EP2701342 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR IMPLEMENTING ELASTIC NETWORK INTERFACE AND INTERCONNECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 13.03.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2014/09] | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AO, Ting ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
YU, Jinghai ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 03 /
WEI, Yuehua ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2014/09] | Representative(s) | Carpintero Lopez, Francisco, et al Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Agustín de Foxá, 4-10 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2014/09] | Carpintero Lopez, Francisco, et al Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Alcalá 35 28014 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 12774303.7 | 31.03.2012 | WO2012CN73429 | Priority number, date | CN201110100690 | 21.04.2011 Original published format: CN201110100690 | [2014/09] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012142910 | Date: | 26.10.2012 | Language: | ZH | [2012/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2701342 | Date: | 26.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 26.10.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/24, H04L12/709, G06F15/16, G06F11/20, H04L12/703 | [2015/01] | CPC: |
H04L45/245 (EP,US);
G06F15/161 (US);
H04L41/0654 (EP,US);
H04L45/28 (EP,US);
Y02D30/00 (EP,US);
Y02D30/50 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/09] | H04L12/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/09] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR IMPLEMENTIERUNG EINER ELASTISCHEN NETZWERKSCHNITTSTELLE UND EINER VERNETZUNG DAFÜR | [2014/09] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR IMPLEMENTING ELASTIC NETWORK INTERFACE AND INTERCONNECTION | [2014/09] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR METTRE EN OEUVRE UNE INTERFACE DE RÉSEAU ÉLASTIQUE ET UNE INTERCONNEXION | [2014/09] | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.2013 | Translation filed | 19.11.2013 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.2013 | Search fee paid | 19.11.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/09] | 24.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.11.2019 | 06.11.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 26.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/16] | 06.12.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/16] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.11.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2252015 (AVAYA INC [US]) [A] 1-18* paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0029] *; | [I]US2010329147 (NAM SCOTT K [US], et al) [I] 1-18 * figures 1-8 * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0044] * * paragraphs [0049] - [0054] *; | [A]US2011085570 (KOTHA SAIKRISHNA [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraph [0020] *; | [I] - "Multiple Systems Link Aggregation Control Protocol ; bq-rick-van-t-spijker-mslacp-final-31-05-2010-1104", IEEE DRAFT; BQ-RICK-VAN-T-SPIJKER-MSLACP-FINAL-31-05-2010-1104, IEEE-SA, PISCATAWAY, NJ USA, (20110407), vol. 802.1, pages 1 - 78, XP068008118 [I] 1-18 * page 12 - page 13 * * page 20 - page 40 * * page 71, line 1 - line 6 * * figure 29 * | [I] - "Resilient Network Interconnect: D-LAG Models ; new-haddock-Distributed-LAG-Models-1010-v2", IEEE DRAFT; NEW-HADDOCK-DISTRIBUTED-LAG-MODELS-1010-V2, IEEE-SA, PISCATAWAY, NJ USA, (20101019), vol. 802.1, no. v2, pages 1 - 16, XP017643212 [I] 1-18 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US6501749 (ALEXANDER JR CEDELL ADAM [US], et al); | [A]CN101014040 (HANGZHOU HUAWEI 3COM TECH [CN]); | [A]US7336605 (BRUCKMAN LEON [IL], et al); | [A]CN101577717 (HANGZHOU HUASAN COMM TECH CO [CN]); | [X]WO2010069041 (NORTEL NETWORKS LTD [CA], et al) |