EP2690829 - METHOD FOR MANAGING CONTENT BY CONTENT MANAGEMENT SYSTEM AND CONTENT MANAGEMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.10.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2014/05] | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Xiaojing c/o ZTE Corporation Zte Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
LIU, Zhijun c/o ZTE Corporation Zte Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2014/05] | Representative(s) | Lavoix Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/05] | Tischner, Oliver Lavoix Munich Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12785729.0 | 16.04.2012 | WO2012CN74071 | Priority number, date | CN201110255483 | 31.08.2011 Original published format: CN201110255483 | [2014/05] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012155736 | Date: | 22.11.2012 | Language: | ZH | [2012/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2690829 | Date: | 29.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 22.11.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/54, G06F17/30, H04L29/08 | [2015/30] | CPC: |
H04L67/125 (EP);
G06F16/93 (EP);
H04L67/1095 (EP);
H04L67/1097 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2014/05] | H04L12/54 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/05] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR INHALTSVERWALTUNG DURCH EIN INHALTSVERWALTUNGSSYSTEM UND INHALTSVERWALTUNGSSYSTEM | [2014/05] | English: | METHOD FOR MANAGING CONTENT BY CONTENT MANAGEMENT SYSTEM AND CONTENT MANAGEMENT SYSTEM | [2014/05] | French: | PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE GÉRER UN CONTENU AU MOYEN D'UN SYSTÈME DE GESTION DE CONTENU ET SYSTÈME DE GESTION DE CONTENU | [2014/05] | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.2013 | Translation filed | 23.10.2013 | National basic fee paid | 23.10.2013 | Search fee paid | 23.10.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.10.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/05] | 19.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.07.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 16.05.2014 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   12.05.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - PFEIFER ET AL, "UGetMobile End-user Mobile Publishing Platform", E-COMMERCE TECHNOLOGY, 2006. THE 8TH IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON AND ENTERPRISE COMPUTING, E-COMMERCE, AND E-SERVICES, THE 3RD IEEE INT ERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SAN FRANCISCO, CA, USA 26-29 JUNE 2006, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20060710), ISBN 978-0-7695-2511-2, pages 78 - 78, XP031001327 [X] 1,6 * page 4, paragraph 1 - page 6, paragraph last * [I] 2-5,7-10 | [Y] - PLAGEMANN T ET AL, "From content distribution networks to content networks - issues and challenges", COMPUTER COMMUNICATIONS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 29, no. 5, ISSN 0140-3664, (20060306), pages 551 - 562, (20060306), XP027943545 [Y] 1-10 * the whole document * | [Y] - NORMAN HEINO ET AL, "Managing Web Content Using Linked Data Principles - Combining Semantic Structure with Dynamic Content Syndication", COMPUTER SOFTWARE AND APPLICATIONS CONFERENCE (COMPSAC), 2011 IEEE 35TH ANNUAL, IEEE, (20110718), doi:10.1109/COMPSAC.2011.39, ISBN 978-1-4577-0544-1, pages 245 - 250, XP031972231 [Y] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/COMPSAC.2011.39 | International search | [A]US2007043846 (GRAYSON TIMOTHY R D [CA], et al); | [A]CN101686222 (ZTE CORP [CN]); | [A]CN101867665 (ZTE CORP); | [A]WO2011088304 (BEAUMARIS NETWORKS INC [US], et al) |