EP2699246 - METHOD OF INHIBITING HARMFUL MICROORGANISMS AND BARRIER-FORMING COMPOSITION THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arms Pharmaceutical LLC. 812 Huron Road (Caxton Building), Suite 235 Cleveland, OH 44115 / US | [2014/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOKOL, Brian 333 Grand Harbour Vermillion, OH 44089 / US | 02 /
GHANNOUM, Afif 3695 Tolland Road Shaker Heights, OH 44122 / US | [2023/06] |
Former [2014/09] | 01 /
SOKOL, Brian 333 Grand Harbour Vermillion, OH 44089 / US | Representative(s) | Tostmann, Holger Carl Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 München / DE | [2023/24] |
Former [2014/09] | Tostmann, Holger Carl Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12774888.7 | 17.04.2012 | [2023/24] | WO2012US33921 | Priority number, date | US201161477147P | 19.04.2011 Original published format: US 201161477147 P | [2014/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012145307 | Date: | 26.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2699246 | Date: | 26.02.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.10.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2699246 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 26.10.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/08, A61K47/36, A61K31/736, A61K31/047, A61K31/155, A61P31/02, A61P39/00 | [2022/51] | CPC: |
A61K9/006 (EP,US);
A61K31/736 (KR);
A61K31/047 (KR);
A61K31/155 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/4425 (EP,US);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P11/04 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/02 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2014/41] | A61K31/736, A61K31/047, A61K31/155, A61P31/02, A61P39/00, A61K9/00, A61K47/10, A61K47/36 | ||
Former IPC [2014/09] | A61K31/736, A61K31/047, A61K31/155, A61P31/02, A61P39/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HEMMUNG SCHÄDLICHER MIRKOORGANISMEN UND BARRIEREFORMENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG DAFÜR | [2014/09] | English: | METHOD OF INHIBITING HARMFUL MICROORGANISMS AND BARRIER-FORMING COMPOSITION THEREFOR | [2014/09] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'INHIBITION DE MICROORGANISMES DANGEREUX ET COMPOSITION FORMANT BARRIÈRE POUR LE METTRE EN UVRE | [2014/09] | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.2013 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.2013 | Search fee paid | 07.11.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/09] | 02.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.11.2022 | 18.11.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 12.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.02.2016 | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 18.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 14.06.2023 | ES | 14.06.2023 | HR | 14.06.2023 | PL | 14.06.2023 | RO | 14.06.2023 | RS | 14.06.2023 | SK | 14.06.2023 | SM | 14.06.2023 | NO | 14.09.2023 | GR | 15.09.2023 | IS | 14.10.2023 | [2024/10] |
Former [2024/08] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 14.06.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US4657758 (GOLDEMBERG ROBERT L [US], et al) [X] 1-8,10-15 * column 5, line 42 - line 43 * * example 1 * [I] 9; | [XI]WO2004045572 (J P M E D LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1-8,10-15 * page 8, line 8 - line 13 * * page 9, line 12 - line 23 * * page 13, line 9 - line 12 * * example 2 * [I] 9; | [XI]US2007166244 (GHOSH CHANCHAL K [US], et al) [X] 1-8,10-15 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0055] * * example 4 *[I] 9; | [XI]EP2100590 (SUNSTAR INC [JP]) [X] 1-8,10-15 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0046] * [I] 9; | [XI]US2009238777 (JOZIAK MARILOU [US], et al) [X] 1-8,10-15 * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0053] * * example 1 * [I] 9 | International search | [X]US6749869 (RICHTER FRANCIS L [US], et al); | [X]RU2302865 (KOLI FARMAS JUTIKAL GMBKH [DE]); | [X]US2008206155 (TAMARKIN DOV [IL], et al); | [A]US2008255498 (HOULE PHILIP R [US]) | Examination | - BALAKRISHNAN M ET AL, "Dental caries is a preventable infectious disease.", AUSTRALIAN DENTAL JOURNAL DEC 2000, (200012), vol. 45, no. 4, ISSN 0045-0421, pages 235 - 245 | - CAUFIELD PAGE W ET AL, "Dental caries: an infectious and transmissible disease.", MEDLINE, US NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE (NLM), BETHESDA, MD, US, (200505), Database accession no. NLM17036539 | - COMPENDIUM OF CONTINUING EDUCATION IN DENTISTRY (JAMESBURG, N.J. : 1995) MAY 2005, (200505), vol. 26, no. 5 Suppl 1, ISSN 1548-8578, pages 10 - 16 | by applicant | US4657758 | WO2004045572 | US6749869 | RU2004132209 | US2007166244 | US2008206155 | US2008255498 | EP2100590 | US2009238777 | - MONICA BOIRIVANTAWARREN STROBER, "The Mechanism of Action of Probiotics", Current Opinion in Gastroenterology, (20070000), vol. 23, pages 679 - 692 | - "Gastrointestinal mucosal injury in experimental models of shock, trauma, and sepsis", Crit. Care Med., (19910000), vol. 19, pages 627 - 41 | - ANDERS HEIMDAHL, "Prevention and Management of Oral Infections in Cancer Patients", Supportive Care in Cancer, (19990000), vol. 7, no. 4, doi:10.1007/s005200050253, pages 224 - 228, XP037076881 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s005200050253 | - SHAHAB A. KHANJOHN R. WINGARD, "Infection and Mucosal Injury", Cancer Treatment Journal of the National Cancer Institute, (20010000), no. 29 | - FRANK-ALBERT PITTENAXEL KRAMER, "Efficacy of Cetylpyridinium Chloride Used as Oropharyngeal Antiseptic", Arzneim.-Forsch./Drug Res, (20010000), vol. 51, no. II, doi:10.1055/s-0031-1300084, pages 588 - 595, XP001537477 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1055/s-0031-1300084 | - CHANDRA et al., "In vitro Growth and Analysis of Candida Biofilms", Nature Protocols, (20080000), vol. 3, no. 12, pages 1909 - 1924 |