EP2750975 - PACKAGING SYSTEM FOR PRESSED BALES WITH A TRANSPORTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2017 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hi Tech Textile Holding GmbH Wegscheider Straße 15 4060 Leonding / AT | [2014/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FALISE, Dirk Am Heugärtle 1b 86916 Kaufering / DE | 02 /
SAUERWEIN, Norbert Oleanderweg 12 86169 Augsburg / DE | [2014/28] | Representative(s) | Ernicke, Klaus Stefan Ernicke & Ernicke Beim Glaspalast 1 86153 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/33] | Ernicke, Klaus Stefan Patentanwälte Ernicke & Ernicke Schwibbogenplatz 2b 86153 Augsburg / DE | ||
Former [2014/28] | Ernicke, Klaus Stefan Schwibbogenplatz 2b 86153 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 12768745.7 | 03.09.2012 | [2016/33] | WO2012EP67079 | Priority number, date | DE20112051189U | 02.09.2011 Original published format: DE 202011051189 U | DE20112051610U | 12.10.2011 Original published format: DE 202011051610 U | DE20112052218U | 07.12.2011 Original published format: DE 202011052218 U | [2014/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013030401 | Date: | 07.03.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2750975 | Date: | 09.07.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2750975 | Date: | 17.08.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B65B13/04, B65B27/12, B65B9/13, B30B9/30, B65B11/10 | [2016/13] | CPC: |
B30B9/3014 (EP,US);
B65B27/12 (US);
B30B9/3003 (EP,US);
B30B9/301 (EP,US);
B30B9/3078 (EP,US);
B65B11/10 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/28] | B65B13/04, B65B27/12, B65B9/13, B30B9/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERPACKUNGSEINRICHTUNG FÜR PRESSBALLEN MIT EINER TRANSPORTVORRICHTUNG | [2014/28] | English: | PACKAGING SYSTEM FOR PRESSED BALES WITH A TRANSPORTING DEVICE | [2014/28] | French: | SYSTEME D'EMBALLAGE POUR DISPOSITIF DE TRANSPORT DE BALLES PRESSÉES | [2014/28] | Entry into regional phase | 02.04.2014 | National basic fee paid | 02.04.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.04.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/28] | 21.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.08.2015 | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.09.2012 | AL | 17.08.2016 | CY | 17.08.2016 | CZ | 17.08.2016 | DK | 17.08.2016 | EE | 17.08.2016 | ES | 17.08.2016 | FI | 17.08.2016 | HR | 17.08.2016 | IS | 17.08.2016 | LT | 17.08.2016 | LV | 17.08.2016 | MC | 17.08.2016 | MK | 17.08.2016 | MT | 17.08.2016 | NL | 17.08.2016 | PL | 17.08.2016 | RO | 17.08.2016 | RS | 17.08.2016 | SE | 17.08.2016 | SI | 17.08.2016 | SK | 17.08.2016 | SM | 17.08.2016 | TR | 17.08.2016 | IE | 03.09.2016 | LU | 03.09.2016 | CH | 30.09.2016 | LI | 30.09.2016 | BG | 17.11.2016 | GB | 17.11.2016 | NO | 17.11.2016 | GR | 18.11.2016 | PT | 19.12.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 03.09.2012 | |
CY | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IS | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
MK | 17.08.2016 | ||
MT | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
TR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IE | 03.09.2016 | ||
LU | 03.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
GB | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 03.09.2012 | |
CY | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IS | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
MK | 17.08.2016 | ||
MT | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
IE | 03.09.2016 | ||
LU | 03.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
GB | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 03.09.2012 | |
CY | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
MK | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
IE | 03.09.2016 | ||
LU | 03.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
GB | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/01] | CZ | 17.08.2016 | |
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
IE | 03.09.2016 | ||
LU | 03.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
GB | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/40] | CZ | 17.08.2016 | |
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
IE | 03.09.2016 | ||
LU | 03.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 17.08.2016 | |
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
IE | 03.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/35] | CZ | 17.08.2016 | |
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
IE | 03.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | CZ | 17.08.2016 | |
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
IE | 03.09.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | ES | 17.08.2016 | |
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | ES | 17.08.2016 | |
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 17.08.2016 | |
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 17.08.2016 | |
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 17.08.2016 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3228166 (HANS THIELE) [Y] 18-22,24 * the whole document *; | [A]US3541948 (SAUER LEO PETER, et al) [A] 1,23-27,48,59 * the whole document *; | [A]US4158994 (JENSEN KENNETH B [US]) [A] 23-27 * abstract *; | [XYI]EP0198992 (GUALCHIERANI & C SPA [IT]) [X] 1,5,6,8,9,11-17,48-52,55-60,62 * page 16 - page 20; figures 9-12 * [Y] 2-4,7,18-47,53,61,63 [I] 10; | [A]EP0220980 (SAINT GOBAIN ISOVER [FR]) [A] 18-22 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3908957 (BEUMER MASCHF BERNHARD [DE]) [A] 37-40* the whole document *; | [Y]DE4235409 (MOELLERS MASCHF GMBH [DE]) [Y] 38-40,43-46 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0579858 (VFI VERPACKUNGSTECH [DE]) [Y] 36 * column 5, line 47 - line 50 *; | [YD]WO0238364 (GUALCHIERANI TEXTILE AUTOMATIO [IT], et al) [YD] 2,7,23-34,63 * the whole document *; | [YA]DE202008003760U (AUTEFA AUTOMATION GMBH [DE]) [Y] 3,4,35-47,53,61 * the whole document * [A] 23-27 | by applicant | EP0695690 | WO0238364 |