EP2698463 - METHOD FOR WASHING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2017 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/18] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | ||
Former [2014/08] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20 Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul-si 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IM, Myong Hun 327-23 Gasan-dong Geumchun-ku Seoul 153-023 / KR | 02 /
JANG, Won Hyuk 327-23 Gasan-dong Geumchun-ku Seoul 153-023 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Sung Hoon 327-23 Gasan-dong Geumchun-ku Seoul 153-023 / KR | 04 /
SEO, Jin Woo 327-23 Gasan-dong Geumchun-ku Seoul 153-023 / KR | 05 /
OH, Soo Young 327-23 Gasan-dong Geumchun-ku Seoul 153-023 / KR | 06 /
SEO, Bo Sung 327-23 Gasan-dong Geumchun-ku Seoul 153-023 / KR | 07 /
YOO, Sang Hee 327-23 Gasan-dong Geumchun-ku Seoul 153-023 / KR | 08 /
SON, Chang Woo 327-23 Gasan-dong Geumchun-ku Seoul 153-023 / KR | 09 /
RYU, Bong Gon 327-23 Gasan-dong Geumchun-ku Seoul 153-023 / KR | 10 /
KIM, Kwang Hyun 327-23 Gasan-dong Geumchun-ku Seoul 153-023 / KR | [2014/08] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2016/33] |
Former [2014/08] | Urner, Peter, et al Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12771745.2 | 16.01.2012 | [2016/33] | WO2012KR00368 | Priority number, date | US201161475653P | 14.04.2011 Original published format: US 201161475653 P | [2014/08] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012141410 | Date: | 18.10.2012 | Language: | KO | [2012/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2698463 | Date: | 19.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2698463 | Date: | 17.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 10.01.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | D06F33/02, D06F39/08, D06F37/26, D06F39/00, D06F35/00, D06F37/42, D06F37/30 | [2015/16] | CPC: |
D06F33/34 (EP,CN,KR,US);
D06F17/04 (CN);
D06B1/08 (US);
D06F21/02 (CN);
D06F21/04 (KR,US);
D06F33/46 (EP,CN,KR,US);
D06F34/18 (EP,CN,KR,US);
D06F37/266 (EP,CN,KR,US);
D06F37/267 (EP,CN,KR,US);
D06F39/088 (KR);
D06F39/40 (KR);
D06F2101/20 (EP,CN,KR,US);
D06F2103/04 (EP,CN,KR,US);
D06F2103/18 (EP,CN,KR,US);
D06F2103/30 (EP,CN,KR,US);
D06F2105/02 (EP,CN,KR,US);
D06F2105/46 (EP,CN,KR,US);
D06F2105/48 (EP,CN,KR,US);
Y02B40/00 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/08] | D06F33/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WASCHVERFAHREN | [2014/08] | English: | METHOD FOR WASHING | [2014/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE LAVAGE | [2014/08] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2013 | Translation filed | 05.11.2013 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2013 | Search fee paid | 05.11.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/08] | 07.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.03.2016 | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.01.2012 | AL | 17.08.2016 | AT | 17.08.2016 | BE | 17.08.2016 | CY | 17.08.2016 | CZ | 17.08.2016 | DK | 17.08.2016 | EE | 17.08.2016 | FI | 17.08.2016 | HR | 17.08.2016 | LT | 17.08.2016 | LV | 17.08.2016 | MC | 17.08.2016 | MK | 17.08.2016 | PL | 17.08.2016 | RO | 17.08.2016 | RS | 17.08.2016 | SE | 17.08.2016 | SI | 17.08.2016 | SK | 17.08.2016 | SM | 17.08.2016 | BG | 17.11.2016 | NO | 17.11.2016 | GR | 18.11.2016 | IS | 17.12.2016 | PT | 19.12.2016 | IE | 16.01.2017 | LU | 16.01.2017 | MT | 16.01.2017 | CH | 31.01.2017 | LI | 31.01.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 16.01.2012 | |
AL | 17.08.2016 | ||
AT | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CY | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
MK | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
IE | 16.01.2017 | ||
LU | 16.01.2017 | ||
MT | 16.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 16.01.2012 | |
AL | 17.08.2016 | ||
AT | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CY | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
IE | 16.01.2017 | ||
LU | 16.01.2017 | ||
MT | 16.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 16.01.2012 | |
AL | 17.08.2016 | ||
AT | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
IE | 16.01.2017 | ||
LU | 16.01.2017 | ||
MT | 16.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 17.08.2016 | |
AT | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
IE | 16.01.2017 | ||
LU | 16.01.2017 | ||
MT | 16.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
IE | 16.01.2017 | ||
LU | 16.01.2017 | ||
MT | 16.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
IE | 16.01.2017 | ||
LU | 16.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
LU | 16.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/45] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 17.08.2016 | |
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 17.08.2016 | |
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 17.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH0984990 (SHARP KK) [Y] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2005028298 (KIM HYUN-SOOK [KR], et al) [Y] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]US2006087263 (SA MI H [KR], et al) [A] 1-3* paragraph [0035] *; | [XY]US2008201868 (BANG EUN SUK [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,4 * the whole document * [Y] 5,6; | [A]US2010205753 (KIM WOO YOUNG [KR], et al) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [Y]JP2011055923 (PANASONIC CORP) [Y] 5,6 * abstract * | International search | [A]KR20090107164 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [A]KR20100082472 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [A]KR20100106260 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) |