EP2716855 - GLASS SHEET FOR WINDOW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.05.2015 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.06.2015 [2015/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Frontier Technology Laboratory Inc. Kyodo Tsushin Building 2-5 Toranomon 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0001 / JP | [2014/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOMATSU Nobuaki c/o International Frontier Technology Laboratory Inc. KyodoTsushin Bldg. 2-5 Toranomon 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0001 / JP | 02 /
ITO Tomoko c/o International Frontier Technology Laboratory Inc. KyodoTsushin Bldg. 2-5 Toranomon 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0001 / JP | 03 /
SHIRAI Katsuhiko c/o International Frontier Technology Laboratory Inc. KyodoTsushin Bldg. 2-5 Toranomon 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0001 / JP | 04 /
NANJO Shin-ichiro c/o International Frontier Technology Laboratory Inc. KyodoTsushin Bldg. 2-5 Toranomon 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0001 / JP | [2014/15] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/15] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 13 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12781698.1 | 10.05.2012 | WO2012JP61986 | Priority number, date | JP20110105710 | 10.05.2011 Original published format: JP 2011105710 | JP20110126726 | 06.06.2011 Original published format: JP 2011126726 | JP20110241704 | 02.11.2011 Original published format: JP 2011241704 | [2014/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012153803 | Date: | 15.11.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2716855 | Date: | 09.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | E06B9/24, E06B3/66, H01L31/04, H01M14/00 | [2014/15] | CPC: |
H01G9/2068 (EP);
H01G9/2031 (EP);
H01G9/2059 (EP);
Y02E10/542 (EP);
Y02T10/70 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/15] | Title | German: | GLASSCHEIBE FÜR FENSTER | [2014/15] | English: | GLASS SHEET FOR WINDOW | [2014/15] | French: | PLAQUE DE VERRE POUR FENÊTRE | [2014/15] | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.2013 | Translation filed | 10.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.2013 | Search fee paid | 10.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/15] | 02.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/23] | 23.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/23] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2001320068 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [Y]WO2011049156 (INTERNAT FRONTIER TECH LAB INC [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2010140860 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [A]JP2010526398 (SK ENERGY CO., LTD.); | [A]JP2008112704 (KMEW KUBOTA MATSUSHITADENKO) | by applicant | JP2004290748 | JP4214221B | JP2004290747 | JP4247780B | WO2005089941 | WO2011049156 |