EP2631931 - Reflector lamp with UV-enhancer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/35] | LIGHT SOURCE DEVICE | ||
[2016/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Phoenix Electric Co., Ltd. 703, Mikage Toyotomi-cho Himeji-shi Hyogo 679-2122 / JP | [2013/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IKEDA, Tomihiko c/o PHOENIX ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 703, Mikage Toyotomi-cho, Himeji-shi Hyogo 6792122 / JP | 02 /
TAKAHASHI, Hiroshi c/o PHOENIX ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 703, Mikage Toyotomi-cho, Himeji-shi Hyogo 6792122 / JP | 03 /
USHIJIMA, Shinichi c/o PHOENIX ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 703, Mikage Toyotomi-cho, Himeji-shi Hyogo 6792122 / JP | 04 /
GOUDA, Tetsuya c/o PHOENIX ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 703, Mikage Toyotomi-cho, Himeji-shi Hyogo 6792122 / JP | [2013/35] | Representative(s) | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Schmid-Dreyer Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theresienhöhe 12 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/27] | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Patentanwälte PartG mbB Ganghoferstrasse 29a 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/35] | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Elsenheimerstrasse 65 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12773194.1 | 16.08.2012 | [2016/27] | WO2012JP05173 | Priority number, date | JP20110276441 | 16.12.2011 Original published format: JP 2011276441 | [2013/35] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013088596 | Date: | 20.06.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2631931 | Date: | 28.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2631931 | Date: | 06.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.06.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01J61/54, F21S2/00, F21V7/00, F21V7/06, F21V25/02, F21Y101/00 | [2014/29] | CPC: |
H01J61/54 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/35] | H01J61/54, F21S2/00, F21V7/00, F21V7/06, F21Y101/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Reflektorlampe mit UV-Enhancer | [2016/01] | English: | Reflector lamp with UV-enhancer | [2016/01] | French: | Lampe à réflecteur avec activateur UV | [2016/01] |
Former [2013/35] | LICHTQUELLENVORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2013/35] | LIGHT SOURCE DEVICE | ||
Former [2013/35] | DISPOSITIF DE SOURCE DE LUMIÈRE | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2012 | Translation filed | 26.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2012 | Search fee paid | 26.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/35] | 19.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 11.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.05.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.04.2015 | Opposition(s) | 07.04.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.08.2012 | AL | 06.07.2016 | AT | 06.07.2016 | BE | 06.07.2016 | CY | 06.07.2016 | CZ | 06.07.2016 | DK | 06.07.2016 | EE | 06.07.2016 | ES | 06.07.2016 | FI | 06.07.2016 | HR | 06.07.2016 | IT | 06.07.2016 | LT | 06.07.2016 | LV | 06.07.2016 | MC | 06.07.2016 | MK | 06.07.2016 | PL | 06.07.2016 | RO | 06.07.2016 | RS | 06.07.2016 | SE | 06.07.2016 | SI | 06.07.2016 | SK | 06.07.2016 | SM | 06.07.2016 | TR | 06.07.2016 | IE | 16.08.2016 | LU | 16.08.2016 | CH | 31.08.2016 | LI | 31.08.2016 | MT | 31.08.2016 | FR | 06.09.2016 | BG | 06.10.2016 | NO | 06.10.2016 | GR | 07.10.2016 | IS | 06.11.2016 | PT | 07.11.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 16.08.2012 | |
AT | 06.07.2016 | ||
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
CY | 06.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
MK | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
TR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IE | 16.08.2016 | ||
LU | 16.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
MT | 31.08.2016 | ||
FR | 06.09.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 16.08.2012 | |
AT | 06.07.2016 | ||
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
CY | 06.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
MK | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
TR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IE | 16.08.2016 | ||
LU | 16.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
FR | 06.09.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 16.08.2012 | |
AT | 06.07.2016 | ||
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
CY | 06.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
MK | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
IE | 16.08.2016 | ||
LU | 16.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
FR | 06.09.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 06.07.2016 | |
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
IE | 16.08.2016 | ||
LU | 16.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
FR | 06.09.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 06.07.2016 | |
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
IE | 16.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
FR | 06.09.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 06.07.2016 | |
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
IE | 16.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/25] | AT | 06.07.2016 | |
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/19] | AT | 06.07.2016 | |
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 06.07.2016 | |
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 06.07.2016 | |
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 06.07.2016 | |
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 06.07.2016 | |
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 06.07.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | BE | 31.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XDY]JP2004139955 (USHIO ELECTRIC INC) [XD] 1-3 * abstract * * paragraphs [0013] - [0048]; figures 1,4,7,8 * [Y] 3; | [A]US2011204765 (KANO YOSUKE [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0072] - [0088]; figures 1,6 *; | [Y]US2011074273 (KROELL JOSEF [DE]) [Y] 3 * abstract * * paragraphs [0022] - [0026]; figure 1; claims 1,6,7 * | International search | [A]JP4112638B (KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.); | [A]JP2004139955 (USHIO ELECTRIC INC); | [A]JP2008135194 (USHIO ELECTRIC INC); | [A]JP2007287527 (PHOENIX ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [A]JP2009117284 (USHIO ELECTRIC INC); | [A]JP2010251179 (IWASAKI ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [A]JP2009212041 (PHOENIX ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [A]JP2000047327 (IWASAKI ELECTRIC CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2004139955 |