EP2700800 - INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE EXHAUST GAS PURIFICATION CONTROL APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.09.2017 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.11.2017 [2017/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2 Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2014/09] | For all designated states Nissan Motor Co., Ltd 2 Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SATO, Kenichi c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO.,LTD Intellectual Property Department 1-1, Morinosatoaoyama Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | 02 /
TAKAHASHI, Hideaki c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO.,LTD Intellectual Property Department 1-1, Morinosatoaoyama Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | 03 /
AMANAI, Sho c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO.,LTD Intellectual Property Department 1-1, Morinosatoaoyama Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | [2014/09] | Representative(s) | Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/09] | Hoefer & Partner Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12773732.8 | 24.02.2012 | WO2012JP54598 | Priority number, date | JP20110095680 | 22.04.2011 Original published format: JP 2011095680 | [2014/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012144269 | Date: | 26.10.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2700800 | Date: | 26.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.10.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/04, F01N3/24, F02D41/14, F02D41/12 | [2014/42] | CPC: |
F02D41/0295 (EP,US);
F01N3/20 (US);
F01N13/009 (EP,US);
F02D41/123 (EP,US);
F02D41/126 (EP,US);
F02D41/1441 (EP,US);
F01N3/101 (EP,US);
F01N3/103 (EP,US);
F02D2200/0814 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/09] | F02D41/04, F01N3/24, F02D41/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/09] | Title | German: | GASREINIGUNGS-STEUERVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR | [2014/09] | English: | INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE EXHAUST GAS PURIFICATION CONTROL APPARATUS | [2014/09] | French: | APPAREIL DE RÉGULATION DE PURIFICATION DE GAZ D'ÉCHAPPEMENT DE MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE | [2014/09] | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.2013 | Translation filed | 11.09.2013 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.2013 | Search fee paid | 11.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 11.09.2013 | Examination requested [2014/09] | 16.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/44] | 27.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/44] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.01.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2017 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP0903479 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [I] 1-3 * paragraphs [0014] , [0049]; figures 2a,2b *; | [A]US6338243 (TAKAOKA NOBUAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * column 11, line 24 - line 54 ** figures 7a,7b,7c *; | [A]US2004006971 (KAMOTO AKIRA [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * paragraph [0091]; figure 5 *; | [I]WO2006128782 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [I] 1-3 * page 17, line 17 - line 31; figures 3,4 * | International search | [Y]JPH10339195 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [Y]JP2002276433 (DENSO CORP); | [A]JP2005299430 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) | by applicant | JP2002276433 |