EP2764250 - PUMP FITTINGS AND METHODS FOR THEIR MANUFACTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.10.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.06.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.06.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.01.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Quantex Patents Limited 85 Richford Street London W6 7HJ / GB | [2014/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAYES-PANKHURST, Richard Paul 60A Crabtree Lane London SW6 6LW / GB | 02 /
FORD, Jonathan Edward 128 St Pauls Road London N1 2LP / GB | [2014/33] | Representative(s) | Goddard, Frances Anna, et al Mathisen & Macara LLP Charta House 30-38 Church Street Staines-upon-Thames, Middlesex TW18 4EP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/49] | Goddard, Frances Anna, et al Mathisen & Macara LLP Communications House South Street Staines-upon-Thames TW18 4PR / GB | ||
Former [2014/33] | Knott, Stephen Gilbert, et al Mathisen & Macara LLP Communications House South Street Staines-upon-Thames Middlesex, TW18 4PR / GB | Application number, filing date | 12768830.7 | 04.10.2012 | [2019/49] | WO2012EP69643 | Priority number, date | GB20110017297 | 07.10.2011 Original published format: GB 201117297 | [2014/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013050488 | Date: | 11.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2764250 | Date: | 13.08.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.04.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2764250 | Date: | 04.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F04C27/00, F04C5/00, B67D1/10 | [2014/33] | CPC: |
B67D1/10 (EP,US);
F04D29/18 (US);
F04C27/003 (EP,US);
F04C5/00 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49236 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PUMPARMATUREN UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2014/33] | English: | PUMP FITTINGS AND METHODS FOR THEIR MANUFACTURE | [2014/33] | French: | RACCORDS DE POMPE ET PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION DE CES RACCORDS | [2014/33] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2014 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/33] | 03.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.04.2018 | Opposition(s) | 07.09.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.10.2012 | AL | 04.12.2019 | AT | 04.12.2019 | CY | 04.12.2019 | CZ | 04.12.2019 | DK | 04.12.2019 | EE | 04.12.2019 | FI | 04.12.2019 | HR | 04.12.2019 | LT | 04.12.2019 | LV | 04.12.2019 | MC | 04.12.2019 | MK | 04.12.2019 | MT | 04.12.2019 | PL | 04.12.2019 | RO | 04.12.2019 | RS | 04.12.2019 | SI | 04.12.2019 | SK | 04.12.2019 | SM | 04.12.2019 | TR | 04.12.2019 | BG | 04.03.2020 | NO | 04.03.2020 | IS | 04.04.2020 | PT | 29.04.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 04.10.2012 | |
AL | 04.12.2019 | ||
AT | 04.12.2019 | ||
CY | 04.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
MC | 04.12.2019 | ||
MT | 04.12.2019 | ||
PL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
TR | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
AT | 04.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
MC | 04.12.2019 | ||
PL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
TR | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
AT | 04.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
MC | 04.12.2019 | ||
PL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
AT | 04.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
PL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | FI | 04.12.2019 | |
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 04.12.2019 | |
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 04.12.2019 | |
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 04.03.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2129654 (ALFA LAVAL AB) [A] 1-21 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]DE10311655 (ORTNER JOSEF ANTON [AT]) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [AD]WO2006027548 (CARBONATE LTD [GB], et al) [AD] 1-21 * abstract *; | [XDI]WO2010122299 (PDD INNNOVATIONS LTD, et al) [XD] 1-4,6,8,11 * figure 4; claim 1 * [I] 7,12-20; | [E]WO2013050491 (QUANTEX PATENTS LTD [GB]) [E] 1-21* abstract * | by applicant | WO2005GB03300 | WO2010GB00798 |