EP2765925 - METHODS AND INSTRUMENTS FOR SUBCHONDRAL TREATMENT OF OSTEOARTHRITIS IN A SMALL JOINT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.08.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zimmer Knee Creations, Inc. 900 Airport Road Suite 3B West Chester, PA 19380 / US | For all designated states Hanson, Shaun B. 1585 Sundance Drive West Chester, PA 19380 / US | For all designated states Mandeen, Christopher D. 300 East Evans Street Apt. P-166 West Chester, PA 19380 / US | For all designated states Carroll, Jamie A. 229 Flintlock Road Drexel Hill, PA 19026 / US | For all designated states Laporta, Guido 867 Goose Hill Dalton, PA 18414 / US | [2014/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANSON, Shaun, B. 1585 Sundance Drive West Chester, PA 19380 / US | 02 /
MANDEEN, Christopher, D. 300 East Evans Street Apt. P-166 West Chester, PA 19380 / US | 03 /
CARROLL, Jamie, A. 229 Flintlock Road Drexel Hill, PA 19026 / US | 04 /
LAPORTA, Guido 867 Goose Hill Dalton, PA 18414 / US | [2014/34] | Representative(s) | Mays, Julie, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London, EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/34] | Mays, Julie, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 12784120.3 | 11.10.2012 | WO2012US59711 | Priority number, date | US201161545846P | 11.10.2011 Original published format: US 201161545846 P | [2014/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013055891 | Date: | 18.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2765925 | Date: | 20.08.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.04.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/17 | [2014/34] | CPC: |
A61B17/1739 (EP,US);
A61B17/0206 (US);
A61B17/025 (US);
A61B17/1775 (EP,US);
A61B17/8805 (EP,US);
A61B90/00 (EP,US);
A61B90/39 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/34] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND INSTRUMENTE ZUR SUBCHONDRALEN BEHANDLUNG VON OSTEOARTHRITIS BEI KLEINEN GELENKEN | [2014/34] | English: | METHODS AND INSTRUMENTS FOR SUBCHONDRAL TREATMENT OF OSTEOARTHRITIS IN A SMALL JOINT | [2014/34] | French: | MÉTHODES ET INSTRUMENTS UTILISÉS POUR LE TRAITEMENT SOUS-CHONDRAL DE L'ARTHROSE DANS UNE PETITE ARTICULATION | [2014/34] | Entry into regional phase | 08.05.2014 | National basic fee paid | 08.05.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.05.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/34] | 02.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/40] | 28.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.03.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2018 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2009158522 (SMALL BONE INNOVATIONS INC [US], et al) [Y] 13 * figure 3 * * page 66 *; | [A]US2010160925 (HEILALA MATT A [US], et al) [A] 8* the whole document *; | [XY]WO2011063281 (KNEE CREATIONS LLC [US], et al) [X] 8,10-12 * figures 1,2A,7A,8,9,13A,13B * * page 11, lines 22-24 * * page 18, lines 11-28 * * page 19, lines 7-11 * * page 20, lines 15-20 * [Y] 13; | [X]WO2011063257 (KNEE CREATIONS LLC [US], et al) [X] 8-12,14 * figures 4A-7 * * page 15, lines 25-27 * * page 17, line 7 - page 19, line 22 *; | [X]WO2011063267 (KNEE CREATIONS LLC [US], et al) [X] 8,11,12,14 * figures 1A-2B,5A * * page 16, lines 17-28 * * page 19, lines 14-30 * * page 30, lines 9-12 * | by applicant | US2011125156 | US2011125157 | US2011125265 | US2011125264 | US2011125272 | US8062364 |