EP2770845 - ORGANIC COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.05.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Givaudan SA Chemin de la Parfumerie 5 1214 Vernier / CH | [2014/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE KLERK, Adri Meeuwenlaan 11 NL-4912 VK Made / NL | 02 /
ELINGS, Jacob, Antonius De Ruyterstraat 52 NL-1271 SW Huizen / NL | 03 /
WINKEL, Cornelis Lothariuslaan 40 NL-1402 GL Bussum / NL | 04 /
TONDEUR, Alexander P. Lindelaan 96-B NL-1231 CN Loosdrecht / NL | [2014/36] | Representative(s) | Global Patents Givaudan International SA Ueberlandstrasse 138 8600 Dübendorf / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2014/36] | Givaudan Patents Givaudan Schweiz AG Global Patents Ueberlandstrasse 138 8600 Dübendorf / CH | Application number, filing date | 12783554.4 | 26.10.2012 | WO2012EP71207 | Priority number, date | GB20110018481 | 26.10.2011 Original published format: GB 201118481 | [2014/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013060814 | Date: | 02.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2770845 | Date: | 03.09.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/22, A23L1/228 | [2014/36] | CPC: |
A23L27/88 (EP,US);
A23L27/202 (EP,US);
A23L27/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/36] | Title | German: | ORGANISCHE VERBINDUNGEN | [2014/36] | English: | ORGANIC COMPOUNDS | [2014/36] | French: | COMPOSÉS ORGANIQUES | [2014/36] | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.2014 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/36] | 16.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/24] | 23.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2015/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US3344179 (YASUNOBU TAKAHASHI) [X] 2,3,9 * column 1, line 23 - line 53 * * column 3, line 46 - line 55 * * example 3 * [I] 1,4-8; | [X]WO9209560 (UNIV NORTHWESTERN [US]) [X] 2,3,9 * page 5, line 12 - page 6, line 13 * * page 7, line 1 - line 12 * * page 15; table 1 * * claims 1,6,8,10,13 *; | [X] - KIM Y C ET AL, "GLUTAMIC ACID ANALOGS. THE SYNTHESIS OF 3-ALKYLGLUTAMIC ACIDS AND 4-ALKYLPYROGLUTAMIC ACIDS", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (19650101), vol. 8, no. 4, doi:10.1021/JM00328A022, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 509 - 513, XP002027984 [X] 2,3,9 * table III * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00328a022 | [X] - MAUGER A B, "DIASTEREOISOMERS OF 3-METHYLPYROGLUTAMIC ACID AND BETA- METHYLGLUTAMIC ACID", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, ACS, US, (19810101), vol. 46, no. 5, doi:10.1021/JO00318A042, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 1032 - 1035, XP002027980 [X] 2,3,9 * compounds 10,11 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00318a042 | [X] - WEHBE J ET AL, "Glutamate transporter blockers: enantiomerically pure (2S,3S)- and (2S,3R)-3-methyl glutamic acids", TETRAHEDRON ASYMMETRY, PERGAMON PRESS LTD, OXFORD, GB, (20030502), vol. 14, no. 9, doi:10.1016/S0957-4166(03)00127-7, ISSN 0957-4166, pages 1123 - 1126, XP004420953 [X] 2,3,9 * compounds 4a,4b * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0957-4166(03)00127-7 | by applicant | EP1291342 | EP1312268 | WO03088768 | WO2005015158 | WO2006003107 | EP1642886 | - Chemicals Used in Food Processing, publication 1274, THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, pages 63 - 258 | - S. ARCTANDER,, Perfume and Flavour Chemicals, ALLURED PUBLISHING CORPORATION, (1994), vol. I, II | GB20090013804 | WO2010EP59916 |