EP2705124 - LOW POUR POINT RENEWABLE FUEL BLEND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.10.2015 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.11.2015 [2015/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chevron U.S.A. Inc. 6001 Bollinger Canyon Road San Ramon, CA 94583 / US | For all designated states Chevron Oronite Company LLC 6001 Bollinger Canyon Road San Ramon, CA 94583 / US | [2015/29] |
Former [2014/11] | For all designated states Chevron U.S.A. Incorporated 6001 Bollinger Canyon Road San Ramon, California 94583 / US | ||
For all designated states Chevron Oronite Company LLC 6001 Bollinger Canyon Road San Ramon, CA 94583 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHOU, Guangci 6001 Bollinger Canyon Road San Ramon, California 94583 / US | 02 /
ROBY, Stephen Harold 6001 Bollinger Canyon Road San Ramon, California 94583 / US | 03 /
BRAFMAN, Rebecca 6001 Bollinger Canyon Road San Ramon, California 94583 / US | [2014/11] | Representative(s) | Nash, David Allan Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [2014/11] | Application number, filing date | 12779808.0 | 30.03.2012 | WO2012US31531 | Priority number, date | US201113100832 | 04.05.2011 Original published format: US201113100832 | [2014/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012151016 | Date: | 08.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2705124 | Date: | 12.03.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.11.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 27.12.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C10L1/04, C10G3/00, C10L1/16 | [2014/11] | CPC: |
C10L1/04 (EP,US);
C10G3/50 (EP,US);
C10G45/00 (EP,US);
C10G2300/1011 (EP,US);
C10G2300/1048 (EP,US);
C10G2300/301 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/11] | Title | German: | ERNEUERBARE KRAFTSTOFFMISCHUNG MIT NIEDRIGEM STOCKPUNKT | [2014/11] | English: | LOW POUR POINT RENEWABLE FUEL BLEND | [2014/11] | French: | MÉLANGE DE CARBURANT RENOUVELABLE À POINT D'ÉCOULEMENT BAS | [2014/11] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2013 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2013 | Search fee paid | 27.11.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/11] | 22.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/48] | 29.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2008244962 (ABHARI RAMIN [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-15* paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0013]; example 1; claim 8; table 3 *; | [X]WO2010022254 (SYNTROLEUM CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0003] , [0005] , [0015]; examples 1,2; tables 1,4 * | International search | [A]EP1484385 (MALAYSIAN PALM OIL BOARD [MY]); | [A]US2007282000 (MURPHY TIMOTHY A [US], et al); | [A]US2010151112 (FRANKLIN SCOTT [US], et al); | [A]US2010296997 (PARKER REGINALD [US], et al) |