EP2768741 - Method and apparatus for the manufacture of a can end. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/35] | CAN END | ||
[2015/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Crown Packaging Technology, Inc. 11535 S. Central Avenue Alsip, IL 60803-2599 / US | [2014/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUNWOODY, Paul Robert 3, Witan Way Wantage Oxfordshire OX12 9EU / GB | [2014/35] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2015/34] |
Former [2014/35] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12778297.7 | 19.10.2012 | [2015/34] | WO2012EP70756 | Priority number, date | GB20110018284 | 21.10.2011 Original published format: GB 201118284 | [2014/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013057250 | Date: | 25.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2768741 | Date: | 27.08.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.04.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2768741 | Date: | 19.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B65D17/00, B21D22/06, B21D51/44 | [2014/35] | CPC: |
B65D17/08 (EP,US);
B65D7/36 (US);
B21D22/06 (US);
B21D22/22 (EP,US);
B21D51/263 (US);
B21D51/2661 (US);
B21D51/32 (US);
B21D51/44 (EP,US);
B65D2517/0052 (EP,US);
B65D2517/0062 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung eines Dosendeckels. | [2015/16] | English: | Method and apparatus for the manufacture of a can end. | [2015/16] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour la fabrication d'une extrémité de boîte. | [2015/16] |
Former [2014/35] | DOSENENDE | ||
Former [2014/35] | CAN END | ||
Former [2014/35] | EXTRÉMITÉ DE BOÎTE | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.2014 | National basic fee paid | 23.04.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.04.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/35] | 18.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.04.2015 | Opposition(s) | 20.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2014 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.11.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.10.2012 | AL | 19.08.2015 | AT | 19.08.2015 | BE | 19.08.2015 | BG | 19.08.2015 | CY | 19.08.2015 | CZ | 19.08.2015 | DK | 19.08.2015 | EE | 19.08.2015 | ES | 19.08.2015 | FI | 19.08.2015 | HR | 19.08.2015 | IT | 19.08.2015 | LT | 19.08.2015 | LV | 19.08.2015 | MC | 19.08.2015 | MK | 19.08.2015 | MT | 19.08.2015 | NL | 19.08.2015 | RO | 19.08.2015 | RS | 19.08.2015 | SE | 19.08.2015 | SI | 19.08.2015 | SK | 19.08.2015 | SM | 19.08.2015 | TR | 19.08.2015 | LU | 19.10.2015 | CH | 31.10.2015 | LI | 31.10.2015 | NO | 19.11.2015 | IS | 19.12.2015 | PT | 21.12.2015 | DE | 03.05.2016 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 19.10.2012 | |
AT | 19.08.2015 | ||
BE | 19.08.2015 | ||
BG | 19.08.2015 | ||
CY | 19.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
HR | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
MK | 19.08.2015 | ||
MT | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
SM | 19.08.2015 | ||
TR | 19.08.2015 | ||
LU | 19.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
DE | 03.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 19.10.2012 | |
AT | 19.08.2015 | ||
BE | 19.08.2015 | ||
BG | 19.08.2015 | ||
CY | 19.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
HR | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
MK | 19.08.2015 | ||
MT | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
SM | 19.08.2015 | ||
LU | 19.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
DE | 03.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 19.10.2012 | |
AT | 19.08.2015 | ||
BE | 19.08.2015 | ||
BG | 19.08.2015 | ||
CY | 19.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
HR | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
MT | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
SM | 19.08.2015 | ||
LU | 19.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
DE | 03.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
BE | 19.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
LU | 19.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
DE | 03.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
LU | 19.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
DE | 03.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
LU | 19.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
DE | 03.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
LU | 19.10.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/26] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
LU | 19.10.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 19.08.2015 | |
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 19.08.2015 | |
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 19.08.2015 | |
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 19.08.2015 | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO9637414 (METAL BOX PLC [GB], et al) [AD] 1,6,14,15,17,24,27,30,34,38,39,42 * the whole document *; | [XA]US5636761 (DIAMOND GEORGE B [US], et al) [X] 1,3-6,8,14,15,38 * column 7, paragraph 1; figures 11a,11b * [A] 42; | [XA]US6158608 (SCHLATTL WERNER [DE]) [X] 1-7,9-16,38 * abstract * [A] 42; | [A]US6428261 (ZYSSET EDGAR H [US]) [A] 1,6,14,15,17,24,27,30,34,38,39,42 * page 3, line 45 - page 4, line 26; figure - *; | [XA]US2002158071 (CHASTEEN HOWARD C [US], et al) [X] 1,3-6,14,38 * paragraphs [0028] , [0030]; figures 1,3 * [A] 15,17,24,27,30,34,39,42; | [XAI]US2005044920 (MCCLUNG JAMES A [US]) [X] 27,30,32,38 * paragraphs [0037] - [0041]; figure - * [A] 1,4,6,14,15,17,24,28,29,33,34,39,42 [I] 31; | [A]US2009039090 (FORREST RANDALL G [US], et al) [A] 1,6,14,15,17,24,27,30,34,38,39,42* figure - *; | [A]US2010006571 (SHIBASAKA MAMORU [JP], et al) [A] 1,6,14,15,17,24,27,30,34,38,39,42 * paragraphs [0053] - [0056]; figure - *; | [IA]US2010243663 (JENTZSCH KEVIN REED [US], et al) [I] 1-7,9-15,38 [A] 17,24,27,30,34,39,42 |