EP2891340 - METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR CONTROLLING PERMISSIONS TO BE GRANTED TO APPLICATIONS ON USER EQUIPMENT RESPONSIVE TO USER PRIVACY PROFILES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/28] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (Publ) Torshamnsgatan 23 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIEMOELLER, Joerg Skogsbacken 20 S-172 41 Sundbyberg / SE | 02 /
AVESAND, Stefan Stambanevägen 141 S-141 39 Huddinge / SE | 03 /
MOKRUSHIN, Leonid Murargatan 5 S-754 37 Uppsala / SE | 04 /
ZALOSHNJA, Farjola Gustav III:s Boulevard 139 1tr S-169 74 Solna / SE | [2015/28] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/28] | McPherson, Sofie Elisabeth Ericsson Limited Patent Unit UK Unit 4 Midleton Gate Guildford Business Park Guildford, Surrey GU2 8SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 12769470.1 | 30.08.2012 | WO2012IB01679 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014033492 | Date: | 06.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2891340 | Date: | 08.07.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/00, H04W12/08, H04W12/02 | [2015/28] | CPC: |
H04W12/08 (EP,US);
H04L63/102 (US);
G06F21/6245 (US);
G06F8/61 (US);
H04W12/37 (EP,US);
H04W4/50 (EP,US);
H04L67/306 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/28] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG VON ERLAUBNISSEN FÜR ANWENDUNGEN AUF EINER BENUTZERVORRICHTUNG ALS REAKTION AUF BENUTZERDATENSCHUTZPROFILE | [2015/28] | English: | METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR CONTROLLING PERMISSIONS TO BE GRANTED TO APPLICATIONS ON USER EQUIPMENT RESPONSIVE TO USER PRIVACY PROFILES | [2015/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE RÉGULER LES AUTORISATIONS À ACCORDER À DES APPLICATIONS SUR UN ÉQUIPEMENT UTILISATEUR EN RÉPONSE AUX PROFILS DE CONFIDENTIALITÉ DES UTILISATEURS | [2015/28] | Entry into regional phase | 19.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 19.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/28] | 29.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/32] | 27.03.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.05.2018 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 02.11.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 02.11.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.11.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2019 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2007004393 (FORSBERG DAN [FI], et al) [X] 1-20 * paragraphs [0037] - [0052]; figures 4,5 *; | [A]US2012072991 (BELANI ROHYT [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0022] - [0025] ** paragraphs [0057] - [0066]; figure 1 *; | [I]US2012185912 (LEE JI-CHEOL [KR], et al) [I] 1-20 * paragraphs [0040] - [0062]; figures 1,3 * |