EP2694687 - AN IN VITRO METHOD FOR HIGH THROUGHPUT SCREENING OF GENOTOXIC AGENTS IN EUKARYOTIC CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.12.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.08.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Anthem Biosciences Pvt Ltd 49 Canara Bank Road Bommasandra Industrial Area Phase I Bommasandra Hosur Road Bangalore 56099, Karnataka / IN | [2014/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAIR, Ayyappan Amrita School of Biotechnology Clappana (PO) Kollam 690525 Kerala / IN | 02 /
SUBBIAH, Madhuri Anthem Biosciences Pvt Ltd. 49, Canara Bank Road Bommasandra Industrial Area Phase I Bangalore 560099 Karnataka / IN | 03 /
GUPTA, Gunja Anthem Biosciences Pvt Ltd. 49, Canara Bank Road Bommasandra Industrial Area Phase I Bangalore 56099 Karnataka / IN | 04 /
RAJAKRISHNA, Lakshmi Anthem Biosciences Pvt Ltd. 49, Canara Bank Road Bommasandra Industrial Area Phase I Bangalore 56099 Karnataka / IN | 05 /
RAGHAVENDRA, Pradeep Savanoor Anthem Biosciences Pvt Ltd. 49, Canara Bank Road Bommasandra Industrial Area Phase I Bangalore 56099 Karnataka / IN | 06 /
KARTHIKEYAN, Subbulakshmi Anthem Biosciences Pvt Ltd. 49, Canara Bank Road Bommasandra Industrial Area Phase I Bangalore 560099 Karnataka / IN | 07 /
UNNI, Salini Krishnan Anthem Biosciences Pvt Ltd. 49, Canara Bank Road Bommasandra Industrial Area Phase I Bangalore 560099 Karnataka / IN | 08 /
SAMBASIVAM, Ganesh Anthem Biosciences Pvt Ltd. 49, Canara Bank Road Bommasandra Industrial Area Phase I Bangalore 560099 Karnataka / IN | [2017/37] |
Former [2014/07] | 01 /
NAIR, Ayyappan Amrita School of Biotechnology Clappana (PO) Kollam 690525 Kerala / IN | ||
02 /
SUBBIAH, Madhuri Anthem Biosciences Pvt Ltd. 49 Canara Bank Road Bommasandra Industrial Area Phase I Bangalore 560099 Karnataka / IN | |||
03 /
GUPTA, Gunja Anthem Biosciences Pvt Ltd. 49 Canara Bank Road Bommasandra Industrial Area Phase I Bangalore 56099 Karnataka / IN | |||
04 /
RAJAKRISHNA, Lakshmi Anthem Biosciences Pvt Ltd. 49 Canara Bank Road Bommasandra Industrial Area Phase I Bangalore 56099 Karnataka / IN | |||
05 /
RAGHAVENDRA, Pradeep Savanoor Anthem Biosciences Pvt Ltd. 49 Canara Bank Road Bommasandra Industrial Area Phase I Bangalore 56099 Karnataka / IN | |||
06 /
KARTHIKEYAN, Subbulakshmi Anthem Biosciences Pvt Ltd. 49 Canara Bank Road Bommasandra Industrial Area Phase I Bangalore 560099 Karnataka / IN | |||
07 /
UNNI, Salini Krishnan Anthem Biosciences Pvt Ltd. 49 Canara Bank Road Bommasandra Industrial Area Phase I Bangalore 560099 Karnataka / IN | |||
08 /
SAMBASIVAM, Ganesh Anthem Biosciences Pvt Ltd. 49 Canara Bank Road Bommasandra Industrial Area Phase I Bangalore 560099 Karnataka / IN | Representative(s) | Heinze, Ekkehard, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 47 80538 München / DE | [2018/05] |
Former [2014/07] | Meissner, Bolte & Partner Anwaltssozietät GbR Widenmayerstrasse 48 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12768664.0 | 07.04.2012 | [2018/05] | WO2012IB51729 | Priority number, date | IN2011CHE1239 | 08.04.2011 Original published format: IN 1239CH2011 | [2017/16] |
Former [2014/07] | IN2011CHE1239 | 08.04.2011 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012137186 | Date: | 11.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2694687 | Date: | 12.02.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2694687 | Date: | 31.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 11.10.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, G01N33/52, C12N15/09, G01N33/50 | [2014/47] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6897 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G01N33/5014 (US);
C12N15/09 (KR);
C12N15/11 (KR);
G01N33/5023 (EP,CN,US);
G01N33/52 (KR);
C12Q2600/142 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/07] | C12Q1/68, G01N33/52, C12N15/09 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IN-VITRO-VERFAHREN ZUM SCREENING GENOTOXISCHER MITTEL IN EUKARYOTISCHEN ZELLEN MIT HOHEM DURCHSATZ | [2014/07] | English: | AN IN VITRO METHOD FOR HIGH THROUGHPUT SCREENING OF GENOTOXIC AGENTS IN EUKARYOTIC CELLS | [2014/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉ IN VITRO POUR LE DÉPISTAGE À HAUT DÉBIT D'AGENTS GÉNOTOXIQUES DANS DES CELLULES EUCARYOTES | [2014/07] | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2013 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2013 | Search fee paid | 08.10.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/07] | 18.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.12.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.09.2015 | Opposition(s) | 02.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2016 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   16.08.2016 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.04.2012 | AL | 31.01.2018 | AT | 31.01.2018 | CY | 31.01.2018 | CZ | 31.01.2018 | DK | 31.01.2018 | EE | 31.01.2018 | ES | 31.01.2018 | FI | 31.01.2018 | HR | 31.01.2018 | IT | 31.01.2018 | LT | 31.01.2018 | LV | 31.01.2018 | MC | 31.01.2018 | MK | 31.01.2018 | NL | 31.01.2018 | PL | 31.01.2018 | PT | 31.01.2018 | RO | 31.01.2018 | RS | 31.01.2018 | SE | 31.01.2018 | SI | 31.01.2018 | SK | 31.01.2018 | SM | 31.01.2018 | TR | 31.01.2018 | IE | 07.04.2018 | LU | 07.04.2018 | MT | 07.04.2018 | BE | 30.04.2018 | BG | 30.04.2018 | CH | 30.04.2018 | FR | 30.04.2018 | GB | 30.04.2018 | LI | 30.04.2018 | NO | 30.04.2018 | GR | 01.05.2018 | IS | 31.05.2018 | DE | 01.11.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 07.04.2012 | |
AL | 31.01.2018 | ||
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PT | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
TR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IE | 07.04.2018 | ||
LU | 07.04.2018 | ||
MT | 07.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
FR | 30.04.2018 | ||
GB | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
DE | 01.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
TR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IE | 07.04.2018 | ||
LU | 07.04.2018 | ||
MT | 07.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
FR | 30.04.2018 | ||
GB | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
DE | 01.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
IE | 07.04.2018 | ||
LU | 07.04.2018 | ||
MT | 07.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
FR | 30.04.2018 | ||
GB | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
DE | 01.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
IE | 07.04.2018 | ||
LU | 07.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
FR | 30.04.2018 | ||
GB | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
DE | 01.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
IE | 07.04.2018 | ||
LU | 07.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
GB | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
DE | 01.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
LU | 07.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
GB | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
DE | 01.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
LU | 07.04.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
DE | 01.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
DE | 01.11.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 31.01.2018 | |
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 31.01.2018 | |
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | ES | 31.01.2018 | |
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | ES | 31.01.2018 | |
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | FI | 31.01.2018 | |
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2010112821 (GENTRONIX LTD [GB], et al) [X] 15 * abstract * [I] 1-14; | [XI]WO0244427 (HARVARD COLLEGE [US], et al) [X] 15 * examples 1-2; claim 1 * [I] 1-14; | [A] - W Kimryn Rathmell ET AL, "DNA-dependent Protein Kinase Is Not Required for Accumulation of P53 or Cell Cycle Arrest after DNA Damage", Cancer Research Vol. 57, (19970101), pages 68 - 74, URL: http://cancerres.aacrjournals.org/content/57/1/68.full.pdf, (20141009), XP055145351 [A] 1-15 * abstract * | International search | [Y]US6344324 (HOWELL STEPHEN B [US], et al); | [Y] - ZAGER, V. ET AL., "Development of human cell biosensor system for genotoxicity detection based on DNA damage-induced gene expression", RADIOLOGY AND ONCOLOGY., (201003), vol. 44, no. 1, pages 42 - 51, XP002638472 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2478/V10019-010-0010-3 | [Y] - POTRATZ, JC. ET AL., "In vivo analyses of UV-irradiation-induced p53 promoter binding using a novel quantitative real-time PCR assay", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF ONCOLOGY., (200502), vol. 26, no. 2, pages 493 - 498 | [Y] - BRAASTAD, CD. ET AL., "Constitutive DNase I hypersensitivity of p53-regulated promoters", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (200303), vol. 278, no. 10, pages 8261 - 8268, XP055125382 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M204256200 | [Y] - EIZIRIK, DL. ET AL., "Genotoxic agents increase expression of growrth arrest and DNA damage--inducible genes gadd 153 and gadd 45 in rat pancreatic islets", DIABETES., (199305), vol. 42, no. 5, pages 738 - 745, XP055125388 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2337/diabetes.42.5.738 | [Y] - TULLY, DB. ET AL., "Effects of arsenic, cadmium, chromium, and lead on gene expression regulated by a battery of 13 different promoters in recombinant HepG2 cells", TOXICOLOGY AND APPLIED PHARMACOLOGY., (200010), vol. 168, no. 2, pages 79 - 90, XP002324134 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/taap.2000.9014 | [Y] - TCHOUNWOU, PB. ET AL., "Differential cytotoxicity and gene expression in human liver carcinoma (Hepg2) cells exposed to arsenic trioxide, and monosodium acid methanearsonate (MSMA)", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR SCIENCES., (200211), vol. 3, no. 11, pages 1117 - 1132, XP003030192 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/i3111117 | [Y] - DELESCLUSE, C. ET AL., "Induction of cytochrome P450 1 A1 gene expression, oxidative stress, and genotoxicity by carbaryl and thiabendazole in transfected human HepG2 and lymphoblastoid cells", BIOCHEMICAL PHARMACOLOGY., (200102), vol. 61, no. 4, pages 399 - 407, XP003013240 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0006-2952(00)00562-1 | [A] - BONDEROFF, J. ET AL., "Time-dependent increase in ribosome processivity", (201011), vol. 38, no. 20, pages 7054 - 7067, XP055125406 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkq566 | by applicant | WO2010112821 | WO0244427 |