EP2707094 - SINGLE-PULSE ACTIVATION OF THE CHOLINERGIC ANTI-INFLAMMATORY PATHWAY TO TREAT CHRONIC INFLAMMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.12.2016 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Setpoint Medical Corporation 27441 Tourney Road, Suite 200 Valencia, CA 91355 / US | [2014/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEVINE, Jacob, A. 27441 Tourney Road, Suite 200 Valencia, CA 91355 / US | 02 /
FALTYS, Michael, A. 27441 Tourney Road, Suite 200 Valencia, CA 91355 / US | [2014/12] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/05] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2014/12] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham, NG1 5GG / GB | Application number, filing date | 12781964.7 | 09.05.2012 | [2016/05] | WO2012US37142 | Priority number, date | US201161484112P | 09.05.2011 Original published format: US 201161484112 P | [2014/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012154865 | Date: | 15.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2707094 | Date: | 19.03.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2707094 | Date: | 03.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 31.01.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/36, A61N1/05, A61N1/372 | [2014/12] | CPC: |
A61N1/36053 (EP,US);
A61N1/3606 (EP,US);
F04C2270/0421 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINZELIMPULSAKTIVIERUNG DES CHOLINERGEN ENTZÜNDUNGSHEMMENDEN PFADES ZUR BEHANDLUNG CHRONISCHER ENTZÜNDUNGEN | [2014/12] | English: | SINGLE-PULSE ACTIVATION OF THE CHOLINERGIC ANTI-INFLAMMATORY PATHWAY TO TREAT CHRONIC INFLAMMATION | [2014/12] | French: | ACTIVATION D'IMPULSIONS UNIQUES DE LA VOIE ANTI-INFLAMMATOIRE CHOLINERGIQUE POUR TRAITER L'INFLAMMATION CHRONIQUE | [2014/12] | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.2013 | Search fee paid | 06.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/12] | 08.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | 04.11.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.05.2012 | AL | 03.02.2016 | AT | 03.02.2016 | BE | 03.02.2016 | CY | 03.02.2016 | CZ | 03.02.2016 | DK | 03.02.2016 | EE | 03.02.2016 | ES | 03.02.2016 | FI | 03.02.2016 | HR | 03.02.2016 | IT | 03.02.2016 | LT | 03.02.2016 | LV | 03.02.2016 | MC | 03.02.2016 | MK | 03.02.2016 | NL | 03.02.2016 | PL | 03.02.2016 | RO | 03.02.2016 | RS | 03.02.2016 | SE | 03.02.2016 | SI | 03.02.2016 | SK | 03.02.2016 | SM | 03.02.2016 | TR | 03.02.2016 | BG | 03.05.2016 | NO | 03.05.2016 | GR | 04.05.2016 | IE | 09.05.2016 | LU | 09.05.2016 | CH | 31.05.2016 | LI | 31.05.2016 | MT | 31.05.2016 | IS | 03.06.2016 | PT | 03.06.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 09.05.2012 | |
AT | 03.02.2016 | ||
BE | 03.02.2016 | ||
CY | 03.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2016 | ||
DK | 03.02.2016 | ||
EE | 03.02.2016 | ||
ES | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
IT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
MC | 03.02.2016 | ||
MK | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
RO | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
SI | 03.02.2016 | ||
SK | 03.02.2016 | ||
SM | 03.02.2016 | ||
TR | 03.02.2016 | ||
BG | 03.05.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IE | 09.05.2016 | ||
LU | 09.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
MT | 31.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 09.05.2012 | |
AT | 03.02.2016 | ||
BE | 03.02.2016 | ||
CY | 03.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2016 | ||
DK | 03.02.2016 | ||
EE | 03.02.2016 | ||
ES | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
IT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
MC | 03.02.2016 | ||
MK | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
RO | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
SI | 03.02.2016 | ||
SK | 03.02.2016 | ||
SM | 03.02.2016 | ||
TR | 03.02.2016 | ||
BG | 03.05.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IE | 09.05.2016 | ||
LU | 09.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 09.05.2012 | |
AT | 03.02.2016 | ||
BE | 03.02.2016 | ||
CY | 03.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2016 | ||
DK | 03.02.2016 | ||
EE | 03.02.2016 | ||
ES | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
IT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
MC | 03.02.2016 | ||
MK | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
RO | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
SI | 03.02.2016 | ||
SK | 03.02.2016 | ||
SM | 03.02.2016 | ||
BG | 03.05.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IE | 09.05.2016 | ||
LU | 09.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 03.02.2016 | |
BE | 03.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2016 | ||
DK | 03.02.2016 | ||
EE | 03.02.2016 | ||
ES | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
IT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
RO | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
SI | 03.02.2016 | ||
SK | 03.02.2016 | ||
SM | 03.02.2016 | ||
BG | 03.05.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IE | 09.05.2016 | ||
LU | 09.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/16] | AT | 03.02.2016 | |
BE | 03.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2016 | ||
DK | 03.02.2016 | ||
EE | 03.02.2016 | ||
ES | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
IT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
RO | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
SI | 03.02.2016 | ||
SK | 03.02.2016 | ||
SM | 03.02.2016 | ||
BG | 03.05.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LU | 09.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 03.02.2016 | |
BE | 03.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2016 | ||
DK | 03.02.2016 | ||
EE | 03.02.2016 | ||
ES | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
IT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
RO | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
SK | 03.02.2016 | ||
SM | 03.02.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LU | 09.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | AT | 03.02.2016 | |
BE | 03.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2016 | ||
DK | 03.02.2016 | ||
EE | 03.02.2016 | ||
ES | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
IT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
RO | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
SK | 03.02.2016 | ||
SM | 03.02.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LU | 09.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 03.02.2016 | |
BE | 03.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2016 | ||
DK | 03.02.2016 | ||
EE | 03.02.2016 | ||
ES | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
IT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
RO | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
SK | 03.02.2016 | ||
SM | 03.02.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 03.02.2016 | |
CZ | 03.02.2016 | ||
DK | 03.02.2016 | ||
EE | 03.02.2016 | ||
ES | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
IT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
RO | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
SK | 03.02.2016 | ||
SM | 03.02.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 03.02.2016 | |
DK | 03.02.2016 | ||
EE | 03.02.2016 | ||
ES | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
IT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 03.02.2016 | |
DK | 03.02.2016 | ||
ES | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
IT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 03.02.2016 | |
ES | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
IT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 03.02.2016 | |
ES | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
IT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 03.02.2016 | |
ES | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
IT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 03.02.2016 | |
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - ZHANG YOUHUA ET AL, "Chronic vagus nerve stimulation improves autonomic control and attenuates systemic inflammation and heart failure progression in a canine high-rate pacing model.", MEDLINE, US NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE (NLM), BETHESDA, MD, US, (200911), Database accession no. NLM19919995, XP002730397 [A] 1-11 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/CIRCHEARTFAILURE.109.873968 | [ ] - CIRCULATION. HEART FAILURE, (200911), vol. 2, no. 6, ISSN 1941-3297, pages 692 - 699, XP002730907 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/CIRCHEARTFAILURE.109.873968 | International search | [A]US2005143787 (BOVEJA BIRINDER R [US], et al); | [A]US2008249439 (TRACEY KEVIN J [US], et al); | [A]US2008275514 (BEN-DAVID TAMIR [IL], et al); | [A]US2009143831 (HUSTON JARED M [US], et al); | [A]US2009247934 (TRACEY KEVIN J [US], et al) |