EP2750546 - FURNITURE UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.05.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.06.2015 [2015/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fehre Design GmbH Talstrasse Design 19 71254 Ditzingen / DE | [2014/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FEHRE, Jürgen Römerstrasse 34 73560 Böbingen / DE | [2014/28] | Representative(s) | BSB Patentanwälte Schütte & Engelen Partnerschaft mbB Am Markt 10 59302 Oelde / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/45] | BSB Intellectual Property Law Am Markt 2 (Eingang Herrenstraße) 59302 Oelde / DE | ||
Former [2014/28] | Schütte, Hartmut, et al BSB Anwaltskanzlei Am Markt 2 Eingang Herrenstraße 59302 Oelde / DE | Application number, filing date | 12772711.3 | 28.08.2012 | WO2012EP03609 | Priority number, date | DE201110112074 | 01.09.2011 Original published format: DE102011112074 | [2014/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013029779 | Date: | 07.03.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2750546 | Date: | 09.07.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A47B47/00, F16B12/24, F16B12/36, A47B83/00 | [2014/28] | CPC: |
A47B47/00 (EP,US);
A47B47/0091 (US);
A47B83/001 (EP,US);
F16B12/24 (EP,US);
F16B12/36 (EP,US);
Y10T403/55 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/28] | Title | German: | MÖBELEINHEIT | [2014/28] | English: | FURNITURE UNIT | [2014/28] | French: | UNITÉ MEUBLE | [2014/28] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/28] | 10.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/25] | 10.12.2014 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 19.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2015/25] | 19.01.2015 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE2631618 (MUELLER WILLI) [X] 1 * figure - *; | [X]FR2390924 (BECHER REINHARD [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-8,23 * figure - *; | [X]US4226488 (VINCENT ROD G) [X] 1-8,11,12,18,19,22,23 * figure - *; | [X]FR2501310 (POYET LAGUELLE [FR]) [X] 1-3,5,7,8,11,22,23 * figure - *; | [X]US4563040 (ALSTER RALPH [US]) [X] 1-12,18,19,21-23 * figure - *; | [A]US6067762 (GREER ERNEST P [US], et al) [A] 13-23* figures 1-42 *; | [A]US6601349 (CORDEN DAVID A [US]) [A] 13-23 * the whole document *; | [A]US2006032186 (VARDARO ENZO [CA]) [A] 13-23 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2011029820 (LEGNOTECNICA SRL [IT], et al) [X] 1-4,7-12,18-20,22,23 * figure - * | by applicant | DE10127311 |