EP2702154 - CELLOBIOHYDROLASE VARIANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.12.2017 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.01.2018 [2018/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [2016/15] |
Former [2014/10] | For all designated states Codexis, Inc. 200 Penobscot Drive Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VOLADRI, Rama c/o Codexis Inc. 200 Penobscot Drive Redwood City, California 94063 / US | 02 /
ZHANG, Xiyun c/o Codexis Inc. 200 Penobscot Drive Redwood City, California 94063 / US | 03 /
PATIL, Sachin c/o Codexis Inc. 200 Penobscot Drive Redwood City, California 94063 / US | 04 /
ELGART, David c/o Codexis Inc. 200 Penobscot Drive Redwood City, California 94063 / US | 05 /
MILLER, Gregory c/o Codexis Inc. 200 Penobscot Drive Redwood City, California 94063 / US | 06 /
CLARK, Louis c/o Codexis Inc. 200 Penobscot Drive Redwood City, California 94063 / US | 07 /
CHAN, Kui c/o Codexis Inc. 200 Penobscot Drive Redwood City, California 94063 / US | [2014/10] | Representative(s) | Matthezing, Robert Maarten Shell International B.V. Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 384 2501 CJ The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2014/10] | Chapman, Desmond Mark Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 12776541.0 | 27.04.2012 | WO2012US35571 | Priority number, date | US201161479800P | 27.04.2011 Original published format: US 201161479800 P | US201261613827P | 21.03.2012 Original published format: US 201261613827 P | [2014/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012149403 | Date: | 01.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2702154 | Date: | 05.03.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.11.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 01.11.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/42, // C12P19/02, C12P19/14 | [2014/51] | CPC: |
C12N9/2437 (EP,US);
C12N9/2434 (EP,US);
C12P19/02 (EP,US);
C12P19/14 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/10] | C12N9/42 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/10] | Title | German: | ZELLBIOHYDROLASE-VARIANTEN | [2014/10] | English: | CELLOBIOHYDROLASE VARIANTS | [2014/10] | French: | VARIANTS DE CELLOBIOHYDROLASE | [2014/10] | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.2013 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.2013 | Search fee paid | 07.11.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/10] | 25.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/04] | 05.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.03.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2017 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2009042871 (NOVOZYMES AS [DK], et al) [X] 1,2,7-12 * the whole document * [I] 13,14; | [XI]WO2009059175 (NOVOZYMES INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7-12 * the whole document * [I] 13,14; | [XI]WO2009085859 (NOVOZYMES AS [DK], et al) [X] 1,2,7-12 * the whole document * [I] 13,14; | [XI]WO2010088387 (NOVOZYMES INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7-12 * the whole document * [I] 13,14; | [XI]WO2010088463 (NOVOZYMES INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7-12 * the whole document * [I] 13,14; | [XI]US2010304437 (GARNER ASHLEY [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7-12 * the whole document *[I] 13,14 | International search | [X]WO2006074005 (GENENCOR INT [US], et al); | [X]WO2008025164 (IOGEN ENERGY CORP [CA], et al); | [X]WO2008095033 (VERENIUM CORP [US], et al); | [X]WO2008153925 (DANISCO US INC GENENCOR DIV [US], et al); | [X]WO2008153903 (DANISCO US INC GENENCOR DIV [US], et al); | [X]WO2010066411 (DIREVO IND BIOTECHNOLOGY GMBH [DE], et al); | [X]WO2010118058 (CALIFORNIA INST OF TECHN [US], et al); | [X]WO2010141325 (NOVOZYMES INC [US], et al); | [X]WO2010141779 (DANISCO US INC [US], et al); | [XP]WO2011080317 (ROAL OY [FI], et al); | [XP]WO2011098580 (DSM IP ASSETS BV [NL], et al); | [XP]WO2012044915 (NOVOZYMES INC [US], et al) |