EP2702034 - PREPARATION OF FINGOLIMOD AND ITS SALTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.02.2016 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2017 | Change - priority | published on 19.04.2017 [2017/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd. 8-2-337, Road No. 3 Banjara Hills Hyderabad 500 034 Andhra Pradesh / IN | [2014/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATKAM, Srinivas H. No: 13-1/32/3 Saipuri Colony Malkajgiri Hyderabad Andhra Pradesh 500 047 / IN | 02 /
SAGYAM, Rajeswar, Reddy Plot No. 1322&1323 Flat No. 204 Vindhya Hills Pragathi Nagar, Hyderabad Andhra Pradesh 500 072 / IN | 03 /
MORTHALA, Raghavendar, Rao P-13 Prakruthi Nivas Opp. Dundigal Air Force Academy Annaram Jinnaram (Mandal), Medak (dist) Andhra Pradesh 502 313 / IN | 04 /
IRENI, Babu Adarsh Nagar H. No. 4-83/232 Hyderabad Andhra Pradesh 500 088 / IN | 05 /
VINIGARI, Krishna H. No. 2-127 Shivaji Nagar Devarakadara (post/mandal) Mahabubnagar Andhra Pradesh 509 204 / IN | 06 /
RAMDOSS, Suresh, Kumar H. No. 2/1888-24 Sethupathy Nagar (N) Ramanathapuram Tamil Nadu 623 503 / IN | 07 /
RANGINENI, Srinivasulu Machinenipally (Village) Yenmenbetla (Post) Kollapur (Mandal) Mahabubnagar Andhra Pradesh 509 102 / IN | 08 /
TUMMALA, Arjunkumar H. No: 39-26-25 Rajiv Nagar NH-5 Marripalem, Visakhapatnam Andra Pradesh 530 027 / IN | 09 /
IQBAL, Javed 113 Villa Gardens Gandipet Hyderabad Andhra Pradesh 500 075 / IN | 10 /
ORUGANTI, Srinivas 404 Sai Sir Apartments Camelot Layout Kondapur Hyderabad Andhra Pradesh 500 032 / IN | 11 /
KANDAGATLA, Bhaskar H. No. 2-2-129/102 Pushpa Enclave Vijayapuri Colony Uppal, Hyderabad Andhra Pradesh 500 039 / IN | [2014/10] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/10] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Grafinger Straße 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12777520.3 | 27.04.2012 | WO2012IB00922 | Priority number, date | IN2011CHE1502 | 29.04.2011 Original published format: IN 1502CH2011 | IN2011CHE1597 | 09.05.2011 Original published format: IN 1597CH2011 | US201161497228P | 15.06.2011 Original published format: US 201161497228 P | US201161499957P | 22.06.2011 Original published format: US 201161499957 P | IN2011CHE2401 | 13.07.2011 Original published format: IN 2401CH2011 | US201161527742P | 26.08.2011 Original published format: US 201161527742 P | IN2011CHE4524 | 22.12.2011 Original published format: IN 4524CH2011 | US201261595189P | 06.02.2012 Original published format: US 201261595189 P | [2017/16] |
Former [2014/10] | IN2011CHE1502 | 29.04.2011 | |
IN2011CHE1597 | 09.05.2011 | ||
US201161497228P | 15.06.2011 | ||
US201161499957P | 22.06.2011 | ||
IN2011CHE2401 | 13.07.2011 | ||
US201161527742P | 26.08.2011 | ||
IN2011CHE4524 | 22.12.2011 | ||
US201261595189P | 06.02.2012 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012146980 | Date: | 01.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2702034 | Date: | 05.03.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.11.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 27.12.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C07C211/00, C07D333/20, C07C213/02, C07C201/10, C07C201/12 | [2015/13] | CPC: |
C07C201/10 (EP,US);
C07C205/45 (US);
C07C201/12 (EP,US);
C07C213/00 (US);
C07C213/02 (EP,US);
C07C213/10 (US);
C07C215/28 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C201/10, C07C205/04 (US,EP);
C07C201/12, C07C205/04 (EP,US);
C07C213/02, C07C215/28 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2014/10] | C07C211/00, C07D333/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/10] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG VON FINGOLIMOD UND DESSEN SALZEN | [2014/10] | English: | PREPARATION OF FINGOLIMOD AND ITS SALTS | [2014/10] | French: | PRÉPARATION DU FINGOLIMOD ET SES SELS | [2014/10] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2013 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2013 | Search fee paid | 14.11.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/10] | 28.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/11] | 02.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - ROHM AND HAAS, "AMBERLYST A21 Industrial Grade Weakly Basic Polymeric Resin product data sheet", INTERNET CITATION, (200507), URL: http://www.rohmhaas.com/ionexchange/IP/literature/a4/A21.pdf, (20060712), XP002389986 [I] 14,15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]CN1765872 (JIANGSU WUZHONG PHARMACEUTICAL [CN]); | [X] - BISWAJIT KALITA ET AL., "Synthesis of 2-nitro alcohols by regioselective ring opening of epoxides with MgS04/MeOH/NaN02 system: a short synthesis of immunosuppressive agent FTY-720", SYNLETT, (2001), no. 9, pages 1411 - 1414, XP002607731 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1055/s-2001-16776 |