2/36, A61B17/00, A61B19/00 | ||
Former IPC [2014/07] | A61F2/32, A61F2/46, A61B17/16, A61B17/88 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INSTRUMENTENANORDNUNG ZUR IMPLANTATION EINER REVISIONSHÜFTPROTHESE | [2016/16] | English: | INSTRUMENT ASSEMBLY FOR IMPLANTING A REVISION HIP PROSTHESIS | [2016/16] | French: | ENSEMBLE INSTRUMENT POUR IMPLANTER UNE PROTHÈSE DE HANCHE DE RÉVISION | [2016/16] |
Former [2014/07] | INSTRUMENTENANORDNUNG ZUR IMPLANTATION EINER REVISIONSHÜFTPROTHESE UND ORTHOPÄDISCHES EINGRIFFSVERFAHREN DAMIT | ||
Former [2014/07] | INSTRUMENT ASSEMBLY FOR IMPLANTING A REVISION HIP PROSTHESIS AND ORTHOPAEDIC SURGICAL PROCEDURE FOR USING THE SAME | ||
Former [2014/07] | ENSEMBLE INSTRUMENT POUR IMPLANTER UNE PROTHÈSE DE HANCHE DE RÉVISION ET INTERVENTION CHIRURGICALE ORTHOPÉDIQUE DESTINÉE À L'UTILISER | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2013 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2013 | Search fee paid | 08.10.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/07] | 23.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP14189761.1 / EP2842519 | EP14189764.5 / EP2853240 | EP14189766.0 / EP2856974 | EP14189769.4 / EP2856979 | EP14189771.0 / EP2859865 | EP14189774.4 / EP2856975 | EP14189775.1 / EP2856976 | EP14189777.7 / EP2853241 | EP14189781.9 / EP2856977 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.06.2016 | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.04.2012 | AL | 02.11.2016 | AT | 02.11.2016 | BE | 02.11.2016 | CY | 02.11.2016 | CZ | 02.11.2016 | DK | 02.11.2016 | EE | 02.11.2016 | ES | 02.11.2016 | FI | 02.11.2016 | HR | 02.11.2016 | IT | 02.11.2016 | LT | 02.11.2016 | LV | 02.11.2016 | MC | 02.11.2016 | MK | 02.11.2016 | NL | 02.11.2016 | PL | 02.11.2016 | RO | 02.11.2016 | RS | 02.11.2016 | SE | 02.11.2016 | SI | 02.11.2016 | SK | 02.11.2016 | SM | 02.11.2016 | TR | 02.11.2016 | BG | 02.02.2017 | NO | 02.02.2017 | GR | 03.02.2017 | IS | 02.03.2017 | PT | 02.03.2017 | LU | 05.04.2017 | MT | 05.04.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 05.04.2012 | |
AT | 02.11.2016 | ||
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CY | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
MK | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
TR | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
LU | 05.04.2017 | ||
MT | 05.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 05.04.2012 | |
AT | 02.11.2016 | ||
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CY | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
MK | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
LU | 05.04.2017 | ||
MT | 05.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 05.04.2012 | |
AT | 02.11.2016 | ||
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CY | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
LU | 05.04.2017 | ||
MT | 05.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 05.04.2012 | |
AT | 02.11.2016 | ||
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
LU | 05.04.2017 | ||
MT | 05.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
LU | 05.04.2017 | ||
MT | 05.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
LU | 05.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 02.11.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4693724 (RHENTER JEAN L [FR], et al) [A] 3 * figures 3,5 ** column 3, lines 60,61 *; | [Y]US6149687 (GRAY JR WAYNE P [US], et al) [Y] 4-9 * figures 1,2 * * column 3, line 19 - line 41 *; | [XYI]FR2832624 (SCIENCE MEDECINE SA [FR]) [X] 1,2 * figures 4,5 * * page 5, line 19 - line 36 * [Y] 4-9 [I] 3 | International search | [A]US5906644 (POWELL DOUGLAS HUNTER [US]); | [A]US6048365 (BURROWS JAMES W [US], et al); | [A]US6090146 (ROZOW III STEPHEN [US], et al); | [A]US2003074080 (MURRAY IAN P [US]); | [A]US2007100464 (MEULINK STEVEN L [US]); | [A]US2007233132 (VALLA JOSEPH R [US]); | [A]US2010249943 (BERGIN ALISHA W [US], et al); | [A]US2011054628 (BANKS STEPHEN A [AU], et al) |