EP2754161 - PROCESS OF MANUFACTURING OF THE CATALYTIC LAYER OF THE COUNTER-ELECTRODES OF DYE-SENSITIZED SOLAR CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.07.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.08.2017 [2017/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dyepower Viale Castro Pretorio 122 00185 Roma / IT | [2014/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROWN, Thomas Meredith Dyepower Viale Castro Pretorio 122 I-00185 Roma / IT | 02 /
MINCUZZI, Girolamo Dyepower Viale Castro Pretorio 122 I-00185 Roma / IT | 03 /
GIORDANO, Fabrizio Dyepower Viale Castro Pretorio 122 I-00185 Roma / IT | 04 /
REALE, Andrea Dyepower Viale Castro Pretorio 122 I-00185 Roma / IT | 05 /
DI CARLO, Aldo Dyepower Viale Castro Pretorio 122 I-00185 Roma / IT | [2014/29] | Representative(s) | Santi, Filippo Barzanò & Zanardo Roma S.p.A. Via Piemonte 26 00187 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2014/29] | Santi, Filippo Barzano' & Zanardo Roma S.p.A. Via Piemonte 26 00187 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 12773395.4 | 28.08.2012 | WO2012IT00262 | Priority number, date | IT2011RM00465 | 08.09.2011 Original published format: IT RM20110465 | [2014/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013035118 | Date: | 14.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2754161 | Date: | 16.07.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01G9/20 | [2014/29] | CPC: |
H01G9/2022 (EP,US);
H01G9/0029 (US);
H01G9/2031 (EP,US);
H01G9/2059 (EP,US);
H10K71/421 (EP,US);
Y02E10/542 (EP,US);
Y02P70/50 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/29] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER KATALYTISCHEN SCHICHT DER GEGENELEKTRODEN VON FARBSTOFFSENSIBILISIERTEN SOLARZELLEN | [2014/29] | English: | PROCESS OF MANUFACTURING OF THE CATALYTIC LAYER OF THE COUNTER-ELECTRODES OF DYE-SENSITIZED SOLAR CELLS | [2014/29] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE LA COUCHE CATALYTIQUE DES CONTRE-ÉLECTRODES DE CELLULES SOLAIRES À COLORANT | [2014/29] | Entry into regional phase | 10.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/29] | 25.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/32] | 31.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.03.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2016 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2009140628 (APPLIED NANOTECH HOLDINGS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 16, line 6 - page 17, line 17; figure 26 *; | [A]EP2296216 (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0069] *; | [AD] - PAN HENG ET AL, "Laser annealed composite titanium dioxide electrodes for dye-sensitized solar cells on glass and plastics", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, AIP, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, MELVILLE, NY, US, (20090220), vol. 94, no. 7, doi:10.1063/1.3082095, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 71117 - 71117, XP012119071 [AD] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.3082095 | [A] - YOON ET AL, "Enhanced performance of a dye-sensitized solar cell with an electrodeposited-platinum counter electrode", ELECTROCHIMICA ACTA, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, BARKING, GB, (20071221), vol. 53, no. 6, doi:10.1016/J.ELECTACTA.2007.10.074, ISSN 0013-4686, pages 2890 - 2896, XP022411227 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.electacta.2007.10.074 | by applicant | US2003020053 | WO2005039814 | JP2006294423 | US2006243587 | US2010034986 | - G. KHELASHVILI ET AL., THIN SOLID FILMS, (2006), vol. 511- 512, pages 342 - 348 | - N. PAPAGEORGIOU, "Counter-electrode function in nanocrystalline photoelectrochemical cell configurations", COORDINATION CHEMISTRY REVIEWS, (2004), vol. 248, doi:doi:10.1016/j.ccr.2004.03.028, pages 1421 - 1446, XP004578929 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ccr.2004.03.028 | - D. GUTIERREZ-TAUSTE ET AL., JOURNAL OF PHOTOCHEMISTRY AND PHOTOBIOLOGY A: CHEMISTRY, (2005), vol. 175, pages 165 - 171 | - H. KIM ET AL., APPL. PHYS. A, (2006), vol. 83, pages 73 - 76 | - G. MINCUZZI ET AL., APPL. PHYS. LETT., (2009), vol. 95, page 103312 | - LEE ET AL., CURRENT APPLIED PHYSICS, (2009), vol. 9, pages 404 - 408 | - T.N. MURAKAMI; M. GRAETZEL, INORGANICA CHIMICA ACTA, (2008), vol. 361, pages 572 - 580 | - A. HAUCH; A. GEORG, ELECTROCHIMICA ACTA, (2001), vol. 46, pages 3457 - 3466 | - J. M. KROON ET AL., PROG. PHOTOVOLTAICS, (2007), vol. 15, page 1 |