EP2712182 - INTEGRATED BROADCAST/COMMUNICATION RECEPTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.11.2015 [2015/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Hoso Kyokai 2-1, Jinnan 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150-8001 / JP | [2014/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUJISAWA Hiroshi c/o NHK Science&Technology Research Laboratories 10-11 Kinuta 1-chome Setagaya-ku Tokyo 157-8510 / JP | 02 /
MITSUYA Shigeaki c/o NHK Science&Technology Research Laboratories 10-11 Kinuta 1-chome Setagaya-ku Tokyo 157-8510 / JP | 03 /
MATSUMURA Kinji c/o NHK Science&Technology Research Laboratories 10-11 Kinuta 1-chome Setagaya-ku Tokyo 157-8510 / JP | 04 /
BABA Akitsugu c/o NHK Science&Technology Research Laboratories 10-11 Kinuta 1-chome Setagaya-ku Tokyo 157-8510 / JP | 05 /
TAKECHI Masaru c/o NHK Science&Technology Research Laboratories 10-11 Kinuta 1-chome Setagaya-ku Tokyo 157-8510 / JP | 06 /
KANATSUGU Yasuaki c/o NHK Science&Technology Research Laboratories 10-11 Kinuta 1-chome Setagaya-ku Tokyo 157-8510 / JP | 07 /
HAMADA Hiroyuki c/o NHK Science&Technology Research Laboratories 10-11 Kinuta 1-chome Setagaya-ku Tokyo 157-8510 / JP | [2014/13] | Representative(s) | Tomlinson, Kerry John Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2014/13] | Application number, filing date | 12784897.6 | 18.05.2012 | WO2012JP62804 | Priority number, date | JP20110112706 | 19.05.2011 Original published format: JP 2011112706 | [2014/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012157753 | Date: | 22.11.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2712182 | Date: | 26.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.11.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/173, G06F13/00, H04H60/13, H04H20/93, H04N21/434, H04N21/435 | [2014/48] | CPC: |
H04N21/435 (EP,US);
H04H20/93 (EP,US);
H04H60/13 (EP,US);
H04N21/4345 (EP,US);
H04H2201/37 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/13] | H04N7/173, G06F13/00, H04H60/13 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/13] | Title | German: | INTEGRIERTE RUNDFUNK- UND KOMMUNIKATIONSEMPFANGSVORRICHTUNG | [2014/13] | English: | INTEGRATED BROADCAST/COMMUNICATION RECEPTION DEVICE | [2014/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF INTÉGRÉ DE RÉCEPTION / DIFFUSION DE COMMUNICATIONS | [2014/13] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2013 | Translation filed | 19.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2013 | Search fee paid | 19.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/13] | 22.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/47] | 30.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1494138 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0075] * * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0084] * * paragraph [0103] - paragraph [0110] * * paragraph [0123] * * figures 3,4,6,7,10 * [I] 2-5; | [I]US2006184965 (LEE BYOUNG-DAI [KR], et al) [I] 1,2 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0036] *; | [A]WO2008129858 (PANASONIC CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0083] * * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0079] * * paragraph [0152] *; | [A]WO2007143933 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * page 5, lines 1-11 * * page 7, line 29 - page 8, line 28 * * figure 3; claims 1-4 * | [I] - Mihai Rotaru, "Articles Musings & News Contributors About Contact Comet for HbbTV-Compliant Browsers Comet Daily > Blog Archive > Comet for HbbTV-Compliant Browsers/comet-for-hbbtv-compliant-bro", CometDaily, (20110405), URL: http://cometdaily.com/2011/04/05/comet-for-hbbtv-compliant-browsers/, (20140925), XP055142690 [I] 4,5 * the whole document * | [IP] - AKITSUGU BABA ET AL, "Seamless, Synchronous, and Supportive: Welcome to Hybridcast: An Advanced Hybrid Broadcast and Broadband System", IEEE CONSUMER ELECTRONICS MAGAZINE, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20120401), vol. 1, no. 2, doi:10.1109/MCE.2011.2182469, ISSN 2162-2248, pages 43 - 52, XP011440218 [IP] 1-5 * Section: "Application Model"; page 45 - page 46 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MCE.2011.2182469 | International search | [Y]JP2000270303 (DIGITAL VISION LAB KK); | [Y]JP2003069514 (NHK ENGINEERING SERVICES INC, et al); | [A]JP2002209204 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [A]JP2007537632 (HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD.); | [A]US2011029598 (ARNOLD JORDAN DOUGLAS [US], et al) |