EP2731330 - TELEPRESENCE METHOD, TERMINAL AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.11.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2014/20] | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YE, Xiaoyang ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Dong ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 03 /
WU, Yongming ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2014/20] | Representative(s) | Tiburzi, Andrea, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Roma S.p.A. Via Piemonte 26 00187 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2014/20] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano & Partners (DE) Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12784928.9 | 21.03.2012 | WO2012CN72751 | Priority number, date | CN201110191493 | 08.07.2011 Original published format: CN201110191493 | [2014/20] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012155660 | Date: | 22.11.2012 | Language: | ZH | [2012/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2731330 | Date: | 14.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 22.11.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/15 | [2014/20] | CPC: |
H04N7/147 (EP,US);
H04N7/152 (US);
H04L65/1069 (EP,US);
H04L65/403 (EP,US);
H04N7/15 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/20] | Title | German: | TELEPRÄSENZVERFAHREN SOWIE ENDGERÄT UND SYSTEM DAFÜR | [2014/20] | English: | TELEPRESENCE METHOD, TERMINAL AND SYSTEM | [2014/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, SYSTÈME ET TERMINAL DE TÉLÉPRÉSENCE | [2014/20] | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2014 | Translation filed | 08.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.2014 | Search fee paid | 08.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/20] | 12.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/51] | 04.12.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.01.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5335011 (ADDEO ERIC J [US], et al) [X] 1,3-7,9-12,14-16 * abstract * * column 2, lines 6-22 * * column 4, line 23 - column 6, line 4 *; | [Y]US2005122392 (JOHANSEN TOM-IVAR [NO], et al) [Y] 2,8,13 * abstract * * paragraph [0066] *; | [X]EP1763241 (POLYCOM INC [US]) [X] 1,3-7,9-12,14-16 * abstract ** paragraphs [0019] , [0021] , [0022] , [0024] , [0025] , [0028] , [0036] , [0040] , [0042] *; | [X]US2007206091 (DUNN KRISTIN A [US], et al) [X] 1,3-7,9-12,14-16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0013] , [0014] , [0016] - [0023] *; | [X]US2008246834 (LUNDE FINN HELGE [NO], et al) [X] 1,3-7,9-12,14-16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] , [0010] , [0035] - [0037] - [0043] , [0046] - [0048] - [0055] *; | [XY]US2008273078 (GRASLEY SCOTT [US], et al) [X] 1,3-7,9-12,14-16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0012] , [0015] , [0017] , [0027] - [0034] - [0036] , [0037] , [0041] , [0042] , [0051] - [0053] * [Y] 2,8,13; | [X]US2009079815 (BAIRD RANDALL B [US]) [X] 1,3-7,9-12,14-16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0014] , [0017] , [0019] - [0027] * | International search | [A]CN1170315 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [A]US2008246834 (LUNDE FINN HELGE [NO], et al); | [A]CN101911667 (PANASONIC CORP) |