EP2698668 - IMAGING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujifilm Corporation 26-30 Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2014/08] | For all designated states Fujifilm Corporation 26-30 Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IMANISHI, Kazutaka c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 324 Uetake-cho 1-chome Kita-ku Saitama-shi, Saitama 331-9624 / JP | [2014/08] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2016/10] |
Former [2014/08] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12770897.2 | 11.04.2012 | [2016/10] | WO2012JP59863 | Priority number, date | JP20110088135 | 12.04.2011 Original published format: JP 2011088135 | [2014/08] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012141193 | Date: | 18.10.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2698668 | Date: | 19.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2698668 | Date: | 09.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.10.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G03B5/00, H04N5/232 | [2014/08] | CPC: |
G03B5/00 (EP,US);
H04N23/6812 (EP,US);
H04N23/685 (US);
H04N23/687 (EP,US);
G03B2205/0007 (EP,US);
G03B2217/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BILDGEBUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2014/08] | English: | IMAGING DEVICE | [2014/08] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'IMAGERIE | [2014/08] | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.2013 | Translation filed | 09.10.2013 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.2013 | Search fee paid | 09.10.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/08] | 15.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 24.08.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | 12.12.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.04.2012 | AL | 09.03.2016 | AT | 09.03.2016 | BE | 09.03.2016 | CY | 09.03.2016 | CZ | 09.03.2016 | DK | 09.03.2016 | EE | 09.03.2016 | ES | 09.03.2016 | FI | 09.03.2016 | HR | 09.03.2016 | IT | 09.03.2016 | LT | 09.03.2016 | LV | 09.03.2016 | MC | 09.03.2016 | MK | 09.03.2016 | NL | 09.03.2016 | PL | 09.03.2016 | RO | 09.03.2016 | RS | 09.03.2016 | SE | 09.03.2016 | SI | 09.03.2016 | SK | 09.03.2016 | SM | 09.03.2016 | TR | 09.03.2016 | IE | 11.04.2016 | LU | 11.04.2016 | CH | 30.04.2016 | LI | 30.04.2016 | MT | 30.04.2016 | FR | 09.05.2016 | BG | 09.06.2016 | GB | 09.06.2016 | NO | 09.06.2016 | GR | 10.06.2016 | IS | 09.07.2016 | PT | 11.07.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 11.04.2012 | |
AT | 09.03.2016 | ||
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CY | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
IT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
MC | 09.03.2016 | ||
MK | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
RS | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SI | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
SM | 09.03.2016 | ||
TR | 09.03.2016 | ||
IE | 11.04.2016 | ||
LU | 11.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
MT | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 09.05.2016 | ||
BG | 09.06.2016 | ||
GB | 09.06.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 11.04.2012 | |
AT | 09.03.2016 | ||
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CY | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
IT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
MC | 09.03.2016 | ||
MK | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
RS | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SI | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
SM | 09.03.2016 | ||
TR | 09.03.2016 | ||
IE | 11.04.2016 | ||
LU | 11.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 09.05.2016 | ||
BG | 09.06.2016 | ||
GB | 09.06.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 11.04.2012 | |
AT | 09.03.2016 | ||
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CY | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
IT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
MC | 09.03.2016 | ||
MK | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
RS | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SI | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
SM | 09.03.2016 | ||
IE | 11.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 09.05.2016 | ||
BG | 09.06.2016 | ||
GB | 09.06.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
IT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
RS | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SI | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
SM | 09.03.2016 | ||
IE | 11.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 09.05.2016 | ||
BG | 09.06.2016 | ||
GB | 09.06.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/19] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
IT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
RS | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
SM | 09.03.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 09.05.2016 | ||
BG | 09.06.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
IT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
RS | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
SM | 09.03.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 09.05.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
IT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
RS | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
SM | 09.03.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
IT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
RS | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
SM | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
RS | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
SM | 09.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
RS | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
SM | 09.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 09.03.2016 | |
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RS | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | ES | 09.03.2016 | |
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RS | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/40] | ES | 09.03.2016 | |
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RS | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | ES | 09.03.2016 | |
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RS | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | ES | 09.03.2016 | |
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 09.03.2016 | |
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007183762 (WASHISU KOICHI [JP]); | [A]US2010053344 (TSUKAMOTO SUGURU [JP]) | International search | [A]JP2010025961 (CANON KK); | [A]JP2010286721 (CANON KK) | by applicant | JP2010025961 | JP2010286721 |