EP2711748 - POLARIZING PLATE SUITABLE FOR LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY DEVICE CAPABLE OF DISPLAYING THREE-DIMENSIONAL IMAGES, AND LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.08.2018 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyobo Co., Ltd. 2-8 Dojima Hama 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8230 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2014/13] | For all designated states Toyobo Co., Ltd. 2-8 Dojima Hama 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8230 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURATA, Kouichi c/o TOYO BOSEKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA Tsuruga Plant 10-24, Toyo-cho Tsuruga-shi, Fukui 914-0047 / JP | 02 /
IKEHATA, Yoshitomo c/o TOYO BOSEKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA Inuyama Plant 344, aza-Maehata Oaza-Kotsu Inuyama-shi, Aichi 484-8508 / JP | [2014/13] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/13] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12786442.9 | 16.05.2012 | WO2012JP62476 | Priority number, date | JP20110111023 | 18.05.2011 Original published format: JP 2011111023 | [2014/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012157662 | Date: | 22.11.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2711748 | Date: | 26.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.11.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/30, G02F1/1335, G02B27/26 | [2014/49] | CPC: |
G02B5/3033 (EP,US);
G02B5/3025 (KR);
G02B30/25 (EP,US);
G02B5/3083 (EP,US);
G02B5/3091 (US);
G02F1/1335 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2014/13] | G02B5/30, G02F1/1335 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/13] | Title | German: | POLARISIERUNGSPLATTE FÜR EINE FLÜSSIGKRISTALLANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG ZUR ANZEIGE DREIDIMENSIONALER BILDER SOWIE FLÜSSIGKRISTALLANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2014/13] | English: | POLARIZING PLATE SUITABLE FOR LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY DEVICE CAPABLE OF DISPLAYING THREE-DIMENSIONAL IMAGES, AND LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY DEVICE | [2014/13] | French: | PLAQUE DE POLARISATION APPROPRIÉE POUR UN DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE À CRISTAUX LIQUIDES POUVANT AFFICHER DES IMAGES TRIDIMENSIONNELLES, ET DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE À CRISTAUX LIQUIDES | [2014/13] | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.2013 | Translation filed | 10.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.2013 | Search fee paid | 10.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/13] | 29.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/38] | 09.05.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/38] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.11.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2018 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]WO2010050355 (NITTO DENKO CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,6 * see US2011/194048 * [Y] 5,9 [I] 8; | [P]US2011194048 (IZAKI AKINORI [JP], et al) [P] * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0068] * * claim 1 * * table 1 *; | [XDI]JP2010277028 (TEIJIN DUPONT FILMS JAPAN LTD) [XD] 1-3,6,7 * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0006] * * table 2 * * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0073] * [I] 8; | [Y]JP2010243630 (MITSUBISHI PLASTICS INC) [Y] 5 * claim 1 *; | [A]US2006216437 (MURAKAMI TAKASHI [JP]) [A] 8 * paragraph [0879] *; | [Y]US2011085106 (OBATA KEI [JP], et al) [Y] 9 * paragraph [0003]; figure 1 *; | [E]EP2587304 (TOYO BOSEKI [JP]) [E] 1-8 * claims 1-6,9 * * paragraph [0057] *; | [E]EP2711765 (TOYO BOSEKI [JP]) [E] 1-8 * paragraph [0116]; claims 1-10 * | International search | [X]WO2005050269 (SHARP KK [JP], et al); | [X]JP2010277028 (TEIJIN DUPONT FILMS JAPAN LTD); | [Y]JP2008003425 (NIPPON ZEON CO); | [XP]JP2011107198 (KEIO GIJUKU, et al); | [A]JPH06258634 (ROHM CO LTD); | [A]JP2005157082 (STANLEY ELECTRIC CO LTD, et al); | [A]JP2009157348 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO) | Examination | JP2011059488 | by applicant | JP2004205773 | JP2005266464 | JP2010277028 | JP3567927B | JP3589232B | JP3589233B | JP3900191B | JP4150982B | - KENJI ISHIKAWA, 3D Stereoscopic Images Are Coming, OHMSHA LTD., (20100425), pages 62 - 118 |