EP2737716 - MAP YOUR MOVIE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.02.2019 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Synamedia Limited One London Road Staines, Middlesex TW18 4EX / GB | [2019/10] |
Former [2014/23] | For all designated states NDS Limited One London Road Staines, Middlesex TW18 4EX / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRAT, Yann 5 Rue de Montidier F-78990 Elancourt / FR | 02 /
GARDES, Laurent 2 Rue du Bel Air F-92190 Meudon / FR | 03 /
LACOUR, Olivier 30 Rue Falguière F-75015 Paris / FR | 04 /
LALLEMANT, Berangere 64 Boulevard Voltaire F-75011 Paris / FR | [2014/23] | Representative(s) | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/23] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles Forresters Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12778136.7 | 05.09.2012 | WO2012IB54578 | Priority number, date | US201161573536P | 08.09.2011 Original published format: US 201161573536 P | [2014/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013035046 | Date: | 14.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2737716 | Date: | 04.06.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/4722, H04N21/41, H04N21/422, H04N21/81 | [2014/23] | CPC: |
H04N21/4722 (EP,US);
H04N21/4112 (EP,US);
H04N21/4126 (EP,US);
H04N21/42204 (US);
H04N21/42209 (EP,US);
H04N21/4316 (US);
H04N21/47 (US);
H04N21/47208 (EP,US);
H04N21/8133 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/23] | Title | German: | GEOLOKALISIERUNG VON FILMEN | [2014/23] | English: | MAP YOUR MOVIE | [2014/23] | French: | MAPPER VOTRE FILM | [2014/23] | Entry into regional phase | 25.02.2014 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/23] | 18.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/12] | 08.02.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.02.2019 | 15.02.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.11.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2003126616 (DEWA YOSHIHARU [JP]) [I] 1-16 * abstract * * figures 2,4 * * paragraph [0095] - paragraph [0103] *; | [A]EP1976159 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * figures 5,6 * * paragraph [0043] *; | [A]WO2007129865 (KOREA ELECTRONICS TELECOMM [KR], et al) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0018] * | Examination | US2010030806 | by applicant | US6741790 | US2002048054 |