EP2761048 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING A WEAR-RESISTANT AND CORROSION-RESISTANT STAINLESS STEEL PART FOR A NUCLEAR REACTOR, CORRESPONDING PART AND CORRESPONDING CONTROL CLUSTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.2020 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.12.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRAMATOME 1 Place Jean Millier Tour Areva 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2018/15] |
Former [2014/32] | For all designated states Areva NP Tour Areva 1 Place Jean Millier 92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HERTZ, Dominique 35 côte de l'Hormet F-69110 Sainte Foy Les Lyon / FR | [2014/32] | Representative(s) | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2019/22] |
Former [2014/32] | Domenego, Bertrand Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 12769396.8 | 28.09.2012 | [2019/22] | WO2012EP69254 | Priority number, date | FR20110058858 | 30.09.2011 Original published format: FR 1158858 | [2014/32] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013045655 | Date: | 04.04.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2761048 | Date: | 06.08.2014 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.04.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2761048 | Date: | 29.05.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C23C8/02, C23C8/38, C23C8/26, C23C8/22, C21D6/00, C21D8/02, C21D9/08, G21C3/07, G21C21/18, G21C7/10 | [2018/51] | CPC: |
C21D6/004 (EP,US);
C23C8/02 (EP,KR,US);
C21D1/72 (US);
C21D1/19 (KR);
C21D8/0257 (EP,US);
C21D8/0278 (KR);
C21D8/0473 (KR);
C21D9/08 (EP,US);
C23C8/22 (EP,US);
C23C8/26 (EP,US);
C23C8/32 (KR,US);
C23C8/38 (EP,KR,US);
G21C21/18 (EP,KR,US);
G21C3/07 (KR,US);
G21C7/10 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/32] | C23C8/02, C23C8/38, C23C8/26, C23C8/22, C21D6/00, C21D8/02, C21D9/08, G21C3/07 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES VERSCHLEISSFESTEN UND KORROSIONSBESTÄNDIGE EDELSTAHLBAUTEILS EINES KERNREAKTORS, BAUTEIL UND ENTSPRECHENDER STEUERCLUSTER | [2014/32] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING A WEAR-RESISTANT AND CORROSION-RESISTANT STAINLESS STEEL PART FOR A NUCLEAR REACTOR, CORRESPONDING PART AND CORRESPONDING CONTROL CLUSTER | [2014/32] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE RÉALISATION D'UNE PIÈCE EN ACIER INOXYDABLE RÉSISTANT À L'USURE ET À LA CORROSION POUR RÉACTEUR NUCLÉAIRE, PIÈCE ET GRAPPE DE COMMANDE CORRESPONDANTES | [2014/32] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/32] | 25.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.11.2018 | 15.11.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 21.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.01.2017 | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.09.2012 | AL | 29.05.2019 | CY | 29.05.2019 | CZ | 29.05.2019 | EE | 29.05.2019 | FI | 29.05.2019 | HR | 29.05.2019 | LT | 29.05.2019 | LV | 29.05.2019 | MC | 29.05.2019 | MK | 29.05.2019 | MT | 29.05.2019 | PL | 29.05.2019 | RO | 29.05.2019 | RS | 29.05.2019 | SI | 29.05.2019 | SK | 29.05.2019 | SM | 29.05.2019 | TR | 29.05.2019 | BG | 29.08.2019 | NO | 29.08.2019 | GR | 30.08.2019 | IE | 28.09.2019 | LU | 28.09.2019 | IS | 29.09.2019 | BE | 30.09.2019 | PT | 30.09.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 28.09.2012 | |
AL | 29.05.2019 | ||
CY | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
MT | 29.05.2019 | ||
PL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SI | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
IE | 28.09.2019 | ||
LU | 28.09.2019 | ||
IS | 29.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 28.09.2012 | |
AL | 29.05.2019 | ||
CY | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
PL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SI | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
IE | 28.09.2019 | ||
LU | 28.09.2019 | ||
IS | 29.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
CY | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
PL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SI | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
IE | 28.09.2019 | ||
LU | 28.09.2019 | ||
IS | 29.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
CY | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
PL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SI | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
IE | 28.09.2019 | ||
LU | 28.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
PL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SI | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
IE | 28.09.2019 | ||
LU | 28.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
PL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SI | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
IE | 28.09.2019 | ||
LU | 28.09.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
PL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SI | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
LU | 28.09.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
PL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SI | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | FI | 29.05.2019 | |
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | FI | 29.05.2019 | |
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | Cited in | International search | [YD]FR2604188 (FRAMATOME SA [FR], et al) [YD] 14-16 * figure 1; claim 1 * | [XYI] - OLFE J ET AL, "Wear protection and corrosion resistance of austenitic stainless steel due to plasma nitriding", VAKUUM IN FORSCHUNG UND PRAXIS, WILEY-VCH, WEINHEIM, DE, vol. 12, no. 4, doi:10.1002/1522-2454(200008)12:4<253::AID-VIPR253>3.0.CO;2-7, ISSN 0947-076X, (20000801), pages 253 - 258, (20001201), XP002551004 [X] 1,2,6-12,14 * page 254, column 1, paragraph 2 * [Y] 14-16 [I] 3-5,13,15,16 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1522-2454(200008)12:4<253::AID-VIPR253>3.0.CO;2-7 | Examination | JP2008031522 | by applicant | FR2604188 | EP0446083 | EP0537062 | EP0801142 | - L.E. SAMUELS; G.G WALLWORK, J. IRON STEEL INST., (1957), vol. 186, page 211 |