EP2711958 - ELECTROMAGNETIC CONTACTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.11.2016 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.12.2016 [2016/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fuji Electric FA Components & Systems Co., Ltd. 5-7, Nihonbashi Odemma-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0011 / JP | For all designated states Fuji Electric Co., Ltd. 1-1 Tanabeshinden Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-9530 / JP | [2014/20] |
Former [2014/13] | For all designated states Fuji Electric Fa Components & Systems Co., Ltd. 5-7, Nihonbashi Odemma-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0011 / JP | ||
For all designated states Fuji Electric Co., Ltd. 1-1 Tanabeshinden Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-9530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKA, Yasuhiro c/o FUJI ELECTRIC FA COMPONENTS&SYSTEMS CO. LTD. 5-7 Nihonbashi Odemma-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0011 / JP | 02 /
TAKAYA, Kouetsu c/o FUJI ELECTRIC FA COMPONENTS&SYSTEMS CO. LTD. 5-7 Nihonbashi Odemma-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0011 / JP | 03 /
SUZUKI, Kenji c/o FUJI ELECTRICFA COMPONENTS&SYSTEMS CO. LTD. 5-7 Nihonbashi Odemma-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0011 / JP | 04 /
KASHIMURA, Osamu c/o FUJI ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 1-1 Tanabeshinden Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 210-9530 / JP | [2014/13] | Representative(s) | Appelt, Christian W. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/13] | Appelt, Christian W. Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12786354.6 | 03.04.2012 | WO2012JP02333 | Priority number, date | JP20110112907 | 19.05.2011 Original published format: JP 2011112907 | [2014/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012157176 | Date: | 22.11.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2711958 | Date: | 26.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.11.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01H50/14, H01H50/54, H01H50/42, H01H9/34, H01H50/02 | [2014/45] | CPC: |
H01H50/42 (EP,US);
H01H50/54 (KR,US);
H01H50/14 (KR);
H01H50/546 (EP,US);
H01H1/54 (EP,US);
H01H2050/025 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/13] | H01H50/14, H01H50/54 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/13] | Title | German: | ELEKTROMAGNETISCHES SCHÜTZ | [2014/13] | English: | ELECTROMAGNETIC CONTACTOR | [2014/13] | French: | CONTACTEUR ÉLECTROMAGNÉTIQUE | [2014/13] | Entry into regional phase | 06.11.2013 | Translation filed | 06.11.2013 | National basic fee paid | 06.11.2013 | Search fee paid | 06.11.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.11.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/13] | 20.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/52] | 19.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/52] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.03.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP2019405 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO [JP]) [X] 1,2,5 * figures 3, 4, 6, 8, 11c * [Y] 3,4; | [Y]JPH0525644U (-) [Y] 3 * figure 3 *; | [Y]US3465270 (SCHATTLER JAMES J) [Y] 4 * figure 1 * | International search | [X]JP2007305468 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO); | [X]JP2005183277 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO); | [Y]JPS62140328 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2005183277 |