EP2698724 - DEVICE WITH FFT RADIX 2 BUTTERFLY OPERATION PROCESSING ABILITY AND METHOD FOR IMPLEMENTING OPERATIONS THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.03.2019 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.04.2019 [2019/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2014/08] | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHEN, Chengke ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2014/08] | Representative(s) | Lavoix Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/08] | Tischner, Oliver Lavoix Munich Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12779547.4 | 20.04.2012 | WO2012CN74451 | Priority number, date | CN201110115129 | 05.05.2011 Original published format: CN201110115129 | [2014/08] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012149871 | Date: | 08.11.2012 | Language: | ZH | [2012/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2698724 | Date: | 19.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 08.11.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/14 | [2014/08] | CPC: |
G06F17/142 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/08] | Title | German: | ZUR VERARBEITUNG EINES FFT-RADIX-2 KLAPPENBETRIEBS FÄHIGE VORRICHTUNG UND OPERATIONSUMSETZUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2014/08] | English: | DEVICE WITH FFT RADIX 2 BUTTERFLY OPERATION PROCESSING ABILITY AND METHOD FOR IMPLEMENTING OPERATIONS THEREFOR | [2014/08] | French: | DISPOSITIF COMPORTANT UNE CAPACITÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'OPÉRATIONS PAPILLON FFT DE BASE 2 ET PROCÉDÉ DE MISE EN OEUVRE D'OPÉRATIONS CORRESPONDANTES | [2014/08] | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.2013 | Translation filed | 11.11.2013 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.2013 | Search fee paid | 11.11.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/08] | 22.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/17] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.11.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2001039557 (LIM IL TAEK [KR], et al) [I] 1-9 * page 3 - page 5; figure 7 *; | [A]US2008126758 (KWON YOUNG-SU [KR], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US5028877 (MULLER HERBERT [DE], et al); | [A]JPH05174046 (RICOH KK); | [A]CN1464690 (ZTE CORP [CN]); | [A]CN1700203 (CHINA AEROSPACE TIMES ELECTRONICS CORP [CN]); | [A]CN101587469 (UNIV PEKING SZ GRADUATE SCHOOL [CN]) |