EP2662123 - ROBOT TOY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.10.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.11.2016 [2016/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tomy Company, Ltd. 7-9-10, Tateishi Katsushika-ku Tokyo 124-8511 / JP | [2013/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAGAI, Tomohito Room 804, Rune Kagurazaka, 39 Tansumachi Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-0833 / JP | 02 /
SATO, Ryoichi c/o TOMY COMPANY, LTD. 7-9-10, Tateishi Katsushika-ku Tokyo 124-8511 / JP | 03 /
KITAMURA, Teruo c/o TOMY COMPANY, LTD. 7-9-10, Tateishi Katsushika-ku Tokyo 124-8511 / JP | [2013/46] | Representative(s) | Hancox, Jonathan Christopher, et al Venner Shipley LLP Windsor House 6-10 Mount Ephraim Road Tunbridge Wells, Kent TN1 1EE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/46] | Bailey, David Martin Brookes Batchellor LLP 46 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JE / GB | Application number, filing date | 12775595.7 | 31.01.2012 | WO2012JP52146 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013099299 | Date: | 04.07.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2662123 | Date: | 13.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.07.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A63H13/06, A63H11/00 | [2014/04] | CPC: |
A63H13/06 (EP,KR,US);
A63H11/00 (EP,US);
A63H29/22 (KR,US);
A63H3/46 (KR);
A63H31/08 (KR);
A63H30/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/46] | A63H13/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/46] | Title | German: | SPIELZEUGROBOTER | [2013/46] | English: | ROBOT TOY | [2013/46] | French: | ROBOT JOUET | [2013/46] | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.2013 | Translation filed | 01.11.2012 | National basic fee paid | 01.11.2012 | Search fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/14] | 31.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/46] | 30.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.07.2015 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees GB, TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 20.02.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 20.02.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.03.2014 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 20.02.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 20.02.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.03.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2016 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5290185 (MURAKAMI SEIJI [JP]) [A] 1-6 * column 3, line 20 - column 6, line 27; figure - *; | [A]JP3006324U (TOMY CO., LTD.) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004198160 (FONG PETER SUI LUN [US]) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0084]; figure -; claim 1 *; | [A]EP1938877 (TOMY CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0024]; figure - *; | [A]CN201235220Y (LIANGSHENG QIU [CN]) [A] 1-6* abstract * | International search | [Y]JPH0626992U (BANDAI CO., LTD.); | [A]JPH06210073 (BANDAI CO); | [A]JPH06327843 (BANDAI CO); | [Y]JP3006324U (TOMY CO., LTD.); | [A]JP2000116965 (BANDAI CO) | by applicant | JP2701121B |